This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/16/2022 at 07:08:32 (UTC).

Michael Ross v. First Financial Corporate Services, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 Michael Ross filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against First Financial Corporate Services, Inc ,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-2081

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

MICHAEL ROSS

Defendant / Appellees

FIRST FINANCIAL CORPORATE SERVICES, INC.

THOMAS SLEVIN

RICHARD STEBBINS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Kevin P. Brown

Attorney at RIECK & CROTTY

161 N. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60601

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jeffrey L. Rudd

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

150 N. Michigan Avenue

Chicago, IL 60601

Julia Wolf

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

150 N. Michigan Avenue

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#2

(#2) ORDER: The appellant shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before June 29, 2022. (See order for details.) DW [2] [2] [7243840] [22-2081] (CG) [Entered: 06/22/2022 12:30 PM]

#3

(#3) Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellant Michael Ross. [3] [7244353] [22-2081] (Brown, Kevin) [Entered: 06/24/2022 09:51 AM]

#4

(#4) ORDER: Appellant again shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before July 5, 2022. (See order for details) DW [4] [7244772] [22-2081] (AP) [Entered: 06/27/2022 03:56 PM]

#5

(#5) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Friday, July 15, 2022 at 2:00p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS. [5] [7245536] [22-2081] (HTP) [Entered: 06/30/2022 04:29 PM]

#6

(#6) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 08/15/2022 for Michael Ross. Appellees' brief due on or before 09/14/2022 for First Financial Corporate Services, Inc., Thomas Slevin and Richard Stebbins. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 10/05/2022 for Appellant Michael Ross. JNS [7245539] [22-2081] (HTP) [Entered: 06/30/2022 04:31 PM]

#7

(#7) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jeffrey L. Rudd for Appellee First Financial Corporate Services, Inc.. [7] [7246849] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2081] (Rudd, Jeffrey) [Entered: 07/08/2022 10:45 AM]

#8

(#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Julia S. Wolf for Appellee First Financial Corporate Services, Inc.. [8] [7246857] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2081] [8] [7246857] [22-2081]--[Edited 07/08/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Wolf, Julia) [Entered: 07/08/2022 10:52 AM]

#9

(#9) ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders attorney Kevin P. Brown to show cause for his failure to respond to the courts order of June 27, 2022. Attorney Kevin P. Brown shall file his response on or before August 15, 2022. Counsel is advised that failure to respond may result in monetary or disciplinary sanctions. DW. [9] [7253235] [22-2081] (HTP) [Entered: 08/08/2022 03:07 PM]

10 #1

Motion for leave to file tendered materials

10 #2

Amended Dkt.Stat

10 #3

Exhibit

#11

(#11) Motion filed by Appellant Michael Ross to file Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant Brief. [11] [7253351] [22-2081] (Henry, Bernard) [Entered: 08/08/2022 05:58 PM]

#12

(#12) INSTANTER ORDER re: Motion for leave to file docketing statement instanter. 2. Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief [ # 11 ]IT IS ORDERED that the motion to file instanter is GRANTED. The clerk shall file instanter the electronically tendered amended docketing statement of the appellant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the rule to show cause dated August 8, 2022, is DISCHARGED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the motion for extension is GRANTED, and briefing shall proceed as follows: [ # 10 ], Appellant's brief due on or before 09/09/2022 for Michael Ross. Appellee's brief due on or before 10/11/2022 for First Financial Corporate Services, Inc., Thomas Slevin and Richard Stebbins. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/01/2022 for Appellant Michael Ross. SCR [12] [7253471] [22-2081] (AP) [Entered: 08/09/2022 10:56 AM]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Amended Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Michael Ross, per order. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [13] [7253485] [22-2081] (AP) [Entered: 08/09/2022 11:06 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) INSTANTER ORDER re: Motion for leave to file docketing statement instanter. 2. Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief [ # 11 ]IT IS ORDERED that the motion to file instanter is GRANTED. The clerk shall file instanter the electronically tendered amended docketing statement of the appellant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the rule to show cause dated August 8, 2022, is DISCHARGED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the motion for extension is GRANTED, and briefing shall proceed as follows: [ # 10 ], Appellant's brief due on or before 09/09/2022 for Michael Ross. Appellee's brief due on or before 10/11/2022 for First Financial Corporate Services, Inc., Thomas Slevin and Richard Stebbins. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/01/2022 for Appellant Michael Ross. SCR [12] [7253471] [22-2081] (AP) [Entered: 08/09/2022 10:56 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Motion filed by Appellant Michael Ross to file Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant Brief. [11] [7253351] [22-2081] (Henry, Bernard) [Entered: 08/08/2022 05:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Instanter motion filed by Appellant Michael Ross to file Motion For Leave to File Docketing Statement Instanter. [10] [7253289] [22-2081] (Henry, Bernard) [Entered: 08/08/2022 04:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders attorney Kevin P. Brown to show cause for his failure to respond to the courts order of June 27, 2022. Attorney Kevin P. Brown shall file his response on or before August 15, 2022. Counsel is advised that failure to respond may result in monetary or disciplinary sanctions. DW. [9] [7253235] [22-2081] (HTP) [Entered: 08/08/2022 03:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Julia S. Wolf for Appellee First Financial Corporate Services, Inc.. [8] [7246857] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2081] [8] [7246857] [22-2081]--[Edited 07/08/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Wolf, Julia) [Entered: 07/08/2022 10:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jeffrey L. Rudd for Appellee First Financial Corporate Services, Inc.. [7] [7246849] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2081] (Rudd, Jeffrey) [Entered: 07/08/2022 10:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 08/15/2022 for Michael Ross. Appellees' brief due on or before 09/14/2022 for First Financial Corporate Services, Inc., Thomas Slevin and Richard Stebbins. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 10/05/2022 for Appellant Michael Ross. JNS [7245539] [22-2081] (HTP) [Entered: 06/30/2022 04:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Friday, July 15, 2022 at 2:00p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS. [5] [7245536] [22-2081] (HTP) [Entered: 06/30/2022 04:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Appellant again shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before July 5, 2022. (See order for details) DW [4] [7244772] [22-2081] (AP) [Entered: 06/27/2022 03:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellant Michael Ross. [3] [7244353] [22-2081] (Brown, Kevin) [Entered: 06/24/2022 09:51 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: The appellant shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before June 29, 2022. (See order for details.) DW [2] [2] [7243840] [22-2081] (CG) [Entered: 06/22/2022 12:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 07/01/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 07/27/2022 for Michael Ross. [1] [7243597] [22-2081] (PS) [Entered: 06/21/2022 02:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less