This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2020 at 06:10:36 (UTC).

Michael Brown v. Kurt Picknell, et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 Michael Brown filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Kurt Picknell. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2904

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

S. SAX

JOHN DELANEY

J. S. SAWYERS

KEVIN WILLIAMS

KURT PICKNELL

Plaintiff / Appellant

MICHAEL K. BROWN

Redgranite, WI 54970-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Remzy D. Bitar

Attorney at ARENZ, MOLTER, MACY, RIFFLE & LARSON, S.C.

720 N. East Avenue Waukesha

Waukesha, WI 53186

Samantha R. Schmid

Attorney at MUNICIPAL LAW & LITIGATION GROUP, S.C.

730 N. Grand Avenue

Waukesha, WI 53186

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michael K. Brown

Attorney at REDGRANITE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

P.O. Box 925

Redgranite, WI 54970-0000

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER re: Motion requesting appointment of counsel and adjust brief deadlines, filed on 11/18/20. The appellants request to reconsider this courts denial of his request for counsel is DENIED. The appellants docketing statement was filed on October 23, 2020. Further,the appellants request for more time to file his opening brief is GRANTED, and this court will grant further reasonable requests for more time. Briefing shall proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 01/06/2021 for Michael K. Brown. Appellee's brief due on or before 02/05/2021 for John Delaney, Kurt Picknell, J. S. Sawyers, S. Sax and Kevin Williams. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 02/12/2021 for Appellant Michael K. Brown. [ # 11 ] [ # 11 ] SCR [12] [7123476] [20-2904] (FP) [Entered: 11/23/2020 12:25 PM]

#11

(#11) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Michael K. Brown to extend time to file appellant's brief and/or for appointment of counsel. [11] [7122568] [20-2904] (CAH) [Entered: 11/18/2020 02:35 PM]

#10

(#10) Order issued DENYING motion for recruitment of counsel . [ # 8 ] See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 649 (7th Cir. 2007); Farmer v. Haas, 990 F.2d 319, 321 (7th Cir. 1993). Briefing in the appeal will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 12/07/2020 for Michael K. Brown. Appellees' brief due on or before 01/06/2021 for John Delaney, Kurt Picknell, J. S. Sawyers, S. Sax and Kevin Williams. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 01/27/2021 for Appellant Michael K. Brown. SCR [10] [7117723] [20-2904] (ZNS) [Entered: 10/27/2020 03:37 PM]

#9

(#9) ORDER: Briefing in this appeal is SUSPENDED pending resolution of the motion for appointment of counsel filed by the appellant on October 23, 2020. CMD [9] [7117156] [20-2904] (CG) [Entered: 10/26/2020 08:46 AM]

#8

(#8) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Michael K. Brown for appointment of counsel. [8] [7117071] [20-2904] (MAN) [Entered: 10/23/2020 03:28 PM]

#7

(#7) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Michael K. Brown. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [7] [7117068] [20-2904] (CM) [Entered: 10/23/2020 03:26 PM]

#6

(#6) ORDER re: Motion for extension of time. The clerk has received confirmation that the appellant paid the $505.00 filing fee. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED to the extent that the appellant shall file the overdue Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement by November 19, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that briefing in this appeal will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 11/30/2020 for Michael K. Brown. Appellees' brief due on or before 12/30/2020 for John Delaney, Kurt Picknell, J. S. Sawyers, S. Sax and Kevin Williams. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 01/20/2021 for Appellant Michael K. Brown. [ # 5 ] CMD [7116032] [20-2904] (AG) [Entered: 10/20/2020 03:28 PM]

#5

(#5) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Michael K. Brown for extension of time. [5] [7115496] [20-2904] (CAH) [Entered: 10/16/2020 04:09 PM]

#4

(#4) FILED NOTICE FROM THE DISTRICT COURT THAT THE $505.00 APPELLATE FEE WAS RECEIVED. [4][7114596] [20-2904] (CM) [Entered: 10/14/2020 02:28 PM]

3 #2

Certificate of Service

3 #1

Disclosure Statement/Appearance

1 #4

PLRA Fee Notice DC

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Rights Case

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER re: Motion requesting appointment of counsel and adjust brief deadlines, filed on 11/18/20. The appellants request to reconsider this courts denial of his request for counsel is DENIED. The appellants docketing statement was filed on October 23, 2020. Further,the appellants request for more time to file his opening brief is GRANTED, and this court will grant further reasonable requests for more time. Briefing shall proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 01/06/2021 for Michael K. Brown. Appellee's brief due on or before 02/05/2021 for John Delaney, Kurt Picknell, J. S. Sawyers, S. Sax and Kevin Williams. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 02/12/2021 for Appellant Michael K. Brown. [ # 11 ] [ # 11 ] SCR [12] [7123476] [20-2904] (FP) [Entered: 11/23/2020 12:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Michael K. Brown to extend time to file appellant's brief and/or for appointment of counsel. [11] [7122568] [20-2904] (CAH) [Entered: 11/18/2020 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Order issued DENYING motion for recruitment of counsel . [ # 8 ] See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 649 (7th Cir. 2007); Farmer v. Haas, 990 F.2d 319, 321 (7th Cir. 1993). Briefing in the appeal will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 12/07/2020 for Michael K. Brown. Appellees' brief due on or before 01/06/2021 for John Delaney, Kurt Picknell, J. S. Sawyers, S. Sax and Kevin Williams. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 01/27/2021 for Appellant Michael K. Brown. SCR [10] [7117723] [20-2904] (ZNS) [Entered: 10/27/2020 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Briefing in this appeal is SUSPENDED pending resolution of the motion for appointment of counsel filed by the appellant on October 23, 2020. CMD [9] [7117156] [20-2904] (CG) [Entered: 10/26/2020 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Michael K. Brown for appointment of counsel. [8] [7117071] [20-2904] (MAN) [Entered: 10/23/2020 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Michael K. Brown. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [7] [7117068] [20-2904] (CM) [Entered: 10/23/2020 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER re: Motion for extension of time. The clerk has received confirmation that the appellant paid the $505.00 filing fee. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED to the extent that the appellant shall file the overdue Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement by November 19, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that briefing in this appeal will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 11/30/2020 for Michael K. Brown. Appellees' brief due on or before 12/30/2020 for John Delaney, Kurt Picknell, J. S. Sawyers, S. Sax and Kevin Williams. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 01/20/2021 for Appellant Michael K. Brown. [ # 5 ] CMD [7116032] [20-2904] (AG) [Entered: 10/20/2020 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Michael K. Brown for extension of time. [5] [7115496] [20-2904] (CAH) [Entered: 10/16/2020 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FILED NOTICE FROM THE DISTRICT COURT THAT THE $505.00 APPELLATE FEE WAS RECEIVED. [4][7114596] [20-2904] (CM) [Entered: 10/14/2020 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Remzy D. Bitar for Appellees John Delaney, Kurt Picknell, J. S. Sawyers, S. Sax and Kevin Williams. for Sgt Saultell, Sgt Craig, CO Bardecki, CO Schmidt and CO Phillips. Additional Parties: Sgt Saultell, Sgt Craig, CO Bardecki, CO Schmidt and CO Phillips. [3] [7112857] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2904] [Edited 10/06/2020 by CG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Bitar, Remzy) [Entered: 10/06/2020 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • Docket(#2) THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Sergeant Saultell, Sergeant Craig, CO Bardecki, CO Schmidt and CO Phillips. [2] [7112437] [20-2904] (ZNS) [Entered: 10/05/2020 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Michael K. Brown by 10/09/2020. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 11/02/2020. Transcript information sheet due by 10/16/2020. [1] [7112429] [20-2904] (ZNS) [Entered: 10/05/2020 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael K. Brown