This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/24/2021 at 06:14:03 (UTC).

Michael Aitkin v. USI Insurance Services, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Michael Aitkin filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against USI Insurance Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-35497

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Appellant

MICHAEL AITKIN

Counter Claimants

KIBBLE & PRENTICE HOLDING COMPANY, a foreign corporation, DBA USI Insurance Services Northwest

USI INSURANCE SERVICES, LLC, a foreign limited liability company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

William Wood

Attorney at Sussman Shank LLP

1000 Sw Broadway, Suite 1400

Portland, OR 97205

Seth M. Gerber Esquire

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

David Bruce Salmons Esquire

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Debra L. Fischer Esquire

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Robert A. Lewis

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

One Market Street, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

Jason York Hoo Siu

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Peter J. Rusthoven Esquire

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg

11 S Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Bruce L. Campbell

Attorney at Miller Nash, LLP

111 Sw 5Th Avenue, Suite 3400

Portland, OR 97204

Ivan Resendiz Gutierrez

Attorney at Miller Nash, LLP

111 Sw 5Th Avenue, Suite 3400

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#2

#3

#10

#15

18 #1

ER Index Volume

18 #2

ER Volume 1

18 #3

ER Volume 2

#22

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • Docket(#23) Filed (ECF) UNDER SEAL Appellees Kibble & Prentice Holding Company and USI Insurance Services, LLC motion to maintain document under seal. Date of service: 08/13/2021. [12201684] [21-35497] (Resendiz Gutierrez, Ivan) [Entered: 08/13/2021 05:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Filed (ECF) Appellees Kibble & Prentice Holding Company and USI Insurance Services, LLC Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 09/03/2021. Date of service: 08/05/2021. [12193061] [21-35497] (Resendiz Gutierrez, Ivan) [Entered: 08/05/2021 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • Docket(#21) Added Attorney(s) Peter J. Rusthoven for party(s) Appellee USI Insurance Services, LLC Appellee Kibble & Prentice Holding Company, in case 21-35497. [12189610] (NAC) [Entered: 08/02/2021 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • Docket(#20) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Peter J. Rusthoven (Barnes & Thornburg LLP, 11 South Meridian Street, Indianapolis, IN 46204) for Appellees Kibble & Prentice Holding Company and USI Insurance Services, LLC. Date of service: 08/02/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12189606] [21-35497] (Rusthoven, Peter) [Entered: 08/02/2021 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • Docket(#19) Filed (ECF) UNDER SEAL Appellant Michael Aitkin motion to file document under seal and submit sealed document. Type of document: excerpts of record. Date of service: 07/23/2021. [12181801] [21-35497]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected PDF of the motion and volume 4 of the excerpts. 07/30/2021 by KWG] (Salmons, David) [Entered: 07/23/2021 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Michael Aitkin. Date of service: 07/23/2021. [12181797] [21-35497]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected PDF of vols 1-2. 07/30/2021 by KWG] (Salmons, David) [Entered: 07/23/2021 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • Docket(#17) Filed (ECF) UNDER SEAL Appellant Michael Aitkin notice of intent to unseal previously sealed material. Material: brief. Date of service: 07/23/2021. [12181794] [21-35497]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected PDF of the brief and notice. 07/30/2021 by KWG] (Salmons, David) [Entered: 07/23/2021 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • Docket(#16) Filed (ECF) UNDER SEAL Appellant Michael Aitkin notice of intent to unseal previously sealed material. Material: excerpts of record. Date of service: 07/23/2021. [12181394] [21-35497]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached PDF of volume 3 of the excerpts and corrected notice. 07/30/2021 by KWG] (Salmons, David) [Entered: 07/23/2021 12:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12164271] (BLS) [Entered: 07/06/2021 05:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • Docket(#14) Added Attorney William Wood for Appellant Michael Aitkin, in case 21-35497. [12162186] (HH) [Entered: 07/02/2021 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellant Michael Aitkin Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/29/2021. [12158353] [21-35497] (Gerber, Seth) [Entered: 06/29/2021 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Bruce L. Campbell (Miller Nash LLP, 111 SW Fifth Ave, Ste 3400, Portland, OR 97204) for Appellees Kibble & Prentice Holding Company and USI Insurance Services, LLC. Date of service: 06/29/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12158309] [21-35497] (Campbell, Bruce) [Entered: 06/29/2021 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docket(#8) Added Attorney(s) Jason York Hoo Siu for party(s) Appellant Michael Aitkin, in case 21-35497. [12157401] (QDL) [Entered: 06/29/2021 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jason Y. Siu (Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP, 1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20004) for Appellant Michael Aitkin. Date of service: 06/29/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12157399] [21-35497] (Siu, Jason) [Entered: 06/29/2021 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docket(#6) Added Attorney(s) David Bruce Salmons for party(s) Appellant Michael Aitkin, in case 21-35497. [12157125] (QDL) [Entered: 06/29/2021 09:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of David B. Salmons (Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP, 1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20004) for Appellant Michael Aitkin. Date of service: 06/29/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12157073] [21-35497] (Salmons, David) [Entered: 06/29/2021 09:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/28/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12156948]. [21-35497] (AD) [Entered: 06/29/2021 06:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellees Kibble & Prentice Holding Company and USI Insurance Services, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/28/2021. [12156897] [21-35497] (Resendiz Gutierrez, Ivan) [Entered: 06/28/2021 08:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): The appeal filed June 25, 2021, is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than July 23, 2021; the answering brief is due August 20, 2021 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [12155185] (RT) [Entered: 06/25/2021 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows:. to be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. C.R. 3-3. [12154567] (RT) [Entered: 06/25/2021 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USI Insurance Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert A Lewis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seth M Gerber