This case was last updated from PACER on 12/24/2020 at 05:24:03 (UTC).

Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. v. Wyeth LLC

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 Merck Sharp Dohme Corp filed an Other lawsuit against Wyeth LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1453

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.

Appellee

WYETH LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Arlene L. Chow

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

885 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Appellee Attorney

John P. Scheibeler

Attorney at White & Case LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 12/16/2020. [744852] Entry of Appearance is due 01/05/2021. Certificate of Interest is due 01/05/2021. Docketing Statement is due 01/05/2021. Certified List is due 02/01/2021. [KMH] [Entered: 12/22/2020 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WYETH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John P. Scheibeler