This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/27/2020 at 06:06:48 (UTC).

Michael Bruzzone v. Intel Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 Michael Bruzzone filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Intel Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-15326

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

INTEL CORPORATION, in concerted action with ARM Holdings plc & ARM Inc. executives and their corporate attorneys

ARM, INC.

ARM HOLDINGS

Plaintiff / Appellant

MICHAEL A. BRUZZONE

Richmond, CA 94803

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

William Faulkner

Attorney at Mcmanis Faulkner

50 W. San Fernando Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Brian Michael Affrunti Esquire

Attorney at Burke, Williams & Sorensen, LLP

1503 Grant Road

Mountain View, CA 94040

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michael A. Bruzzone

3766 Via Verdi

Richmond, CA 94803

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

2 #1

Fee Due OSC

#2

Main Document

2 #3

Additional Document

#3

#4

#5

6 #1

Main Document

6 #2

Additional Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: KWH): A review of the record reflects that this appeal may be frivolous. This court may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Within 35 days after the date of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), OR (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant does not respond to this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellant files a motion to dismiss the appeal, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). If appellant submits any response to this order other than a motion to dismiss the appeal, the court may dismiss this appeal as frivolous, without further notice. If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellees may file a response within 10 days after service of appellants statement. The briefing schedule for this appeal remains stayed. The Clerk shall serve on appellant: (1) a form motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, and (2) a form statement that the appeal should go forward. Appellant may use the enclosed forms for any motion to dismiss this appeal or statement that the appeal should go forward. [11668037] (WL) [Entered: 04/22/2020 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed Appellant Michael A. Bruzzone motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [11637007] (NAC) [Entered: 03/20/2020 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Received Appellant Michael A. Bruzzone notice of pending motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. [11629029] (NAC) [Entered: 03/13/2020 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed Appellant Michael A. Bruzzone motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [11618044] (RR) [Entered: 03/04/2020 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11614921] (CKP) [Entered: 03/02/2020 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Michael A. Bruzzone opening brief due 05/04/2020. Appellees ARM Holdings, ARM, Inc. and Intel Corporation answering brief due 06/04/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11611454] --[Edited 02/27/2020 by RT] (RT) [Entered: 02/27/2020 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arm Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where American Residential Holdings LLC is a litigant