This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/17/2021 at 06:01:36 (UTC).

Melvin Walker v. PA Department of Transportatio

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 Melvin Walker filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against PA Department of Transportatio. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2325

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

MELVIN TRENT WALKER

Harrisburg, PA 17104

Defendant / Appellee

PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Melvin Trent Walker

2024 Chestnut Street

Harrisburg, PA 17104

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Claudia M. Tesoro Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1600 Arch Street, Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Jeffrey Mozdziock

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

21 South 12Th Street, 3Rd Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19107

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) RESPONSE on behalf of Appellant Melvin Trent Walker to Legal Division letter advising of possible dismissal [ # 3 ]. Certificate of Service dated 08/06/2021. Service made by US mail. (JK) [Entered: 08/11/2021 12:12 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Claudia M. Tesoro on behalf of Appellee(s) Pennsylvania Department of Transportation. [21-2325] (CMT) [Entered: 07/21/2021 02:41 PM]

3 #2

attachment

3 #1

Send screening letter

1 #4

Case Opening Letter

1 #3

Case Caption

1 #2

District Court Order

#1

Civil Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE on behalf of Appellant Melvin Trent Walker to Legal Division letter advising of possible dismissal [ # 3 ]. Certificate of Service dated 08/06/2021. Service made by US mail. (JK) [Entered: 08/11/2021 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Claudia M. Tesoro on behalf of Appellee(s) Pennsylvania Department of Transportation. [21-2325] (CMT) [Entered: 07/21/2021 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • Docket(#4) Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 07/19/2021. (JK) [Entered: 07/21/2021 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (ZM) [Entered: 07/20/2021 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 07/19/2021 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Melvin Trent Walker in District Court No. 2-17-cv-04720. (JK) [Entered: 07/19/2021 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Pennsylvania Department of Transportation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEFFREY MOZDZIOCK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Claudia M. Tesoro Esq.