This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/08/2021 at 20:37:18 (UTC).

Michael Becker, et al v. Delek US Energy, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2020 Michael Becker filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Delek US Energy, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-6252

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

 

Party Details

Defendant

DELEK US ENERGY, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellees

MICHAEL J. BECKER

FREDDY ROJAS

Intervenors

KESTREL FIELD SERVICES, INC.

CYPRESS ENVIRONMENTAL MANAGEMENT-TIR, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Andrew W. Dunlap

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Julianne Lomax

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Richard J. Burch

Attorney at Bruckner Burch

8 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1500

Houston, TX 77046

Charles Peter Yezbak III

Attorney at Law Offices

P.O. Box 159033

Nashville, TN 37215-9937

Intervenor Attorneys

Gregory Scott Fiddler

Attorney at Jackson Walker

1401 Mckinney Street, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77010

Jennifer Vosko Caughey

Attorney at Jackson Walker

1401 Mckinney Street, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77010

Jaclyn Catherine Staple

Attorney at Jackson Walker

1401 Mckinney Street, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 03/19/2021. Note: Once the appellant's briefs are filed in related cases, the cases will be consolidated and the appellee's briefing will be set. (LMR) [Entered: 02/24/2021 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Follow-up Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 03/08/2021 at 12:00 PM (ET) with John A. Minter and Counsel in CA No. 20-6252 ONLY. [Please open notice for important details.] (LMR) [Entered: 02/24/2021 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 03/05/2021. Note: Once the appellant's briefs are filed in related cases, the cases will be consolidated and the appellee's briefing will be set. (LMR) [Entered: 02/09/2021 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Follow-up Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 02/24/2021 at 12:00 PM (ET) with John A. Minter and Counsel in CA No. 20-6252 ONLY. [Please open notice for important details.] (LMR) [Entered: 02/09/2021 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Follow-up Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 02/09/2021 at 11:00 AM (ET) with John A. Minter and Counsel in CA No. 20-6252 ONLY. [Please open notice for important details.] (LMR) [Entered: 02/01/2021 05:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 02/19/2021. Note: Once the appellant's briefs are filed in related cases, the cases will be consolidated and the appellee's briefing will be set. (LMR) [Entered: 01/08/2021 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Follow-up Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 02/01/2021 at 1:00 PM (ET) with John A. Minter and Counsel in CA No. 20-6252 ONLY. [Please open notice for important details.] (LMR) [Entered: 01/08/2021 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Kestrel Field Services, Inc. by Jennifer Caughey. Certificate of Service: 12/28/2020. [20-6252] (JVC) [Entered: 12/28/2020 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Follow-up Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 01/08/2021 at 2:00 PM (ET) with John A. Minter and Counsel in CA No. 20-6252 ONLY. [Please open notice for important details.] (LMR) [Entered: 12/17/2020 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MEDIATOR LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 17 ] filed by Ms. Jaclyn Catherine Staple, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 01/19/2021. Note: Once the appellant's briefs are filed in related cases, the cases will be consolidated and the appellee's briefing will be set. (LMR) [Entered: 12/09/2020 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Gregory Scott Fiddler for Appellant Kestrel Field Services, Inc. Certificate of Service: 11/17/2020. [20-6252] (GSF) [Entered: 11/17/2020 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Gregory Scott Fiddler for Appellant Kestrel Field Services, Inc... Certificate of Service: 11/17/2020. [20-6252] (GSF) [Entered: 11/17/2020 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Kestrel Field Services, Inc. by Jaclyn C. Staple. Certificate of Service: 11/16/2020. [20-6252] (JCS) [Entered: 11/16/2020 10:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTIFICATION of PACER docket error for appearance form , [ # 6 ], filed by Mr. Gregory Scott Fiddler for Kestrel Field Services, Inc.. Attorneys must use their personal PACER account to file any document and are not permitted to use their account to file on behalf of another attorney. Please refile using your own account within 24 hours. (SSS) [Entered: 11/16/2020 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) **LOCKED**APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Kestrel Field Services, Inc. by Jaclyn C. Staple. Certificate of Service: 11/16/2020. [20-6252]-Attorneys must use their personal PACER account to file any document and are not permitted to use their account to file on behalf of another attorney.--[Edited 11/16/2020 by SSS] (GSF) [Entered: 11/16/2020 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Kestrel Field Services, Inc. by Gregory Scott Fiddler. Certificate of Service: 11/16/2020. [20-6252] (GSF) [Entered: 11/16/2020 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 12/03/2020 at 2:00 PM (ET) with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [20-6252, 20-6255, 20-6258] (LMR) [Entered: 11/05/2020 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • Docket(#3) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 11/05/2020 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Sharday Swain (SSS) [Entered: 11/04/2020 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Kestrel Field Services, Inc.. Transcript needed: y. (SSS) [Entered: 11/04/2020 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Delek US Energy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Vosko Caughey