This case was last updated from PACER on 02/27/2021 at 06:14:20 (UTC).

Michael Reynolds v. Eric Williams

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 Michael Reynolds filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Eric Williams. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3525

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

MICHAEL C. REYNOLDS

Greenville, IL 62246

Respondent / Appellee

ERIC WILLIAMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Michael C. Reynolds

Attorney at FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

P.O. Box 5000

Greenville, IL 62246

 

Court Documents

#1

Federal Habeas Corpus Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #4

Fee Notice

#2

#3

#4

#5

RESTRICTED

6 #1

Order to Transfer IFP Motion

6 #2

mf ifp

8 #1

D.C. notice denying IFP filed

8 #2

C.R. 3(b) Fee Notice

#9

RESTRICTED

#10

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: Appellant Michael C. Reynolds is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Michael C. Reynolds by 03/10/2021. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7019 0140 0000 6080 1504. [10] [7143520] [20-3525] (AD) [Entered: 02/24/2021 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Prose motion filed by Appellant Michael C. Reynolds to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [9] [7142046] [20-3525] (CAH) [Entered: 02/18/2021 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Michael C. Reynolds leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 02/12/2021. Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 30 day notice for failure to pay the docketing fee. Fee or IFP forms due on 03/15/2021 for Appellant Michael C. Reynolds [7141193] [8] [7141193] [20-3525] (CG) [Entered: 02/12/2021 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Docket(#7) Notification from the District Court that a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is pending. [7] [7140194] [20-3525] (AP) [Entered: 02/08/2021 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order issued TRANSFERRING the motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis on appeal to the clerk of the District Court for ruling in the first instance. JR [6] [7139999] [20-3525] (CG) [Entered: 02/08/2021 08:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Prose motion filed by Appellant Michael C. Reynolds to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [5] [7139964] [20-3525] (MAN) [Entered: 02/05/2021 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 14 day notice to file a motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or pay the docketing fee in the District Court. Fee or IFP forms due on 02/05/2021 for Appellant Michael C. Reynolds [4] [7136321] [20-3525] (CG) [Entered: 01/22/2021 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: Appellant Michael C. Reynolds is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Michael C. Reynolds by 01/28/2021. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7019 0140 0000 6080 0330. [3] [7134551] [20-3525] (AD) [Entered: 01/14/2021 08:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [7131263] (Note: The Office of the US Attorney has been notified of the filing of the appeal.) [20-3525] (ER) [Entered: 12/30/2020 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Federal prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Michael C. Reynolds by 01/05/2021. Fee or IFP forms due on 01/12/2021 for Appellant Michael C. Reynolds. Transcript information sheet due by 01/12/2021. [1] [7131258] [20-3525] (ER) [Entered: 12/30/2020 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael C. Reynolds