This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/21/2022 at 05:23:24 (UTC).

Michael F. Henry v. USA, et al

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 Michael F Henry filed an Other lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1841

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

MICHAEL F. HENRY

Orland Park, IL 60462-0000

Defendant / Appellees

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

KWAME RAOUL

VILLAGE OF ORLAND PARK, ILLINOIS, a Municipal Government Under Illinois Law

ILLINOIS BAR ASSOCIATION

GREGORY K. HARRIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michael F. Henry

13233 Bundoran Court

Orland Park, IL 60462-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Ernest Yi Ling

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

219 S. Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60604-0000

Nadine J. Wichern

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

100 W. Randolph Street, State Of Illinois Center

Chicago, IL 60601-0000

Howard Charles Jablecki

Attorney at KLEIN, THORPE & JENKINS, LTD

20 N. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-2903

Matthew E. Szwajkowski

Attorney at O'HAGAN MEYER, LLC

One E. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601-2001

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case

1 #2

Fee Notice

1 #3

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #4

Notice to District Court

#3

(#3) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Michael F. Henry to dismiss case pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [3] [7236266] [22-1841] (CAH) [Entered: 05/16/2022 10:57 AM]

#4

(#4) ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellee's brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). [7236386] DW [4] [7236386] [22-1841] (FP) [Entered: 05/16/2022 02:23 PM]

#5

(#5) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Michael F. Henry. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [5] [7237314] [22-1841] (CAG) [Entered: 05/19/2022 11:29 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Michael F. Henry. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [5] [7237314] [22-1841] (CAG) [Entered: 05/19/2022 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellee's brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). [7236386] DW [4] [7236386] [22-1841] (FP) [Entered: 05/16/2022 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Michael F. Henry to dismiss case pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [3] [7236266] [22-1841] (CAH) [Entered: 05/16/2022 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • Docket(#2) THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Steven Weinhoeft and John R. Lausch, Jr. [2] [7236019] [22-1841] (HTP) [Entered: 05/13/2022 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) U.S. civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Michael Henry by 05/18/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 05/26/2022. Fee or IFP forms due on 05/26/2022 for Appellant Michael Henry. [1] [7236017] [22-1841] (HTP) [Entered: 05/13/2022 10:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Edward Szwajkowski(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard C. Jablecki

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ernest Yi Ling

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nadine J. Wichern