This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/12/2022 at 06:14:09 (UTC).

Mendoza, et al v. Macias, et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2022 Mendoza filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Macias. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-2013

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

GEORGE MENDOZA

Las Cruces, NM 88001-0000

RON ROWLETT

Las Cruces, NM 88012

Defendant / Appellees

FERNANDO MACIAS, County Manager Dona Ana County

DONA ANA COUNTY

NELSON GOODIN, County Attorney Dona Ana County

LETICA DUARTE BENAVIDEZ, County Assessor Dona Ana County

AMANDA LOPES, County Clerk Dona Ana County

GERALDO PEREIRA, Document Specialist

DONA ANA COUNTY COMMISSIONER

LYNN ELLIS, Commissioners District 1

DIANA MORELLO, Commissioners District 2

SHANNON REYNOLDS, Commissoners District 3

SUSANA CHAPARRAL, Commisioners District 4

JUDGE MANUAL ARRIETTA

THIRD JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT

JUDGE JAMES MARTIN

MARK DE ANTONIO, District Attorney Dona Ana County

DONA ANA TITLE COMPANY, AKA First American Title Company

SHAWNA BLOUNT, President, of First American Title Company

SYLVIA LAUER, Vice President-First American Title Company

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

George Mendoza

1830 Baldwin Drive

Las Cruces, NM 88001-0000

Ron Rowlett

2229 Stone Pine Drive

Las Cruces, NM 88012

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Blaine T. Mynatt

Attorney at Mynatt Martinez Springer

P.O. Box 2699

Las Cruces, NM 88004-2699

Other Attorneys

Andrea McDonald Hicks

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer

1200 17Th Street, Suite 1900

Denver, CO 80202

Andrew Martin Jacobs

Attorney at Snell & Willmer

One Arizona Center, 400 East Van Buren, Suite 1900

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Jeanne Y. Sohn

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer

201 Third Street Nw, Suite 500

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Jan Timothy Chilton

Attorney at Severson & Werson

One Embarcadero Center, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Kerry Franich

Attorney at Severson & Werson

The Atrium, 19100 Von Karman Avenue, Suite 700

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

General Docketing Letter - Pro Se

Open Document

[10892965] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellants' brief due on 03/28/2022 for George Mendoza and Ron Rowlett. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 03/08/2022. [22-2013] [Entered: 02/15/2022 07:22 AM]

Open Document

[10892966] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Volume 1-pleadings. [22-2013] [Entered: 02/15/2022 07:27 AM]

Open Document

[10893014] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Andrew Martin Jacobs and Ms. Jeanne Y. Sohn for Bank of America, Brian Moynihan and Dominic Sullivan. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/15/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-2013] [Entered: 02/15/2022 09:37 AM]

Open Document

[10893714] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Blaine T. Mynatt for Mr. Nelson Goodin, Fernando Macias, Letica Duarte Benavidez, Amanda Lopes, Geraldo Pereira, Dona Ana County Commissioner, Lynn Ellis, Diana Morello, Shannon Reynolds and Susana Chaparral. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/17/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-2013] [Entered: 02/17/2022 11:06 AM]

Open Document

[10894325] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. George Mendoza. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/22/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-2013] [Entered: 02/22/2022 11:42 AM]

Open Document

[10896013] Entry of appearance filed by Kerry Franich for Dominic Sullivan, Brian Moynihan, and Bank of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/01/2022. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [22-2013] [Entered: 03/01/2022 12:02 PM]

Open Document

[10896540] Entry of appearance filed by Jan Timothy Chilton for Dominic Sullivan, Brian Moynihan, and Bank of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/03/2022. Manner of Service: U.S. Mail and email. [22-2013] [Entered: 03/03/2022 10:18 AM]

Open Document

[10898202] Appellants' motion filed by Mr. George Mendoza and Ron Rowlett for default judgment. Served on 03/08/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [22-2013] [Entered: 03/10/2022 01:56 PM]

Open Document #1

Brief

Open Document #2

Attachments

Open Document

[10898355] Order filed by Clerk of the Court denying Appellants' motion for default judgment filed by Appellants Mr. George Mendoza and Ron Rowlett. Served on 03/11/2022. [22-2013] See order for details. [Entered: 03/11/2022 09:24 AM]

