This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/11/2020 at 06:04:19 (UTC).

Melvin Avila v. Kiewit Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 Melvin Avila filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Kiewit Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-56300

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

 

Party Details

Defendant

DOES, 1 through 10, inclusive

Defendant / Appellant

KIEWIT CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation

Plaintiff / Appellee

MELVIN AVILA, individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Arthur J. Rooney

Attorney at Baker & McKenzie LLP

300 E. Randolph Street

Chicago, IL 60601

Michael D. Hidalgo

Attorney at Baker McKenzie LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 950

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Howard Scott Leviant

Attorney at Moon & Yang, APC

1055 W. Seventh Street, Suite 1880

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

2 #1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

#2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

2 #3

Case Oepning Packet

#7

#8

#9

#12

13 #1

ER Vol 1

13 #2

ER Vol 2

#14

#18

19 #1

Memorandum

19 #2

Post Judgment Form

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) FILED MEMORANDUM DISPOSITION (N. RANDY SMITH, PAUL J. WATFORD and EDWARD R. KORMAN) REVERSED. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [11541821] (SD) [Entered: 12/23/2019 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Filed Audio recording of oral argument. Note: Video recordings of public argument calendars are available on the Court's website, at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/media/ [11533531] (DR) [Entered: 12/16/2019 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Docket(#17) ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO N. RANDY SMITH, PAUL J. WATFORD and EDWARD R. KORMAN. [11531747] (SML) [Entered: 12/13/2019 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Filed 4 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 13 ] in 2 volume(s) filed by Appellant Kiewit Corporation. (sent to panel) [11509690] (LA) [Entered: 11/22/2019 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Received 7 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 12 ] filed by Kiewit Corporation. (sent to panel) [11509686] (LA) [Entered: 11/22/2019 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 12 ] and excerpts of record [ # 13 ] submitted by Kiewit Corporation are filed. Appellant is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format with blue covers for delivery to the Court by 5:00 p.m. (Pacific time) today, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Appellant is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers, for delivery to the Court by 5:00 p.m. (Pacific time) today. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11509500] (LA) [Entered: 11/22/2019 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Kiewit Corporation. Date of service: 11/22/2019. [11509459] [19-56300] (Hidalgo, Michael) [Entered: 11/22/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Kiewit Corporation. Date of service: 11/22/2019. [11509453] [19-56300] (Hidalgo, Michael) [Entered: 11/22/2019 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed 4 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 8 ] in 1 volume(s) filed by Appellee Melvin Avila. (sent to panel) [11509157] (LA) [Entered: 11/22/2019 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Received 7 paper copies of Answering Brief [ # 7 ] filed by Melvin Avila. (sent to panel) [11509154] (LA) [Entered: 11/22/2019 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 7 ] and excerpts of record [ # 8 ] submitted by Melvin Avila are filed. [11509148] (LA) [Entered: 11/22/2019 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellee Melvin Avila. Date of service: 11/22/2019. [11509077] [19-56300] (Leviant, Howard) [Entered: 11/22/2019 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Melvin Avila. Date of service: 11/22/2019. [11509072] [19-56300] (Leviant, Howard) [Entered: 11/22/2019 01:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Docket(#6) Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 11/18/2019. [11503018] (BY) [Entered: 11/18/2019 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Mr. Arthur J. Rooney for Appellant Kiewit Corporation. Hearing in Pasadena on 12/13/2019 at 09:30 A.M. (Courtroom: Courtroom 2). Filer sharing argument time: No. (Argument minutes: 15.) Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 11/13/2019. [11497793] [19-56300] (Rooney, Arthur) [Entered: 11/13/2019 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Mr. Howard Scott Leviant for Appellee Melvin Avila. Hearing in Pasadena on 12/13/2019 at 09:30 A.M. (Courtroom: Courtroom 2). Filer sharing argument time: No. (Argument minutes: 15.) Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 11/12/2019. [11496140] [19-56300] (Leviant, Howard) [Entered: 11/12/2019 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Oral Argument on Friday, December 13, 2019 - 09:30 A.M. - Courtroom 2 - Pasadena CA. View the Oral Argument Calendar for your case # here . Be sure to review the # GUIDELINES for important information about your hearing, including when to arrive (30 minutes before the hearing time) and when and how to submit additional citations (filing electronically as far in advance of the hearing as possible). If you are the specific attorney or self-represented party who will be arguing, use the # ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE filing type in CM/ECF no later than 21 days before Friday, December 13, 2019. No form or other attachment is required. If you will not be arguing, do not file an acknowledgment of hearing notice.[11496113]. [Array, 19-56300] (AW) [Entered: 11/12/2019 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Kiewit Corporation opening brief due 11/22/2019. Appellee Melvin Avila answering brief due 11/22/2019. [11495566] (RT) [Entered: 11/12/2019 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docket(#1) Filed order (A. WALLACE TASHIMA and MARK J. BENNETT, Circuit Judges): in case no. 19-80080 on 11-12-2019: The petition for permission to appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1453(c) is granted. See Coleman v. Estes Express Lines, Inc., 627 F.3d 1096, 1100 (9th Cir. 2010). Within 7 days after the filing date of this order, petitioner shall perfect the appeal pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 5(d). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1453(c)(2), the court shall complete all action on this appeal, including rendering judgment, not later than 60 days after the date on which the appeal was filed. See also Bush v. Cheaptickets, Inc., 425 F.3d 683, 685 (9th Cir. 2005) (stating that 60-day time period begins to run when the court accepts the appeal). The parties shall submit, via electronic filing, simultaneous briefs and excerpts of record within 10 days after the filing date of this order. No reply briefs will be accepted. Also, within 10 days after the filing date of this order, by 5:00 p.m. (Pacific time), the parties shall submit to the Clerks Office in San Francisco 7 copies of the briefs and 4 copies of the excerpts of record in paper format, accompanied by certification that the briefs are identical to the versions submitted electronically. Any motion to extend time to file the briefs shall strictly comply with the requirements set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1453(c)(3). The Clerk shall calendar this case during the week of December 9, 2019 in Pasadena, California. [11495557] (RT) [Entered: 11/12/2019 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KIEWIT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard Scott Leviant