This case was last updated from PACER on 03/22/2019 at 06:00:26 (UTC).

Michael Holland, et al v. Westmoreland Coal Company, et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2019 Michael Holland filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Westmoreland Coal Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-90002

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CARL E. VAN HORN, as trustee for United Mine Workers of America Combined Benefit Fund and United Mine Workers of America 1992 Benefit Plan

MICHAEL H. HOLLAND, as trustee for United Mine Workers of America Combined Benefit Fund and United Mine Workers of America 1992 Benefit Plan

Respondents

WESTMORELAND KEMMERER, L.L.C.

WESTMORELAND RESOURCES, INCORPORATED

DARON COAL COMPANY

DAKOTA WESTMORELAND CORPORATION

WESTMORELAND ENERGY SERVICES NEW YORK, INCORPORATED

HAYSTACK COAL COMPANY

HARRISON RESOURCES, L.L.C.

WESTMORELAND COAL COMPANY

WESTMORELAND TEXAS JEWETT COAL COMPANY

OXFORD MINING COMPANY

WESTMORELAND POWER, INCORPORATED

OXFORD MINING COMPANY - KENTUCKY, L.L.C.

WESTMORELAND ENERGY SERVICES, INCORPORATED

WEI - ROANOKE VALLEY, INCORPORATED

WESTMORELAND - ROANOKE VALLEY, LP

SAN JUAN COAL COMPANY

SAN JUAN TRANSPORTATION COMPANY

OXFORD CONESVILLE, L.L.C.

23 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Stephanie Beth Schuster Esq.

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, L.L.P.

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Paul A. Green

Attorney at Mooney, Green, Baker & Saindon

1920 L Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-0000

Rachel J. Mauceri

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, L.L.P.

1717 Main Street

Dallas, TX 75201

Bryan Michael Killian

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, L.L.P.

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

John R. Mooney

Attorney at Mooney, Green, Baker & Saindon

1920 L Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-0000

Matthew C. Ziegler

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, L.L.P.

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103-2921

John C. Goodchild III

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, L.L.P.

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103-2921

Respondent Attorneys

George W. Hicks Jr.

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.

655 15Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Michael Brian Slade

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.

300 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Matthew D. Cavenaugh

Attorney at Jackson Walker, L.L.P.

1401 Mckinney Street

Houston, TX 77010

Stephen E. Hessler

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Gregory F. Pesce

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.

300 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

James Sprayregen

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.

300 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Anna Rotman

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.

609 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

Patricia Baron Tomasco Esq.

Attorney at Jackson Walker, L.L.P.

1401 Mckinney Street

Houston, TX 77010

Elizabeth Carol Freeman

Attorney at Porter Hedges, L.L.P.

1000 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

Patricia B. Tomasco

Attorney at Jackson Walker, L.L.P.

1401 Mckinney Street

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Dispositive Court Order

Open Document #1

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document

COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Ebonee Mathis. [19-90002] (Ebonee S. Mathis ) [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:42 PM]

