This case was last updated from PACER on 03/25/2019 at 06:08:00 (UTC).

Michael Hall v. Bank of America Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 Michael Hall filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Bank of America Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1088

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

MARJORIE CAROL HALL

Stanley, NC 28164

MICHAEL LEE HALL

Stanley, NC 28164

Defendant / Appellees

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Marjorie Carol Hall

7033 Sedgebrook Drive West

Stanley, NC 28164

Michael Lee Hall

7033 Sedgebrook Drive West

Stanley, NC 28164

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Meredith Anne Pinson Esq.

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS, LLP

201 North Tyron Street

Charlotte, NC 28202

Bruce Steen

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS, LLP

201 North Tyron Street

Charlotte, NC 28202

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00108-RJC-DSC. Case manager: KStump. [19-1088] KS [Entered: 01/24/2019 06:53 AM]

#2

Disclosure Form

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Meredith A. Pinson for Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A.. [1000452771] [19-1088] Meredith Pinson [Entered: 02/06/2019 01:00 PM]

#8

(#8) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Marjorie Carol Hall and Michael Lee Hall. [19-1088] KS [Entered: 02/12/2019 02:46 PM]

#10

(#10) INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A.. [19-1088] Meredith Pinson [Entered: 02/25/2019 11:47 AM]

#11

(#11) INFORMAL REPLY BRIEF by Marjorie Carol Hall and Michael Lee Hall. [19-1088] KS [Entered: 03/07/2019 03:00 PM]

2 #1

Informal Briefing Order

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Bank of America, N.A.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000452899] [19-1088] Meredith Pinson [Entered: 02/06/2019 03:29 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Bruce M. Steen for Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A.. [1000452913] [19-1088] Bruce Steen [Entered: 02/06/2019 03:32 PM]

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Marjorie Carol Hall and Michael Lee Hall. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No. [1000456425] [19-1088] KS [Entered: 02/12/2019 02:48 PM]

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Bank of America Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000452773] [19-1088] Meredith Pinson [Entered: 02/06/2019 01:02 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) INFORMAL REPLY BRIEF by Marjorie Carol Hall and Michael Lee Hall. [19-1088] KS [Entered: 03/07/2019 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A.. [19-1088] Meredith Pinson [Entered: 02/25/2019 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Marjorie Carol Hall and Michael Lee Hall. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No. [1000456425] [19-1088] KS [Entered: 02/12/2019 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Marjorie Carol Hall and Michael Lee Hall. [19-1088] KS [Entered: 02/12/2019 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Bruce M. Steen for Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A.. [1000452913] [19-1088] Bruce Steen [Entered: 02/06/2019 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Bank of America, N.A.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000452899] [19-1088] Meredith Pinson [Entered: 02/06/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Bank of America Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000452773] [19-1088] Meredith Pinson [Entered: 02/06/2019 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Meredith A. Pinson for Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A.. [1000452771] [19-1088] Meredith Pinson [Entered: 02/06/2019 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • (#3) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00108-RJC-DSC. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-1088] KS [Entered: 01/24/2019 06:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Marjorie Carol Hall, Michael Lee Hall. Informal Opening Brief due 02/19/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-1088] KS [Entered: 01/24/2019 06:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00108-RJC-DSC. Case manager: KStump. [19-1088] KS [Entered: 01/24/2019 06:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less