This case was last updated from PACER on 07/26/2019 at 17:25:19 (UTC).

Michael Kosterlitz v. The S/V Knotta KLU, et al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2019 Michael Kosterlitz filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against The S/V Knotta KLU. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11888

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

THE S/V KNOTTA KLU, her engines, tackle, apparel, equipment and appurtenances, in rem

ROBERT E. LIBBEY, JR.

Plaintiff / Appellant

MICHAEL KOSTERLITZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michael F. Kayusa

Attorney at Michael F. Kayusa, Attorney at Law

1922 Victoria Ave Ste A

Fort Myers, FL 33901-3431

Alexander Brockmeyer

Attorney at Boyle Leonard & Anderson, PA

2050 Mcgregor Blvd

Fort Myers, FL 33901

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Donald Joseph Schutz

Attorney at Schutz Litigation, LLC

535 Central Ave

St Petersburg, FL 33701-3703

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ORDER: Motion for extension to file transcripts filed by Jeffrey G. Thomas is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8823685-2 ] Transcript is due on or before 08/05/2019. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas, Discount Invoked: n ; Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas, Discount Invoked: n. [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:00 PM]

Open Document

Motion for extension of time to file a transcript to 08/05/2019 filed by Court Reporter Jeffrey G. Thomas. [8823685-1] [Entered: 07/12/2019 11:19 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael F. Kayusa for Robert E. Libbey, Jr. and The S/V Knotta KLU. [19-11888] (ECF: Michael Kayusa) [Entered: 07/03/2019 03:56 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Donald Joseph Schutz for Appellant Michael Kosterlitz. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11888] (ECF: Donald Schutz) [Entered: 06/24/2019 05:30 PM]

Open Document

Transcripts were due to be filed on 06/14/2019 by Court Reporter Jeffrey G. Thomas and are overdue. A 10% discount is required after 07/14/2019. A 20% discount is required after 08/13/2019. [Entered: 06/24/2019 04:21 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Alexander Brockmeyer for Robert E. Libbey, Jr. Attorney Alexander Brockmeyer for Appellee Robert E. Libbey, Jr.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11888] (ECF: Alexander Brockmeyer) [Entered: 06/20/2019 03:26 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Alexander Brockmeyer for Robert E. Libbey, Jr. [19-11888] (ECF: Alexander Brockmeyer) [Entered: 06/20/2019 09:15 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Michael F. Kayusa for The S/V Knotta KLU and Robert E. Libbey, Jr.. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 06/14/2019 02:06 PM]

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Statement

Open Document #2

ATTY-1A Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

Appearance of counsel form not processed

Open Document #2

ATTY-1A Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

Appearance of counsel form not processed

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 05/15/2019 as to Appellant Michael Kosterlitz. [Entered: 05/21/2019 11:00 AM]

Open Document #4

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #3

Judgment doc#118

Open Document #2

Memorandum and Order doc#117

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion for extension to file transcripts filed by Jeffrey G. Thomas is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8823685-2 ] Transcript is due on or before 08/05/2019. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas, Discount Invoked: n ; Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas, Discount Invoked: n. [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for extension of time to file a transcript to 08/05/2019 filed by Court Reporter Jeffrey G. Thomas. [8823685-1] [Entered: 07/12/2019 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael F. Kayusa for Robert E. Libbey, Jr. and The S/V Knotta KLU. [19-11888] (ECF: Michael Kayusa) [Entered: 07/03/2019 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Donald Joseph Schutz for Appellant Michael Kosterlitz. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11888] (ECF: Donald Schutz) [Entered: 06/24/2019 05:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Donald Joseph Schutz for Michael Kosterlitz. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 06/24/2019 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Transcripts were due to be filed on 06/14/2019 by Court Reporter Jeffrey G. Thomas and are overdue. A 10% discount is required after 07/14/2019. A 20% discount is required after 08/13/2019. [Entered: 06/24/2019 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Alexander Brockmeyer for Robert E. Libbey, Jr. Attorney Alexander Brockmeyer for Appellee Robert E. Libbey, Jr.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11888] (ECF: Alexander Brockmeyer) [Entered: 06/20/2019 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Alexander Brockmeyer for Robert E. Libbey, Jr. [19-11888] (ECF: Alexander Brockmeyer) [Entered: 06/20/2019 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Michael F. Kayusa for The S/V Knotta KLU and Robert E. Libbey, Jr.. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 06/14/2019 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for leave to file Civil Appeal Statement out of time filed by Michael Kosterlitz. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [8799362-1] [19-11888] (ECF: Donald Schutz) [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Michael Kosterlitz, Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 02/25/2019. [Entered: 06/07/2019 12:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Donald Joseph Schutz for Michael Kosterlitz. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 06/04/2019 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Court Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Transcript Order: Jeffrey G. Thomas, 05/24/2019, Michael Kosterlitz, Trial 03/13/2019 - 03/15/2019. [Entered: 05/24/2019 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Michael Kosterlitz, Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas, Proceeding Type and Date: Trial 03/13/2019 - 03/15/2019. [Entered: 05/24/2019 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Transcript Order form has not been processed. According to our records, Donald Joseph Schutz for Michael Kosterlitz is a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar in inactive status. Your appearance form will not be processed until your bar membership has been renewed. [Entered: 05/23/2019 05:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Donald Joseph Schutz for Michael Kosterlitz is a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar in inactive status. Your appearance form will not be processed until your bar membership has been renewed. [Entered: 05/23/2019 05:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Donald Joseph Schutz for Appellant Michael Kosterlitz. Transcript(s) ordered. [19-11888] (ECF: Donald Schutz) [Entered: 05/22/2019 06:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Donald Joseph Schutz for Michael Kosterlitz. [19-11888] (ECF: Donald Schutz) [Entered: 05/22/2019 06:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellate fee was paid on 05/15/2019 as to Appellant Michael Kosterlitz. [Entered: 05/21/2019 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Michael Kosterlitz on 05/14/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/28/2019 as to Appellant Michael Kosterlitz. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/11/2019 as to Appellee The S/V Knotta KLU [Entered: 05/21/2019 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.