Open Document

RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Absaloka Coal, L.L.C., Buckingham Coal Company, L.L.C., Dakota Westmoreland Corporation, Daron Coal Company, Harrison Resources, L.L.C., Haystack Coal Company, Oxford Conesville, L.L.C., Oxford Mining Company, Oxford Mining Company - Kentucky, L.L.C., San Juan Coal Company, San Juan Transportation Company, Texas Westmoreland Coal Company, WCC Land Holding Company, Incorporated, WEI - Roanoke Valley, Incorporated, Western Energy Company, Westmoreland - Roanoke Valley, LP, Westmoreland Coal Company, Westmoreland Coal Company Asset Corporation, Westmoreland Coal Sales Company, Incorporated, Westmoreland Energy Services New York, Incorporated, Westmoreland Energy Services, Incorporated, Westmoreland Energy, L.L.C., Westmoreland Kemmerer Fee Coal Holdings, L.L.C., Westmoreland Kemmerer, L.L.C., Westmoreland Mining, L.L.C., Westmoreland North Carolina Power, L.L.C., Westmoreland Partners, Westmoreland Power, Incorporated, Westmoreland Resource Partners, LP, Westmoreland Resources, GP, L.L.C., Westmoreland Resources, Incorporated, Westmoreland San Juan Holdings, Incorporated, Westmoreland San Juan, L.L.C., Westmoreland Texas Jewett Coal Company and WRI Partners, Incorporated and Basin Resources, Incorporated [8968627-1] to the Motion filed by Petitioners Mr. William P. Hobgood, Mr. Michael H. Holland, Mr. Marty D. Hudson, Mr. Michael O. McKown, Mr. Joseph R. Reschini, Mr. Carlo Tarley, Mr. Carl E. Van Horn and Ms. Gail R. Wilensky [ # 8965425-2 ], Motion filed by Petitioners Mr. William P. Hobgood, Mr. Michael H. Holland, Mr. Marty D. Hudson, Mr. Michael O. McKown, Mr. Joseph R. Reschini, Mr. Carlo Tarley, Mr. Carl E. Van Horn and Ms. Gail R. Wilensky [ # 8965425-3 ] Date of Service: 01/24/2019 via email - Attorney for Respondents: Cavenaugh, Freeman, Hessler, Hicks, Pesce, Rotman, Slade, Sprayregen, Tomasco; Attorney for Petitioners: Goodchild, Green, Killian, Mauceri, Mooney, Schuster, Ziegler. [19-90002] (George W. Hicks Jr.) [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:39 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-90002] (George W. Hicks Jr.) [Entered: 01/23/2019 05:23 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8966811-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-90002] (ABT) [Entered: 01/23/2019 08:58 AM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Petitioners Mr. William P. Hobgood, Mr. Michael H. Holland, Mr. Marty D. Hudson, Mr. Michael O. McKown, Mr. Joseph R. Reschini, Mr. Carlo Tarley, Mr. Carl E. Van Horn and Ms. Gail R. Wilensky for permission to appeal [8965393-2] pursuant to 158(d) Miscellaneous. Date received in 5th Circuit: 01/18/2019. Date of service: 01/18/2019 [19-90002] (ABT) [Entered: 01/21/2019 02:22 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Stephanie Beth Schuster, Esq. for Mr. William P. Hobgood, Mr. Michael H. Holland, Mr. Marty D. Hudson, Mr. Michael O. McKown, Mr. Joseph R. Reschini, Mr. Carlo Tarley, Mr. Carl E. Van Horn and Ms. Gail R. Wilensky for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-90002] (Stephanie Beth Schuster ) [Entered: 01/21/2019 02:57 PM]

