This case was last updated from PACER on 08/29/2021 at 06:14:16 (UTC).

Michael Ioane, et al v. County of Santa Clara, et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Michael Ioane filed an Other lawsuit against County of Santa Clara. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-16104

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARADISE SOLUTIONS

Defendant / Appellees

BA PROPERTIES, a Delaware Corporation

WILL CARRILLO

J. SHELDON CAPELOTO

Pasadena, CA 91101

FARMERS INSURANCE CO.

CITY OF CAPITOLA POLICE DEPT.

GUTIERREZ AND ASSOCIATES

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

DANNY AULMAN, Officer; in his personal and official capacity

CHICAGO TITLE

EQUITABLE DEED CO

CITY OF CAPITOLA

UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT

WATSON, Deputy; in her personal and official capacity

AMERICAN TITLE

ROBERT P. PERRY, President of the Federal Reserve Board, San Francisco

SECURITY PACIFIC NATIONAL BANK

COMMERCE SECURITY BANK

COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA

Plaintiff / Appellant

MICHAEL S. IOANE

Atwater, CA 95301

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Cheryl A. Stevens

Attorney at Lafayette & Kumagai LLP

1300 Clay Street, Suite 810

Oakland, CA 94612

J. Sheldon Capeloto

Attorney at McKINLEY & CAPELOTO

2 North Lake Avenue

Pasadena, CA 91101

Vincent Paul Hurley Esquire

Attorney at Casey Law Group

16450 Los Gatos Boulevard, Suite 110

Los Gatos, CA 95032

Julia A. Hill Esquire

Attorney at COUNTY OF SANTA CRUZ

701 Ocean Street, Room 505

Santa Cruz, CA 95060

Mark A. Gonzalez Esquire

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel

70 West Hedding Street, East Wing, 9Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95110

Jose Luis Martinez

Attorney at County of Santa Clara, Office of the County Counsel

70 West Hedding Street, East Wing

San Jose, CA 95110

Neal A. Rubin Esquire

Attorney at DOJ - Office of the U.S. Attorney

150 Almaden Boulevard, Suite 900

San Jose, CA 95113

Jon Nakamura Esquire

Attorney at FEDERAL RESERVE BANK OF SAN FRANCISCO

101 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michael S. Ioane

1120 Commerce Avenue, No. 14

Atwater, CA 95301

Other Attorneys

Ronald Mallen

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

One California Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Filed - Shelly J. Ioane letter dated 07/21/2021 re: copy of check paid to d/c in the amount of $505.. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12183770] (DJV) [Entered: 07/27/2021 09:10 AM]

2 #3

Additional Document

#2

Main Document

2 #1

Fee Due OSC

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • Docket(#6) Attorneys Mark A. Gonzalez, Mark A. Gonzalez, Mark A. Gonzalez and Mark A. Gonzalez in 21-16104 substituted by Attorneys Jose Luis Martinez, Jose Luis Martinez, Jose Luis Martinez and Jose Luis Martinez in 21-16104 [12204004] (DJV) [Entered: 08/17/2021 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jose Luis Martinez (Office of the County Counsel, County of Santa Clara, 70 West Hedding Street, East Wing, 9th Floor, San Jose, California 95110) for Appellee County of Santa Clara. Substitution for Attorney Mark A. Gonzalez, Esquire for Appellees Danny Aulman, County of Santa Clara, Santa Clara County Sheriff's Department and Watson. Date of service: 08/17/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12203989] [21-16104] (Martinez, Jose) [Entered: 08/17/2021 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • Docket(#4) Terminated Julia A. Hill for City of Capitola Police Dept. in 21-16104, Attorney no longer with office, party has alternate counsel. [12186843] (SVG) [Entered: 07/29/2021 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed - Shelly J. Ioane letter dated 07/21/2021 re: copy of check paid to d/c in the amount of $505.. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12183770] (DJV) [Entered: 07/27/2021 09:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [12166717] (CKP) [Entered: 07/08/2021 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Michael S. Ioane opening brief due 08/30/2021. Appellees Allstate Insurance Company, American Title, Danny Aulman, BA Properties, Bank United, Bank of America, N.A., J. Sheldon Capeloto, Will Carrillo, Chicago Title, City of Capitola, City of Capitola Police Dept., Commerce Security Bank, Continental Lawyers Title Company, County of Santa Clara, County of Santa Cruz, Equitable Deed Co, Farmers Insurance Co., Gutierrez and Associates, Lone Star Mortgage Service, Norwest Mortgage, Inc., Robert P. Perry, Santa Clara County Sheriff's Department, Santa Cruz County Sheriff's Dept., Security Pacific National Bank, United States District Court, Watson and John Yeh answering brief due 09/30/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12159341] (RT) [Entered: 06/30/2021 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SECURITY PACIFIC NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant