This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/08/2022 at 06:07:24 (UTC).

Meitav Dash Provident Funds and Pension Ltd., et al v. Spirit AeroSystems Holdings, et al

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 Meitav Dash Provident Funds and Pension Ltd filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Spirit AeroSystems Holdings. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-5013

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JACOB GOLDMAN, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE CITY OF PROVIDENCE

Plaintiff / Appellants

MEITAV DASH PROVIDENT FUNDS AND PENSION LTD.

GARY SMITH, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

CITY OF MIAMI FIRE FIGHTERS AND POLICE OFFICERS RETIREMENT TRUST

Defendant / Appellees

SPIRIT AEROSYSTEMS HOLDINGS, INC.

THOMAS C. GENTILE, III

JOSE GARCIA

JOHN GILSON

SHAWN CAMPBELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William B. Federman

Attorney at Federman & Sherwood

10205 North Pennsylvania Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73120

Phillip C. Kim

Attorney at Rosen Law Firm

275 Madison Avenue, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Laurence Mathew Rosen

Attorney at Rosen Law Firm

275 Madison Avenue, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Eric J. Belfi

Attorney at Labaton Sucharow

140 Broadway, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Christopher Joseph Keller

Attorney at Labaton Sucharow

140 Broadway, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Brian Calandra

Attorney at Pomerantz

600 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

James W. Johnson

Attorney at Labaton Sucharow

140 Broadway, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Jeremy Alan Lieberman

Attorney at Pomerantz

600 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Francis Paul McConville

Attorney at Labaton Sucharow

140 Broadway, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

James M. Reed

Attorney at Hall Estill Law Firm

320 South Boston Avenue, Suite 200

Tulsa, OK 74103-3706

David J. Schwartz

Attorney at Labaton Sucharow

140 Broadway, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Irina Vasilchenko

Attorney at Labaton Sucharow

140 Broadway, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Patrick V. Dahlstrom

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

Ten South La Salle Street, Suite 3505

Chicago, IL 60303

Joseph Alexander Hood II

Attorney at Pomerantz

600 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Geoffrey C. Jarvis

Attorney at Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

280 King Of Prussia Road

Radnor, PA 19087

John W. Dowdell

Attorney at Hall Estill Law Firm

320 South Boston Avenue, Suite 200

Tulsa, OK 74103-3706

Evan R. Hoey

Attorney at Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

280 King Of Prussia Road

Radnor, PA 19087

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

R Richard Love III

15 East 5Th Street

Tulsa, OK 74103

Robert Ritchie

Attorney at Vinson & Elkins

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 3900

Dallas, TX 75201-2975

Mary Quinn Cooper

Attorney at McAfee & Taft

Williams Tower Ii, 2 West 2Nd Street, Suite 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10895787] Motion filed by Appellants City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust, Meitav Dash Provident Funds and Pension Ltd. and Gary Smith to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 05/04/2022. Served on: 02/28/2022. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-5013] JWJ [Entered: 02/28/2022 03:50 PM]

Open Document

[10895552] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. James M. Reed for Gary Smith, City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust and Meitav Dash Provident Funds and Pension Ltd.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/25/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-5013] [Entered: 02/28/2022 09:25 AM]

Open Document

[10894563] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Andrew Rodgers and Patrick Joseph Smith for Jose Garcia. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/22/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-5013] [Entered: 02/23/2022 07:34 AM]

Open Document

[10894511] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Spencer F. Smith for Jose Garcia. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/22/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-5013] [Entered: 02/22/2022 04:05 PM]

Open Document

[10894507] Entry of appearance filed by Mary Quinn Cooper and Jessica L. Dickerson for Jose Garcia. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/22/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-5013] [Entered: 02/22/2022 04:02 PM]

Open Document #2

Notice ROA Complete

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

[10894063] Notice received from City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust, Meitav Dash Provident Funds and Pension Ltd. and Gary Smith that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 02/18/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-5013] JAL [Entered: 02/18/2022 02:51 PM]

Open Document

[10893341] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Geoffrey C. Jarvis for City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (already listed in the appeal). [22-5013] [Entered: 02/16/2022 10:37 AM]

Open Document

[10893120] Entry of appearance filed by David J. Schwartz , Irina Vasilchenko and James W. Johnson for Gary Smith, City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust and Meitav Dash Provident Funds and Pension Ltd.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 02/15/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-5013] [Entered: 02/15/2022 02:10 PM]