Open Document

OPPOSED MOTION for expedited ruling on Motion for permission to appeal [ # 8965393-2 ] [8965425-3], to expedite the appeal [8965425-2]. Date of service: 01/21/2019 [19-90002] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Petitioners Mr. William P. Hobgood, Mr. Michael H. Holland, Mr. Marty D. Hudson, Mr. Michael O. McKown, Mr. Joseph R. Reschini, Mr. Carlo Tarley, Mr. Carl E. Van Horn and Ms. Gail R. Wilensky to expedite the appeal [8965425-2]. Date of service: 01/21/2019 via US mail - Attorney for Respondents: Cavenaugh, Hessler, Sprayregen; Attorney for Petitioners: Goodchild, Green, Mauceri, Mooney, Ziegler; email - Attorney for Respondents: Freeman, Pesce, Rotman, Slade, Tomasco; Attorney for Petitioners: Killian, Schuster [19-90002] (Bryan Michael Killian ) [Entered: 01/21/2019 02:56 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Bryan Michael Killian for Mr. William P. Hobgood, Mr. Michael H. Holland, Mr. Marty D. Hudson, Mr. Michael O. McKown, Mr. Joseph R. Reschini, Mr. Carlo Tarley, Mr. Carl E. Van Horn and Ms. Gail R. Wilensky for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-90002] (Bryan Michael Killian ) [Entered: 01/21/2019 02:53 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT ORDER granting Motion for permission to appeal filed by Petitioners Mr. Michael H. Holland, Mr. William P. Hobgood, Mr. Marty D. Hudson, Mr. Michael O. McKown, Mr. Joseph R. Reschini, Mr. Carlo Tarley, Mr. Carl E. Van Horn and Ms. Gail R. Wilensky [ # 8965393-2 ] pursuant to 158(d) Miscellaneous; denying Motion for expedited ruling on motion filed by Petitioners Mr. Michael H. Holland, Mr. William P. Hobgood, Mr. Marty D. Hudson, Mr. Michael O. McKown, Mr. Joseph R. Reschini, Mr. Carlo Tarley, Mr. Carl E. Van Horn and Ms. Gail R. Wilensky [ # 8965425-3 ]; denying Motion to expedite appeal once motion for leave to appeal is granted and transferred to the court's general docket filed by Petitioners Mr. Michael H. Holland, Mr. William P. Hobgood, Mr. Marty D. Hudson, Mr. Michael O. McKown, Mr. Joseph R. Reschini, Mr. Carlo Tarley, Mr. Carl E. Van Horn and Ms. Gail R. Wilensky [ # 8965425-2 ]. [19-90002] (ABT) [Entered: 01/28/2019 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Ebonee Mathis. [19-90002] (Ebonee S. Mathis ) [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Absaloka Coal, L.L.C., Buckingham Coal Company, L.L.C., Dakota Westmoreland Corporation, Daron Coal Company, Harrison Resources, L.L.C., Haystack Coal Company, Oxford Conesville, L.L.C., Oxford Mining Company, Oxford Mining Company - Kentucky, L.L.C., San Juan Coal Company, San Juan Transportation Company, Texas Westmoreland Coal Company, WCC Land Holding Company, Incorporated, WEI - Roanoke Valley, Incorporated, Western Energy Company, Westmoreland - Roanoke Valley, LP, Westmoreland Coal Company, Westmoreland Coal Company Asset Corporation, Westmoreland Coal Sales Company, Incorporated, Westmoreland Energy Services New York, Incorporated, Westmoreland Energy Services, Incorporated, Westmoreland Energy, L.L.C., Westmoreland Kemmerer Fee Coal Holdings, L.L.C., Westmoreland Kemmerer, L.L.C., Westmoreland Mining, L.L.C., Westmoreland North Carolina Power, L.L.C., Westmoreland Partners, Westmoreland Power, Incorporated, Westmoreland Resource Partners, LP, Westmoreland Resources, GP, L.L.C., Westmoreland Resources, Incorporated, Westmoreland San Juan Holdings, Incorporated, Westmoreland San Juan, L.L.C., Westmoreland Texas Jewett Coal Company and WRI Partners, Incorporated and Basin Resources, Incorporated [8968627-1] to the Motion filed by Petitioners Mr. William P. Hobgood, Mr. Michael H. Holland, Mr. Marty D. Hudson, Mr. Michael O. McKown, Mr. Joseph R. Reschini, Mr. Carlo Tarley, Mr. Carl E. Van Horn and Ms. Gail R. Wilensky [ # 8965425-2 ], Motion filed by Petitioners Mr. William P. Hobgood, Mr. Michael H. Holland, Mr. Marty D. Hudson, Mr. Michael O. McKown, Mr. Joseph R. Reschini, Mr. Carlo Tarley, Mr. Carl E. Van Horn and Ms. Gail R. Wilensky [ # 8965425-3 ] Date of Service: 01/24/2019 via email - Attorney for Respondents: Cavenaugh, Freeman, Hessler, Hicks, Pesce, Rotman, Slade, Sprayregen, Tomasco; Attorney for Petitioners: Goodchild, Green, Killian, Mauceri, Mooney, Schuster, Ziegler. [19-90002] (George W. Hicks Jr.) [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) George W. Hicks Jr. for party(s) Respondent Oxford Mining Company Respondent Westmoreland Resources, Incorporated Respondent Haystack Coal Company Respondent Westmoreland Coal Sales Company, Incorporated Respondent WEI - Roanoke Valley, Incorporated Respondent San Juan Coal Company Respondent Westmoreland - Roanoke Valley, LP Respondent Westmoreland Energy Services, Incorporated Respondent Absaloka Coal, L.L.C. Respondent Dakota Westmoreland Corporation Respondent Western Energy Company Respondent Westmoreland Texas Jewett Coal Company Respondent Westmoreland Coal Company Respondent Buckingham Coal Company, L.L.C. Respondent Westmoreland Energy Services New York, Incorporated Respondent