This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/09/2019 at 06:07:52 (UTC).

Melissa Melendez, et al v. Gavin Newsom, et al

Case Summary

On 10/10/2019 Melissa Melendez, filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Gavin Newsom,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-17004

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JERRY GRIFFIN

Plaintiff / Appellees

MELISSA MELENDEZ

THE CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY

THE REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE

CHARLES MCDOUGALD

BILAL ALI ESSAYLI

Defendant / Appellants

ALEX PADILLA, Secretary of State of California, in his official capacity

GAVIN NEWSOM, in his official capacity as Governor of the State of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Mark P. Meuser

Attorney at Meuser Law Group, Inc

290 N. Hudson

Pasadena, CA 91101

Harmeet Kaur Dhillon

Attorney at Dhillon Law Group, Inc.

177 Post Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94108

Gregory Richard Michael

Attorney at Dhillon Law Group, Inc.

177 Post Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94108

Justin R. Clark

Attorney at Michael, Best & Friedrich LLP

1000 Maine Avenue Sw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20024

Stefan Charles Passantino

Attorney at Michael, Best & Friedrich LLP

1000 Maine Avenue Sw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20024

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Jay Russell

Attorney at AGCA - Office of the California Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94102

Peter H. Chang

Attorney at AGCA - Office of the California Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94102

Chad Allen Stegeman Esquire

Attorney at California Department of Justice

455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Paul Evan Stein

Attorney at AGCA - Office of the California Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

#8

#21

#20

#19

15 #2

ER Vol 2

15 #1

ER Vol 1

#14

#13

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediaiton Questionnaire

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#1

Docketing Letter

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Filed (ECF) Appellees Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. and Donald J. Trump in 19-17002 response opposing motion ([ # 21 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 21 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction). Date of service: 11/27/2019. [11515122] [19-17002, 19-17000, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009] (McCarthy, Thomas) [Entered: 11/27/2019 02:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Filed (ECF) Appellant Alex Padilla in 19-17000, 19-17002, Appellants Gavin Newsom and Alex Padilla in 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. Date of service: 11/21/2019. [11508172] [19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009] (Stegeman, Chad) [Entered: 11/21/2019 06:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 15 ] and excerpts of record [ # 16 ] submitted by Appellants Gavin Newsom and Alex Padilla are filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11491041] [19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009] (LA) [Entered: 11/06/2019 12:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • Docket(#19) Added Attorney(s) T. Russell Nobile for party(s) Appellee Michelle Bolotin Appellee Michael Sienkiewicz Appellee Jerry Griffin Appellee James B. Oerding, in case 19-17000. [11490894] [19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009] (CW) [Entered: 11/06/2019 11:09 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • Docket(#18) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of T. Russell Nobile (Judicial Watch Inc., 425 Third Street, SW, Suite 800, Washington, DC 20024) for Appellees Michelle Bolotin, Jerry Griffin, Michael Sienkiewicz and James B. Oerding in 19-17000. Date of service: 11/06/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11490890] [19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009] (Nobile, T.) [Entered: 11/06/2019 11:06 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • Docket(#17) COURT DELETED DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 16 ]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) further excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Alex Padilla in 19-17000, 19-17002, Appellants Alex Padilla and Gavin Newsom in 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009. Date of service: 11/05/2019. [11490305] [19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009] (Stegeman, Chad) [Entered: 11/05/2019 04:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Alex Padilla in 19-17000, 19-17002, Appellants Gavin Newsom and Alex Padilla in 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009. Date of service: 11/05/2019. [11490298] [19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected PDFs of Vols 1-2. 11/06/2019 by LA] (Stegeman, Chad) [Entered: 11/05/2019 04:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Alex Padilla in 19-17000, 19-17002, Appellants Gavin Newsom and Alex Padilla in 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009. Date of service: 11/05/2019. [11490295] [19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected PDF (corrected cover). 11/06/2019 by LA] (Stegeman, Chad) [Entered: 11/05/2019 04:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM): Defendants motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 11469876-2 ]) to consolidate is granted. Nos. 19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009 are consolidated. Defendants supplemental motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 11471938-2 ]) requesting leave to file oversized opening and reply briefs is denied without prejudice to filing a renewed motion accompanied by a copy of the proposed brief. See 9th Cir. R. 32-2(a) The briefing schedule established on October 10, 2019 at Docket Entry No. [ # 11460846-2 ] in No. 19-17000 shall govern these consolidated appeals. Defendants consolidated opening brief is due no later than November 5, 2019. Plaintiffs answering briefs are due December 3, 2019 or 28 days after service of the consolidated opening brief, whichever is earlier; and defendants optional consolidated reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the last-served answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). The court encourages separately represented parties to file joint briefs to avoid burdening the court with repetitive presentations of common facts and issues. See Circuit Advisory Committee Note to 9th Cir. R. 32-2. [11474870] [19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009] (AF) [Entered: 10/23/2019 01:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Docket(#13) Added Attorney Stefan Charles Passantino for party(s) Appellee The California Republican Party Appellee The Republican National Committee Appellee Bilal Ali Essayli Appellee Charles McDougald Appellee Melissa Melendez, in case 19-17004 Attorney(s) Stefan Charles Passantino for party(s) - Bilal Ali Essayli - The California Republican Party - The Republican National Committee - Charles McDougald - Melissa Melendez, in case 19-17007. [11474854] [19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009] (CW) [Entered: 10/23/2019 01:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2019
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Justin Reilly Clark (Michael Best & Friedrich LLP, 1000 Maine Avenue SW, Suite 400, Washington, D.C. 20024) for Appellees Melissa Melendez, Bilal Ali Essayli, Charles McDougald, The Republican National Committee and The California Republican Party in 19-17004. Date of service: 10/23/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11474513] [19-17004, 19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17007, 19-17009] (Clark, Justin) [Entered: 10/23/2019 11:18 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellants Gavin Newsom and Alex Padilla Supplemental Motion to consolidate cases 19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009. Date of service: 10/21/2019. [11471949] [19-17004] (Stegeman, Chad) [Entered: 10/21/2019 03:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellants Gavin Newsom and Alex Padilla Motion to consolidate cases 19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009. Date of service: 10/18/2019. [11469922] [19-17004] (Stegeman, Chad) [Entered: 10/18/2019 02:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding these appeals, including requests for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's office [11466206] [19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009] (BLS) [Entered: 10/16/2019 12:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • Docket(#6) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/14/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11463119][19-17004] (AD) [Entered: 10/14/2019 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellant Alex Padilla Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/14/2019. [11463111] [19-17004] (Stegeman, Chad) [Entered: 10/14/2019 12:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/11/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11462851][19-17004] (AD) [Entered: 10/11/2019 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellees Bilal Ali Essayli, Charles McDougald, Melissa Melendez, The California Republican Party and The Republican National Committee Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/11/2019. [11462844] [19-17004] (Dhillon, Harmeet) [Entered: 10/11/2019 06:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): The appeal filed October 8, 2019 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than November 5, 2019; the answering brief is due December 3, 2019 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [11460991] (AF) [Entered: 10/10/2019 02:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows:.to be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. C.R. 3-3. [11460527] (RT) [Entered: 10/10/2019 11:03 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less