This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/14/2022 at 06:13:34 (UTC).

Michael Reynolds v. Warden Greenville FCI

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 Michael Reynolds filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Warden Greenville FCI. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1912

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

MICHAEL CURTIS REYNOLDS

Greenville, IL 62246

Defendant / Appellee

WARDEN GREENVILLE FCI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michael Curtis Reynolds

Attorney at Greenville FCI

P.O. Box 5000

Greenville, IL 62246

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

D. Brian Simpson Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

228 Walnut Street, P.O. Box 11754, 220 Federal Building And Courthouse

Harrisburg, PA 17108

Joseph J. Terz Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

228 Walnut Street, P.O. Box 11754, 220 Federal Building And Courthouse

Harrisburg, PA 17108

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case Docketed

1 #2

District Court Order

1 #3

Districtd Court Memorandum

1 #4

Caption

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

#3

(#3) MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Michael Curtis Reynolds Motion Declaratory Judgment/Expungement of Charges. Response due on 05/16/2022. Certificate of Service dated 05/03/2022. Service made by US mail. (CLW) [Entered: 05/12/2022 04:25 PM]

#4

(#4) LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for possible summary action. (MW) [Entered: 05/13/2022 01:40 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for possible summary action. (MW) [Entered: 05/13/2022 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Michael Curtis Reynolds Motion Declaratory Judgment/Expungement of Charges. Response due on 05/16/2022. Certificate of Service dated 05/03/2022. Service made by US mail. (CLW) [Entered: 05/12/2022 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CLW) [Entered: 05/12/2022 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Michael Curtis Reynolds in District Court No. 3-21-cv-01867. (CLW) [Entered: 05/12/2022 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer D. Brian Simpson Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph J Terz