Open Document

[10893051] Entry of appearance filed by Brian Calandra for Meitav Dash Provident Funds and Pension Ltd., Gary Smith and City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 02/15/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-5013] [Entered: 02/15/2022 11:08 AM]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • Docket[10895791] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Appellants' unopposed motion to extend time to file the opening brief and appendix to 05/04/2022 for City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust, Meitav Dash Provident Funds and Pension Ltd. and Gary Smith. Served on 02/28/2022. Text only entry - no attachment. [22-5013] [Entered: 02/28/2022 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10895787] Motion filed by Appellants City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust, Meitav Dash Provident Funds and Pension Ltd. and Gary Smith to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 05/04/2022. Served on: 02/28/2022. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-5013] JWJ [Entered: 02/28/2022 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10895552] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. James M. Reed for Gary Smith, City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust and Meitav Dash Provident Funds and Pension Ltd.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/25/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-5013] [Entered: 02/28/2022 09:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Docket[10895472] Entry of appearance submitted by James M. Reed for Appellant City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/25/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-5013]--[Edited 02/28/2022 by JM PDF removed filed 2/28/22.] JMR [Entered: 02/25/2022 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10894563] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Andrew Rodgers and Patrick Joseph Smith for Jose Garcia. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/22/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-5013] [Entered: 02/23/2022 07:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10894511] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Spencer F. Smith for Jose Garcia. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/22/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-5013] [Entered: 02/22/2022 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10894507] Entry of appearance filed by Mary Quinn Cooper and Jessica L. Dickerson for Jose Garcia. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/22/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-5013] [Entered: 02/22/2022 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • Docket[10894500] Entry of appearance submitted by Mary Quinn Cooper and Jessica L. Dickerson for Appellee Jose Garcia for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/22/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-5013]--[Edited 02/22/2022 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 2/22/22] MQC [Entered: 02/22/2022 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • Docket[10894498] Entry of appearance submitted by Spencer F. Smith for Appellee Jose Garcia for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/22/2022. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 02/22/2022 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 02/22/22][22-5013] SFS [Entered: 02/22/2022 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10894481] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 02/22/2022. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 04/04/2022 for City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust, Meitav Dash Provident Funds and Pension Ltd. and Gary Smith. [22-5013] [Entered: 02/22/2022 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10894063] Notice received from City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust, Meitav Dash Provident Funds and Pension Ltd. and Gary Smith that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 02/18/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-5013] JAL [Entered: 02/18/2022 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10893341] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Geoffrey C. Jarvis for City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (already listed in the appeal). [22-5013] [Entered: 02/16/2022 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • Docket[10893329] Entry of appearance submitted by Geoffrey C. Jarvis for Appellant City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/16/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-5013]--[Edited 02/16/2022 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] GCJ [Entered: 02/16/2022 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10893120] Entry of appearance filed by David J. Schwartz , Irina Vasilchenko and James W. Johnson for Gary Smith, City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust and Meitav Dash Provident Funds and Pension Ltd.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 02/15/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-5013] [Entered: 02/15/2022 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • Docket[10893111] Entry of appearance submitted by James W. Johnson, Irina Vasilchenko and David J. Schwartz for Appellants Meitav Dash Provident Funds and Pension Ltd., Gary Smith and City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/15/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-5013]--[Edited 02/15/2022 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 2/15/22] JWJ [Entered: 02/15/2022 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10893051] Entry of appearance filed by Brian Calandra for Meitav Dash Provident Funds and Pension Ltd., Gary Smith and City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 02/15/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-5013] [Entered: 02/15/2022 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • Docket[10893034] Entry of appearance submitted by Brian Calandra for Appellants Meitav Dash Provident Funds and Pension Ltd., Gary Smith and City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/15/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-5013]--[Edited 02/15/2022 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] BC [Entered: 02/15/2022 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10892337] Entry of appearance filed by Jeremy Alan Lieberman for City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust, Meitav Dash Provident Funds and Pension Ltd. and Gary Smith. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 02/10/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-5013] [Entered: 02/10/2022 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Docket[10892333] Entry of appearance submitted by Jeremy A. Lieberman for Appellants Meitav Dash Provident Funds and Pension Ltd., Gary Smith and City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/10/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-5013]--[Edited 02/10/2022 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 2/10/22] JAL [Entered: 02/10/2022 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10891426] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 02/07/2022 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 02/22/2022 for City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust, Meitav Dash Provident Funds and Pension Ltd. and Gary Smith. Notice of appearance due on 02/22/2022 for Shawn Campbell, Jose Garcia, Thomas C. Gentile III, John Gilson and Spirit AeroSystems Holdings, Inc. [22-5013] [Entered: 02/07/2022 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Spirit AeroSystems Holdings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Meitav DS Provident Funds And Pension Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mary Quinn Cooper

Latest cases represented by Lawyer R. Richard Love III