This case was last updated from PACER on 07/07/2019 at 06:05:23 (UTC).

Michael Davis v. L. Johnson, et al

Case Summary

On 05/08/2019 Michael Davis filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against L Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5133

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellees

United States of America

L. Johnson, Warden, CTF, DCDC

Petitioner / Appellant

Michael Lee Davis

Washington, DC 20011

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Elizabeth Trosman Esquire

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

USAO Appellate Counsel

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Suzanne Grealy Curt

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Michael Lee Davis

Attorney at Low Security Correctional Institution

920 Emerson Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20011

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1793711] filed resending Clerk orders [ # 1789332-6 ], [ # 1787370-5 ]. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court now due 07/22/2019. APPELLANT initial submissions, procedural and dispositive motions (if any) now due 07/22/2019. Any APPELLEE procedural and dispositive motions are now due 07/22/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5133] [Entered: 06/20/2019 01:18 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1791174] filed by USA [Service Date: 06/05/2019 ] [19-5133] (Curt, Suzanne) [Entered: 06/05/2019 02:09 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791172] filed by Suzanne Grealy Curt on behalf of Appellee USA. [19-5133] (Curt, Suzanne) [Entered: 06/05/2019 02:08 PM]

Open Document

LETTER [1789336] sent to warden sending Clerk order initial submissions for appellant/petitioner [ # 1789332-2 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 06/24/2019. [19-5133] [Entered: 05/24/2019 10:18 AM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1789332] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/24/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/24/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/24/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/24/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/24/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/24/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/24/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/24/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/08/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/24/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/24/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/24/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/08/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-5133] [Entered: 05/24/2019 10:15 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE [1789274] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court for certificate of appealability [COA Status: COA shall not issue] [19-5133] [Entered: 05/23/2019 04:38 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1787386] filed holding case in abeyance. Case 19-5133 held in abeyance pending COA decision in 1:18-cv-1897-JEB from U.S. District Court. The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order to the district court. [19-5133] [Entered: 05/10/2019 02:11 PM]

Open Document #2

form(s) sent

Open Document #1

Letter Sent

Open Document #2

form(s) sent

Open Document #1

Order Sent

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1786920] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-01897-JEB filed by Michael Lee Davis. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5133. [19-5133] [Entered: 05/08/2019 03:22 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • FIRST CLASS MAIL and CERTIFIED MAIL SENT [1793720] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7019 0700 0000 5269 0877] of order [ # 1793711-4 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 07/22/2019 from Michael Lee Davis. [19-5133] [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1793711] filed resending Clerk orders [ # 1789332-6 ], [ # 1787370-5 ]. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court now due 07/22/2019. APPELLANT initial submissions, procedural and dispositive motions (if any) now due 07/22/2019. Any APPELLEE procedural and dispositive motions are now due 07/22/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5133] [Entered: 06/20/2019 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1791174] filed by USA [Service Date: 06/05/2019 ] [19-5133] (Curt, Suzanne) [Entered: 06/05/2019 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791172] filed by Suzanne Grealy Curt on behalf of Appellee USA. [19-5133] (Curt, Suzanne) [Entered: 06/05/2019 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER [1789336] sent to warden sending Clerk order initial submissions for appellant/petitioner [ # 1789332-2 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 06/24/2019. [19-5133] [Entered: 05/24/2019 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1789332] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/24/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/24/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/24/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/24/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/24/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/24/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/24/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/24/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/08/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/24/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/24/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/24/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/08/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-5133] [Entered: 05/24/2019 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE [1789274] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court for certificate of appealability [COA Status: COA shall not issue] [19-5133] [Entered: 05/23/2019 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1787386] filed holding case in abeyance. Case 19-5133 held in abeyance pending COA decision in 1:18-cv-1897-JEB from U.S. District Court. The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order to the district court. [19-5133] [Entered: 05/10/2019 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER [1787374] sent to warden sending Clerk order [ # 1787370-5 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 06/10/2019. [19-5133] [Entered: 05/10/2019 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1787370] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 06/10/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-5133] [Entered: 05/10/2019 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1786920] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-01897-JEB filed by Michael Lee Davis. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5133. [19-5133] [Entered: 05/08/2019 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • US PRISONER CASE docketed. [19-5133] [Entered: 05/08/2019 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.