This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/18/2023 at 06:11:14 (UTC).

MGM Grand Hotel v. Kevin Sheng Long

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 MGM Grand Hotel filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Kevin Sheng Long. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-16950

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

MGM GRAND HOTEL, DBA MGM Grand

Defendant / Appellant

KEVIN CHANG SHENG LONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Jarrod Lee Rickard

Attorney at Semenza Kircher Rickard

10161 Park Run Drive, Suite 150

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Christopher D. Kircher

Attorney at Semenza Kircher Rickard

10161 Park Run Drive, Suite 150

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Katie Lynn Cannata

Attorney at Semenza Kircher Rickard

10161 Park Run Drive, Suite 150

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Lawrence John Semenza Esquire III

Attorney at Semenza Kircher Rickard

10161 Park Run Drive, Suite 150

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Lawrence C. Hill Esquire

Attorney at Law Office of Lawrence Hill

3430 E. Flamingo Road, Suite 232

Las Vegas, NV 89121

Aparna S. Mathur

Attorney at Bird Marella, PC

1875 Century Park, E, 23Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Ekwan E. Rhow

Attorney at Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks, Lincenberg & Rhow, PC

1875 Century Park, E, 23Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2561

Ray Sebastian Seilie

Attorney at Bird Marella, PC

1875 Century Park, E, 23Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12624575] (BLS) [Entered: 01/06/2023 10:45 AM]

#3

(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Kevin Chang Sheng Long Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/06/2023. [12624849] [22-16950] (Hill, Lawrence) [Entered: 01/06/2023 01:56 PM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 01/26/2023, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12629111] (VS) [Entered: 01/12/2023 09:55 AM]

#12

(#12) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12643341] (VS) [Entered: 01/31/2023 02:59 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • Docket(#16) Added Attorney(s) Katie Lynn Cannata for party(s) Appellee MGM Grand Hotel. [12649152] (RL) [Entered: 02/08/2023 02:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • Docket(#15) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Katie L. Cannata (Semenza Kircher Rickard, 10161 Park Run Drive, Suite 150, Las Vegas, Nevada 89145) for Appellee MGM Grand Hotel. Date of service: 02/08/2023. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12649122] [22-16950] (Cannata, Katie) [Entered: 02/08/2023 01:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • Docket(#14) Added Attorney(s) Aparna S. Mathur for party(s) Appellant Kevin Chang Sheng Long. [12647960] (RL) [Entered: 02/07/2023 11:31 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • Docket(#13) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Aparna S. Mathur (Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks, Lincenberg & Rhow P.C, 1875 Century Park East, 23rd Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90067-2561) for Appellant Kevin Chang Sheng Long. Date of service: 02/07/2023. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12647928] [22-16950] (Mathur, Aparna) [Entered: 02/07/2023 11:15 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12643341] (VS) [Entered: 01/31/2023 02:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • Docket(#11) Streamlined request [10] by Appellant Kevin Chang Sheng Long to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Kevin Chang Sheng Long opening brief due 03/20/2023. Appellee MGM Grand Hotel answering brief due 04/19/2023. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12641837] (JN) [Entered: 01/30/2023 11:34 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Kevin Chang Sheng Long. New requested due date is 03/20/2023. [12640443] [22-16950] (Seilie, Ray) [Entered: 01/27/2023 10:13 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • Docket(#9) Added Attorney(s) Ekwan E. Rhow for party(s) Appellant Kevin Chang Sheng Long. [12640402] (RL) [Entered: 01/27/2023 09:54 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Ekwan E. Rhow (Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks, Lincenberg & Rhow, 1875 Century Park East, 23rd Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90067-2561) for Appellant Kevin Chang Sheng Long. Date of service: 01/27/2023. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12640388] [22-16950] (Rhow, Ekwan) [Entered: 01/27/2023 09:46 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • Docket(#7) Added Attorney(s) Ray Sebastian Seilie for party(s) Appellant Kevin Chang Sheng Long. [12640386] (RL) [Entered: 01/27/2023 09:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Ray S. Seilie (Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks, Lincenberg & Rhow, 1875 Century Park East, 23rd Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90067-2561) for Appellant Kevin Chang Sheng Long. Date of service: 01/27/2023. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12640373] [22-16950] (Seilie, Ray) [Entered: 01/27/2023 09:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 01/26/2023, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12629111] (VS) [Entered: 01/12/2023 09:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/06/2023. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12625256]. [22-16950] (AD) [Entered: 01/06/2023 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Kevin Chang Sheng Long Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/06/2023. [12624849] [22-16950] (Hill, Lawrence) [Entered: 01/06/2023 01:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12624575] (BLS) [Entered: 01/06/2023 10:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Kevin Chang Sheng Long Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/27/2022. Appellant Kevin Chang Sheng Long opening brief due 02/17/2023. Appellee MGM Grand Hotel answering brief due 03/20/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12614772] (JMR) [Entered: 12/20/2022 11:04 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less