This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/10/2022 at 06:09:40 (UTC).

Michael Grabowski v. Arizona Board of Regents, et al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 Michael Grabowski filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Arizona Board of Regents. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-15714

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

MICHAEL GRABOWSKI, a single man

Defendant / Appellees

ARIZONA BOARD OF REGENTS

UNIVERSITY OF ARIZONA

FREDERICK LEE HARVEY, Director of Cross-Country/Track and Field

JANET HARVEY, Wife

HANNAH VIVIAN PETERSON, Assistant Coach of Cross-Country/Distance, a single woman

JAMES L. LI, Associate Head Coach of Cross-Country/Distance

JEAN WANG, Wife

JAMES L. FRANCES, Senior Associate Director of Athletics/Track and Field

TAMMY FRANCES, Wife

KIM HANSON BARNES, Executive Senior Associate Director of Athletics

ANDREW BARNES, Husband

DAVID WOOD HEEKE, Director of Athletics

ELIZABETH PANGBORN HEEKE, Wife

BENJAMIN JAMES CRAWFORD, Associate Athletics Trainer, a single man

CARLOS VILLAREAL, Student

HUNTER DAVILA, Student

Cheyenne, WY 82001

JAMES L. FRANCIS, Senior Associate Director of Athletics/Track and Field at the University of Arizona

TAMMI FRANCIS, Wife

ERIKA KIM HANSON BARNES, Executive Senior Associate Director of Athletics at the University of Arizona

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

William G. Walker

Attorney at William G. Walker, P.C.

177 N. Church Avenue, Suite 807

Tucson, AZ 85701

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Patricia Victory Waterkotte Esquire

Attorney at Rusing Lopez & Lizardi, PLLC

6363 North Swan Road, Suite 151

Tucson, AZ 85718

Hunter Davila

1836 Crook Avenue

Cheyenne, WY 82001

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) William G. Walker Correspondence: Certificate of No Transcript. Date of service: 05/18/2022 [12450197] [22-15714] (Walker, William) [Entered: 05/18/2022 01:23 PM]

#3

(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Michael Grabowski Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/18/2022. [12450339] [22-15714] (Walker, William) [Entered: 05/18/2022 02:10 PM]

#6

(#6) Filed order MEDIATION (CL): The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. The court has scheduled a dial-in telephone assessment conference with counsel and Circuit Mediator Kyungah Suk at the date and time indicated above to explore settlement potential. Each attorney on the attached list of participants will receive an email with dial-in information. If there are any changes or additions to the list, please notify the Mediation Office at mediation@ca9.uscourts.gov. Also, if counsel has an unavoidable scheduling conflict, please notify Circuit Mediator Kyungah Suk immediately by email (Kay_Suk@ca9.uscourts.gov) and copy all counsel on any such communications...The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. (Date: June 15, 2022 Time: 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC TIME) (SEE ORDER FOR FULL TEXT) [12459971] (AF) [Entered: 05/31/2022 02:22 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • Docket(#8) Streamlined request [7] by Appellant Michael Grabowski to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Michael Grabowski opening brief due 08/10/2022. Appellees Arizona Board of Regents, Andrew Barnes, Erika Kim Hanson Barnes, Kim Hanson Barnes, Benjamin James Crawford, Hunter Davila, James L. Frances, Tammy Frances, James L. Francis, Tammi Francis, Frederick Lee Harvey, Janet Harvey, David Wood Heeke, Elizabeth Pangborn Heeke, James L. Li, Hannah Vivian Peterson, University of Arizona, Carlos Villareal and Jean Wang answering brief due 09/09/2022. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12472415] (DLM) [Entered: 06/15/2022 05:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Michael Grabowski. New requested due date is 08/10/2022. [12471386] [22-15714] (Walker, William) [Entered: 06/15/2022 08:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed order MEDIATION (CL): The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. The court has scheduled a dial-in telephone assessment conference with counsel and Circuit Mediator Kyungah Suk at the date and time indicated above to explore settlement potential. Each attorney on the attached list of participants will receive an email with dial-in information. If there are any changes or additions to the list, please notify the Mediation Office at mediation@ca9.uscourts.gov. Also, if counsel has an unavoidable scheduling conflict, please notify Circuit Mediator Kyungah Suk immediately by email (Kay_Suk@ca9.uscourts.gov) and copy all counsel on any such communications...The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. (Date: June 15, 2022 Time: 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC TIME) (SEE ORDER FOR FULL TEXT) [12459971] (AF) [Entered: 05/31/2022 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • Docket(#5) Deleted Incorrect Entry [12457479] (CL) [Entered: 05/26/2022 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/18/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12450839]. [22-15714] (AD) [Entered: 05/18/2022 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Michael Grabowski Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/18/2022. [12450339] [22-15714] (Walker, William) [Entered: 05/18/2022 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) William G. Walker Correspondence: Certificate of No Transcript. Date of service: 05/18/2022 [12450197] [22-15714] (Walker, William) [Entered: 05/18/2022 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Michael Grabowski Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/18/2022. Appellant Michael Grabowski opening brief due 07/11/2022. Appellees Arizona Board of Regents, Andrew Barnes, Erika Kim Hanson Barnes, Kim Hanson Barnes, Benjamin James Crawford, Hunter Davila, James L. Frances, Tammy Frances, James L. Francis, Tammi Francis, Frederick Lee Harvey, Janet Harvey, David Wood Heeke, Elizabeth Pangborn Heeke, James L. Li, Hannah Vivian Peterson, University of Arizona, Carlos Villareal and Jean Wang answering brief due 08/08/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12443975] (JMR) [Entered: 05/11/2022 11:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where University of Arizona is a litigant

Latest cases where Arizona Board of Regents is a litigant