This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:03:02 (UTC).

Melissa Gordon, et al v. LAUSD

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Melissa Gordon filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against LAUSD. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-55806

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

MELISSA GORDON

ROBERT GORDON

Defendant / Appellant

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

George D. Crook

Attorney at Newman Aaronson Vanaman

14001 Ventura Blvd.

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

Henry Tovmassian Esquire

Attorney at Law Offices of Henry Tovmassian

14001 Ventura Boulevard

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Barrett Green

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

2049 Century Park East

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Daniel Lopez Gonzalez Esquire

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

2049 Century Park East

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#6

(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellants Melissa Gordon and Robert Gordon in 19-55874, Appellees Melissa Gordon and Robert Gordon in 19-55806 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/05/2019. [11387108] [19-55874, 19-55806] (Tovmassian, Henry) [Entered: 08/05/2019 01:02 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 09/24/2019, 3:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11379412] (VS) [Entered: 07/29/2019 11:41 AM]

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #2

Mediaiton Letter

1 #2

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Cross Appeal Chart

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#7

(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellee LAUSD in 19-55874, Appellant LAUSD in 19-55806 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/05/2019. [11387749] [19-55874, 19-55806] (Gonzalez, Daniel) [Entered: 08/05/2019 04:30 PM]

#1

Docketing Letter

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant LAUSD Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/23/2019. [11374200] [19-55806] (Gonzalez, Daniel) [Entered: 07/23/2019 04:02 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • (#9) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/05/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11387913][19-55806] (AD) [Entered: 08/05/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • (#8) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/05/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11387907][19-55806] (AD) [Entered: 08/05/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Filed (ECF) Appellee LAUSD in 19-55874, Appellant LAUSD in 19-55806 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/05/2019. [11387749] [19-55874, 19-55806] (Gonzalez, Daniel) [Entered: 08/05/2019 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed (ECF) Appellants Melissa Gordon and Robert Gordon in 19-55874, Appellees Melissa Gordon and Robert Gordon in 19-55806 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/05/2019. [11387108] [19-55874, 19-55806] (Tovmassian, Henry) [Entered: 08/05/2019 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/05/2019. First cross appeal brief due 10/23/2019 for Los Angeles Unified School District. Second brief on cross appeal due 11/25/2019 for Melissa Gordon and Robert Gordon. Third brief on cross appeal due 12/26/2019 for Los Angeles Unified School District. Optional cross appeal Reply brief for Melissa Gordon and Robert Gordon is due within 21 days of service of Third brief on cross appeal. [11380239] [19-55874, 19-55806] (RT) [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 09/24/2019, 3:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11379412] (VS) [Entered: 07/29/2019 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/23/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11374402][19-55806] (AD) [Entered: 07/23/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant LAUSD Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/23/2019. [11374200] [19-55806] (Gonzalez, Daniel) [Entered: 07/23/2019 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/23/2019. Transcript ordered by 08/14/2019. Transcript due 09/13/2019. Appellant Los Angeles Unified School District opening brief due 10/23/2019. Appellees Melissa Gordon and Robert Gordon answering brief due 11/25/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11364554] (RT) [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.