This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/05/2020 at 06:09:58 (UTC).

Mi Familia Vota, et al v. Katie Hobbs, et al

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 Mi Familia Vota filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against Katie Hobbs. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-16932

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

ARIZONA COALITION FOR CHANGE

MI FAMILIA VOTA

ULISES VENTURA

Intervenor

STATE OF ARIZONA

Intervenor Defendant / Appellants

REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE

NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant / Appellant

KATIE HOBBS, in her official capacity as Arizona Secretary of State

Amicus Curiae

THE HONEST ELECTIONS PROJECT

GOVERNOR DOUGLAS A. DUCEY, KAREN FANN, RUSSELL BOWERS, ROBYN STALLWORTH POUQUETTE, LESLIE HOFFMAN, SADIE JO BINGHAM, VIRGINIA ROSS, DAVID STEVENS, KRISTI BLAIR, RICHARD GARCIA, F. ANN RODRIGUEZ, EDISON J. WAUNEKA, AND WENDY JOHN

LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF ARIZONA, PHOENIX INDIAN CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Mary O'Grady

Attorney at Osborn Maledon, PA

2929 N. Central Avenue, Suite 2100

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Joshua Bendor

Attorney at Osborn Maledon, PA

2929 N. Central Avenue, Suite 2100

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Ronald A. Fein

Attorney at Free Speech For People

1320 Centre Street, Suite 405

Newton, MA 02459

Nicholas Bourland

Attorney at Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP

600 Fifth Avenue, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Zoe Salzman

Attorney at Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP

600 Fifth Avenue, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Matthew D. Brinckerhoff

Attorney at Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP

600 Fifth Avenue, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Jonathan S. Abady

Attorney at Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP

600 Fifth Avenue, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

John C. Bonifaz

Attorney at Free Speech For People

1320 Centre Street, Suite 405

Newton, MA 02459

Gillian Robin Cassell-Stiga Esquire

Attorney at Free Speech For People

1320 Centre Street, Suite 405

Newton, MA 02459

Intervenor Attorneys

Brunn W. Roysden III

Attorney at Arizona Attorney General's Office

2005 N. Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Drew C. Ensign

Attorney at Arizona Attorney General's Office

2005 N. Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Michael S. Catlett

Attorney at Arizona Attorney General's Office

2005 N. Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Jennifer J. Wright

Attorney at Arizona Attorney General's Office

2005 N. Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Intervenor Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Thomas J. Basile

Attorney at Statecraft PLLC

649 N 4Th Avenue, Suite B

Phoenix, AZ 85003

Kory A. Langhofer

Attorney at Statecraft PLLC

649 N 4Th Avenue, Suite B

Phoenix, AZ 85003

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Roopali H. Desai

Attorney at Coppersmith Brockelman PLC

2800 North Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

David Andrew Gaona Esquire

Attorney at Coppersmith Brockelman PLC

2800 North Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Kristen Michelle Yost

Attorney at Coppersmith Brockelman PLC

2800 North Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Jason Brett Torchinsky Esquire

Attorney at Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky, PLLC

15405 John Marshall Highway

Haymarket, VA 20169

Brett William Johnson

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.