Open Document

[10904754] Appellee/Respondent's brief filed by Bank of America, Brian Moynihan and Dominic Sullivan, Fernando Macias, Nelson Goodin, Leticia Duarte Benavidez, Amanda Lopez, Geraldo Pereira, Dona Ana County Commissioner, Lynn Ellis, Diana Morello, Shannon Reynolds, Susana Chaparro, and Manuel Sanchez. Served on: 04/06/2022. Manner of service: US mail. Oral argument requested? No. Word/page count: 3158. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-2013] KF [Entered: 04/06/2022 03:12 PM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • Docket[10905195] Paper copies of appellees' brief received from Manual Arrietta, Bank of America, Letica Duarte Benavidez, Shawna Blount, Susana Chaparral, Eric Cook, Mark De Antonio, Dona Ana County, Dona Ana County Commissioner, Dona Ana Title Company, Lynn Ellis, Patrick Gallagher, Nelson Goodin, Las Cruces Police Department, Sylvia Lauer, Amanda Lopes, Fernando Macias, James Martin, Diana Morello, Brian Moynihan, Geraldo Pereira, Shannon Reynolds, Dominic Sullivan and Third Judicial District Court. [22-2013] [Entered: 04/08/2022 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • Docket[10904758] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by appellees is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filing. Appellants' optional reply brief now due 05/02/2022 for Ron Rowlett and George Mendoza. Paper copies of appellees' brief due 04/13/2022 by Bank of America, Letica Duarte Benavidez, Susana Chaparral, Dona Ana County Commissioner, Lynn Ellis, Nelson Goodin, Amanda Lopes, Fernando Macias, Diana Morello, Brian Moynihan, Geraldo Pereira, Shannon Reynolds, Dominic Sullivan. (Text Only - No Attachment) [22-2013] [Entered: 04/06/2022 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10904754] Appellee/Respondent's brief filed by Bank of America, Brian Moynihan and Dominic Sullivan, Fernando Macias, Nelson Goodin, Leticia Duarte Benavidez, Amanda Lopez, Geraldo Pereira, Dona Ana County Commissioner, Lynn Ellis, Diana Morello, Shannon Reynolds, Susana Chaparro, and Manuel Sanchez. Served on: 04/06/2022. Manner of service: US mail. Oral argument requested? No. Word/page count: 3158. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-2013] KF [Entered: 04/06/2022 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10898355] Order filed by Clerk of the Court denying Appellants' motion for default judgment filed by Appellants Mr. George Mendoza and Ron Rowlett. Served on 03/11/2022. [22-2013] See order for details. [Entered: 03/11/2022 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10898343] Appellants' brief filed by Mr. George Mendoza and Ron Rowlett. Original and 4 copies. Served on 03/09/2022 by email.. Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? y. Appellee's brief due 04/08/2022 for Bank of America, Brian Moynihan, Dominic Sullivan, Fernando Macias, Nelson Goodin, Letica Duarte Benavidez, Amanda Lopes, Geraldo Pereira, Dona Ana County Commissioner, Lynn Ellis, Diana Morello, Shannon Reynolds and Susana Chaparral [22-2013] [Entered: 03/11/2022 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10898202] Appellants' motion filed by Mr. George Mendoza and Ron Rowlett for default judgment. Served on 03/08/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [22-2013] [Entered: 03/10/2022 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10896540] Entry of appearance filed by Jan Timothy Chilton for Dominic Sullivan, Brian Moynihan, and Bank of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/03/2022. Manner of Service: U.S. Mail and email. [22-2013] [Entered: 03/03/2022 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • Docket[10896535] Entry of appearance submitted by Jan T. Chilton, Severson & Werson, One Embarcadero Center, 26th Fl., San Francisco, CA 94111 for Appellees Bank of America, Brian Moynihan and Dominic Sullivan for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 03/03/2022. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [22-2013] --[Edited 03/03/2022 by AT - to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 3/3/2022.] JTC [Entered: 03/03/2022 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10896013] Entry of appearance filed by Kerry Franich for Dominic Sullivan, Brian Moynihan, and Bank of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/01/2022. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [22-2013] [Entered: 03/01/2022 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • Docket[10895990] Entry of appearance submitted by Kerry W. Franich and Jan T. Chilton for Appellees Bank of America, Brian Moynihan and Dominic Sullivan for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/23/2022. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [22-2013] --[Edited 03/01/2022 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 3/1/2022.] KF [Entered: 03/01/2022 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10894325] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. George Mendoza. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/22/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-2013] [Entered: 02/22/2022 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10893714] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Blaine T. Mynatt for Mr. Nelson Goodin, Fernando Macias, Letica Duarte Benavidez, Amanda Lopes, Geraldo Pereira, Dona Ana County Commissioner, Lynn Ellis, Diana Morello, Shannon Reynolds and Susana Chaparral. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/17/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-2013] [Entered: 02/17/2022 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • Docket[10893708] Entry of appearance submitted by Blaine T. Mynatt for Appellees Letica Duarte Benavidez, Susana Chaparral, Dona Ana County, Dona Ana County Commissioner, Lynn Ellis, Amanda Lopes, Fernando Macias, Geraldo Pereira, Diana Morello, Shannon Reynolds and Mr. Nelson Goodin, Manuel Sanchez for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/17/2022. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [22-2013] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 02/17/2022 by NA] BTM [Entered: 02/17/2022 10:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10893014] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Andrew Martin Jacobs and Ms. Jeanne Y. Sohn for Bank of America, Brian Moynihan and Dominic Sullivan. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/15/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-2013] [Entered: 02/15/2022 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • Docket[10893009] Entry of appearance submitted by Andrew M. Jacobs and Jeanne Y. Sohn for Appellees Bank of America, Brian Moynihan and Dominic Sullivan for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/15/2022. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [22-2013]--[Edited 02/15/2022 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 2/15/2022] AMJ [Entered: 02/15/2022 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10892966] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Volume 1-pleadings. [22-2013] [Entered: 02/15/2022 07:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10892965] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellants' brief due on 03/28/2022 for George Mendoza and Ron Rowlett. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 03/08/2022. [22-2013] [Entered: 02/15/2022 07:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10892548] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 02/11/2022. Notice of appearance due on 02/25/2022 for Bank of America, Letica Duarte Benavidez, Susana Chaparral, Dona Ana County Commisioner, Dona Ana Title Company, Lynn Ellis, Nelson Goodin, Amanda Lopes, Fernando Macias, Diana Morello, Brian Moynihan, Geraldo Pereira, Shannon Reynolds and Dominic Sullivan, and Notice of appearance due on 03/14/2022 for George Mendoza and Ron Rowlett. [22-2013] [Entered: 02/11/2022 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Third Judicial District Court is a litigant

Latest cases where First American Title Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Martin Jacobs

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrea McDonald Hicks