Westmoreland Energy, L.L.C. Respondent Oxford Mining Company - Kentucky, L.L.C. Respondent Westmoreland San Juan, L.L.C. Respondent Westmoreland Mining, L.L.C. Respondent WRI Partners, Incorporated and Basin Resources, Incorporated Respondent Westmoreland North Carolina Power, L.L.C. Respondent Oxford Conesville, L.L.C. Respondent Westmoreland Kemmerer, L.L.C. Respondent Westmoreland Kemmerer Fee Coal Holdings, L.L.C. Respondent Westmoreland Resources, GP, L.L.C. Respondent Harrison Resources, L.L.C. Respondent Westmoreland Coal Company Asset Corporation Respondent San Juan Transportation Company Respondent Westmoreland San Juan Holdings, Incorporated Respondent Texas Westmoreland Coal Company Respondent WCC Land Holding Company, Incorporated Respondent Westmoreland Partners Respondent Daron Coal Company Respondent Westmoreland Resource Partners, LP Respondent Westmoreland Power, Incorporated, in case 19-90002 [19-90002] (ABT) [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-90002] (George W. Hicks Jr.) [Entered: 01/23/2019 05:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8966811-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-90002] (ABT) [Entered: 01/23/2019 08:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • CASE CAPTION updated. Party information modified for Michael H. Holland, William P. Hobgood, Marty D. Hudson, Michael O. McKown, Joseph R. Reschini, Carlo Tarley, Carl E. Van Horn and Gail R. Wilensky in 19-90002. Update: party text added. [19-90002] (ABT) [Entered: 01/22/2019 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Bryan Michael Killian for Petitioner Gail R. Wilensky in 19-90002, Attorney Bryan Michael Killian for Petitioner Carl E. Van Horn in 19-90002, Attorney Bryan Michael Killian for Petitioner Carlo Tarley in 19-90002, Attorney Bryan Michael Killian for Petitioner Joseph R. Reschini in 19-90002, Attorney Bryan Michael Killian for Petitioner Michael O. McKown in 19-90002, Attorney Bryan Michael Killian for Petitioner Marty D. Hudson in 19-90002, Attorney Bryan Michael Killian for Petitioner William P. Hobgood in 19-90002, Attorney Bryan Michael Killian for Petitioner Michael H. Holland in 19-90002, Attorney Stephanie Beth Schuster for Petitioner Gail R. Wilensky in 19-90002, Attorney Stephanie Beth Schuster for Petitioner Carl E. Van Horn in 19-90002, Attorney Stephanie Beth Schuster for Petitioner Carlo Tarley in 19-90002, Attorney Stephanie Beth Schuster for Petitioner Joseph R. Reschini in 19-90002, Attorney Stephanie Beth Schuster for Petitioner Michael O. McKown in 19-90002, Attorney Stephanie Beth Schuster for Petitioner Marty D. Hudson in 19-90002, Attorney Stephanie Beth Schuster for Petitioner William P. Hobgood in 19-90002, Attorney Stephanie Beth Schuster for Petitioner Michael H. Holland in 19-90002 [19-90002] (ABT) [Entered: 01/22/2019 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Petitioners Mr. William P. Hobgood, Mr. Michael H. Holland, Mr. Marty D. Hudson, Mr. Michael O. McKown, Mr. Joseph R. Reschini, Mr. Carlo Tarley, Mr. Carl E. Van Horn and Ms. Gail R. Wilensky for permission to appeal [8965393-2] pursuant to 158(d) Miscellaneous. Date received in 5th Circuit: 01/18/2019. Date of service: 01/18/2019 [19-90002] (ABT) [Entered: 01/21/2019 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • MISCELLANEOUS CASE docketed. [19-90002] (ABT) [Entered: 01/21/2019 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Stephanie Beth Schuster, Esq. for Mr. William P. Hobgood, Mr. Michael H. Holland, Mr. Marty D. Hudson, Mr. Michael O. McKown, Mr. Joseph R. Reschini, Mr. Carlo Tarley, Mr. Carl E. Van Horn and Ms. Gail R. Wilensky for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-90002] (Stephanie Beth Schuster ) [Entered: 01/21/2019 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSED MOTION for expedited ruling on Motion for permission to appeal [ # 8965393-2 ] [8965425-3], to expedite the appeal [8965425-2]. Date of service: 01/21/2019 [19-90002] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Petitioners Mr. William P. Hobgood, Mr. Michael H. Holland, Mr. Marty D. Hudson, Mr. Michael O. McKown, Mr. Joseph R. Reschini, Mr. Carlo Tarley, Mr. Carl E. Van Horn and Ms. Gail R. Wilensky to expedite the appeal [8965425-2]. Date of service: 01/21/2019 via US mail - Attorney for Respondents: Cavenaugh, Hessler, Sprayregen; Attorney for Petitioners: Goodchild, Green, Mauceri, Mooney, Ziegler; email - Attorney for Respondents: Freeman, Pesce, Rotman, Slade, Tomasco; Attorney for Petitioners: Killian, Schuster [19-90002] (Bryan Michael Killian ) [Entered: 01/21/2019 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Bryan Michael Killian for Mr. William P. Hobgood, Mr. Michael H. Holland, Mr. Marty D. Hudson, Mr. Michael O. McKown, Mr. Joseph R. Reschini, Mr. Carlo Tarley, Mr. Carl E. Van Horn and Ms. Gail R. Wilensky for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-90002] (Bryan Michael Killian ) [Entered: 01/21/2019 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less