One Arizona Center, 400 East Van Buren Street

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#53

#52

#51

#48

#47

#46

56 #2

Additional Document

56 #1

Main Document

#2

5 #2

Additional Document

5 #1

Main Document

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 56 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) League of Women Voters of Arizona and Phoenix Indian Center Motion to become amicus curiae. Date of service: 10/14/2020. [11858980] [20-16932, 20-17000] (Elias, Jordan) [Entered: 10/14/2020 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Filed Order for PUBLICATION (WILLIAM A. FLETCHER, MARSHA S. BERZON and JAY S. BYBEE) (Partial dissent by Judge Bybee) We thus grant the Secretary of States specific request for a prospective stay, with a two-day grace period. So ORDERED. [11857294]--[Edited (Corrected to add in 20-17000)10/13/2020 by AKM]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 20-17000. 10/14/2020 by SLM]--[Edited (attached reformatted PDF) 10/20/2020 by AKM] (AKM) [Entered: 10/13/2020 06:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Filed (ECF) Intervenor - Pending State of Arizona Correspondence: State of Arizona's notice of objection to the proposed settlement of Plaintiffs and Secretary Hobbs.. Date of service: 10/13/2020 [11856956] [20-16932] (Ensign, Drew) [Entered: 10/13/2020 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Filed (ECF) Appellants National Republican Senatorial Committee and Republican National Committee Correspondence: Notice in Response to Stipulation. Date of service: 10/13/2020 [11856952] [20-16932] (Basile, Thomas) [Entered: 10/13/2020 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Filed (ECF) Appellee Katie Hobbs Correspondence: Notice of Stipulation. Date of service: 10/13/2020 [11856774] [20-16932] (Desai, Roopali) [Entered: 10/13/2020 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docket(#50) Entered appearance of Amici Curiae - Pending League of Women Voters of Arizona, Phoenix Indian Center and Douglas A. Ducey. [11855927] (KT) [Entered: 10/13/2020 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Filed (ECF) Appellee Katie Hobbs Correspondence: Notice of Appeal filed in lower court.. Date of service: 10/12/2020 [11855209] [20-16932] (Desai, Roopali) [Entered: 10/12/2020 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Filed order (WILLIAM A. FLETCHER, MARSHA S. BERZON and JAY S. BYBEE) We have received the statement of position filed by the Secretary of State, confirming the Secretarys intent to appeal the district courts October 5, 2020 order and requesting to appear at oral argument on the pending emergency matters. We modify the allocation of time during todays oral argument as follows: The Secretary of State will be allotted 10 minutes of argument time. The Republican National Committee and National Republican Senatorial Committee will be allotted 10 total minutes of argument time. The State of Arizona will be allotted 10 minutes of argument time. Appellees will be allotted 30 total minutes of argument time. If the Secretary of State files a notice of appeal prior to the start of todays oral argument, the argument will focus principally on the merits of the emergency stay motions. [11855138] (SVG) [Entered: 10/12/2020 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Filed (ECF) Appellee Katie Hobbs response to Court order dated 10/09/2020. Date of service: 10/11/2020. [11855089] [20-16932] (Desai, Roopali) [Entered: 10/11/2020 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Filed (ECF) Intervenor - Pending State of Arizona reply to response (motion to stay lower court action). Date of service: 10/10/2020. [11855073] [20-16932] (Ensign, Drew) [Entered: 10/10/2020 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of D. Andrew Gaona (Coppersmith Brockelman PLC, 2800 N Central Ave, Suite 1900, Phoenix, AZ 85004) for Appellee Katie Hobbs. Substitution for Kara Marie Karlson for Appellee Katie Hobbs and Linley Wilson for Appellee Katie Hobbs. Date of service: 10/07/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11850294] [20-16932] (Gaona, David) [Entered: 10/07/2020 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Roopali Hardin Desai (Coppersmith Brockelman PLC, 2800 N Central Ave, Suite 1900, Phoenix, AZ 85004) for Appellee Katie Hobbs. Substitution for Kara Marie Karlson for Appellee Katie Hobbs and Linley Wilson for Appellee Katie Hobbs. Date of service: 10/07/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11850257] [20-16932] (Desai, Roopali) [Entered: 10/07/2020 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellees Arizona Coalition for Change, Mi Familia Vota and Ulises Ventura response opposing motion ([ # 5 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 5 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 10/07/2020. [11850207] [20-16932] (Salzman, Zoe) [Entered: 10/07/2020 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docket(#7) Entered appearance of Intervenor - Pending State of Arizona. [11850166] (RR) [Entered: 10/07/2020 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellants National Republican Senatorial Committee and Republican National Committee reply to response (). Date of service: 10/06/2020. [11850015] [20-16932] (Basile, Thomas) [Entered: 10/06/2020 11:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) State of Arizona Motion to intervene. Date of service: 10/06/2020. [11850014] [20-16932] (Roysden, Brunn) [Entered: 10/06/2020 10:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellees Arizona Coalition for Change, Mi Familia Vota and Ulises Ventura reply to response (motion to stay lower court action). Date of service: 10/06/2020. [11850008] [20-16932] (Salzman, Zoe) [Entered: 10/06/2020 08:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellants National Republican Senatorial Committee and Republican National Committee EMERGENCY Motion to stay lower court action. Date of service: 10/06/2020. [11849940] [20-16932] (Basile, Thomas) [Entered: 10/06/2020 05:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellees Arizona Coalition for Change, Mi Familia Vota and Ulises Ventura Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 10/06/2020. [11849807] [20-16932] (Salzman, Zoe) [Entered: 10/06/2020 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants National Republican Senatorial Committee and Republican National Committee Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/13/2020. Transcript ordered by 11/04/2020. Transcript due 12/04/2020. Appellants National Republican Senatorial Committee and Republican National Committee opening brief due 01/13/2021. Appellees Arizona Coalition for Change, Katie Hobbs, Mi Familia Vota and Ulises Ventura answering brief due 02/12/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11848680] (JBS) [Entered: 10/06/2020 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Honest Elections Project is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brett William Johnson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Torchinsky