This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/08/2021 at 20:37:26 (UTC).

Michael Becker, et al v. Delek US Energy, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2020 Michael Becker filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Delek US Energy, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-6258

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

MICHAEL J. BECKER

FREDDY ROJAS

Intervenors

KESTREL FIELD SERVICES, INC.

CYPRESS ENVIRONMENTAL MANAGEMENT-TIR, LLC

Defendant / Appellant

DELEK US ENERGY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Andrew W. Dunlap

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Julianne Lomax

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Richard J. Burch

Attorney at Bruckner Burch

8 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1500

Houston, TX 77046

Charles Peter Yezbak III

Attorney at Law Offices

P.O. Box 159033

Nashville, TN 37215-9937

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Bryan E. Bowdler

Attorney at Kullman Law Offices

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1600

New Orleans, LA 70163

Robert Peter Lombardi

Attorney at Kullman Law Offices

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1600

New Orleans, LA 70163

Sam Zurik III

Attorney at The Kullman Firm

P.O. Box 60118

New Orleans, LA 70160

 

Court Documents

#4

#1

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#13

#14

#15

#16

#17

#18

#19

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Bryan E. Bowdler for Delek US Energy, Inc.. Certificate of Service: 01/11/2021. Argument Request: not requested. [20-6258] (BEB) [Entered: 01/11/2021 06:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RULING LETTER SENT granting appellant's motion to extend time to file brief by seven (7) [ # 17 ] filed by Mr. Bryan E. Bowdler., resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 01/11/2021. (SSS) [Entered: 12/21/2020 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION filed by Mr. Bryan E. Bowdler for Delek US Energy, Inc. to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 12/21/2020. [20-6258] (BEB) [Entered: 12/21/2020 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Delek US Energy, Inc. by Samuel Zurik III. Certificate of Service: 11/25/2020. [20-6258] (SZ) [Entered: 11/25/2020 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Delek US Energy, Inc. by Bryan Edward Bowdler. Certificate of Service: 11/25/2020. [20-6258] (BEB) [Entered: 11/25/2020 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 01/04/2021. Note: Once the appellant's briefs are filed in related cases, the cases will be consolidated and the appellee's briefing will be set. (SSS) [Entered: 11/25/2020 01:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Michael J. Becker and Freddy Rojas by Julianne C Lomax. Certificate of Service: 11/25/2020. [20-6258] (JL) [Entered: 11/25/2020 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • Docket(#12) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Bryan E. Bowdler for Delek US Energy, Inc.. Certificate of Service: 11/25/2020. [20-6258] (BEB) [Entered: 11/25/2020 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE: The initial transcript order has not been completed. If not completed by 11/30/2020 further action will be taken. (SSS) [Entered: 11/25/2020 08:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Richard J. Burch for Appellees Michael J. Becker and Freddy Rojas Certificate of Service: 11/24/2020. [20-6258] (RJB) [Entered: 11/24/2020 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Michael J. Becker and Freddy Rojas by Richard J. (Rex) Burch. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2020. [20-6258] (RJB) [Entered: 11/24/2020 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Michael J. Becker and Freddy Rojas by Charles P. Yezbak, III. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2020. [20-6258] (CPY) [Entered: 11/23/2020 06:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Robert Peter Lombardi for Appellant Delek US Energy, Inc. Certificate of Service: 11/19/2020. [20-6258] (RPL) [Entered: 11/19/2020 11:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Robert Peter Lombardi for Appellant Delek US Energy, Inc... Certificate of Service: 11/19/2020. [20-6258] (RPL) [Entered: 11/19/2020 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Delek US Energy, Inc. by Robert P. Lombardi. Certificate of Service: 11/18/2020. [20-6258] (RPL) [Entered: 11/18/2020 05:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 12/03/2020 at 2:00 PM (ET) with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [20-6252, 20-6255, 20-6258] (LMR) [Entered: 11/05/2020 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • Docket(#3) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 11/05/2020 01:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Sharday Swain (SSS) [Entered: 11/04/2020 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Delek US Energy, Inc.. Transcript needed: y. (SSS) [Entered: 11/04/2020 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Delek US Energy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Kestrel Field Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bryan E. Bowdler