This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/09/2022 at 06:03:21 (UTC).

Megan Daniels, et al v. United Healthcare Services, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 07/11/2022 Megan Daniels filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against United Healthcare Services, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-2210

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

MEGAN DANIELS

BETSY DANIELS

CHRIS DANIELS

Defendant / Appellees

UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.

UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Robert J. Gingras

Attorney at GINGRAS, THOMSEN & WACHS

8150 Excelsior Drive

Madison, WI 53717

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michelle S. Grant

Attorney at MICHELLE S. GRANT

50 S. Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1498

Bryan C. Keane

Attorney at DORSEY & WHITNEY LLP

50 S. Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1498

Nick Bullard

Attorney at DORSEY & WHITNEY LLP

50 S. Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1498

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#2

(#2) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Tuesday, August 2, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS. [2] [7248689] [22-2210] (FP) [Entered: 07/18/2022 09:36 AM]

#3

(#3) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 09/02/2022 for Betsy Daniels, Chris Daniels and Megan Daniels. Appellees' brief due on or before 10/03/2022 for United Behavioral Health and United Healthcare Services, Inc.. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 10/24/2022 for Appellants Betsy Daniels, Chris Daniels and Megan Daniels. JNS [7248693] [22-2210] (FP) [Entered: 07/18/2022 09:41 AM]

#4

(#4) ORDER: Appellants shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before July 26, 2022. (See order for details) DW [4] [7249260] [22-2210] (AP) [Entered: 07/19/2022 03:52 PM]

#5

(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Robert J. Gingras for Appellants Betsy Daniels, Chris Daniels and Megan Daniels. [5] [7249770] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2210] (Gingras, Robert) [Entered: 07/21/2022 01:58 PM]

#6

(#6) Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellants Betsy Daniels, Chris Daniels and Megan Daniels. [6] [7250020] [22-2210] (Gingras, Robert) [Entered: 07/22/2022 01:55 PM]

#7

(#7) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 09/26/2022 for Betsy Daniels, Chris Daniels and Megan Daniels. Appellees' brief due on or before 10/26/2022 for United Behavioral Health and United Healthcare Services, Inc. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/16/2022 for Appellants Betsy Daniels, Chris Daniels and Megan Daniels. JNS [7250410] [22-2210] (PS) [Entered: 07/25/2022 04:15 PM]

#8

(#8) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 10/07/2022 for Betsy Daniels, Chris Daniels and Megan Daniels. Appellees' brief due on or before 11/07/2022 for United Behavioral Health and United Healthcare Services, Inc.. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/28/2022 for Appellants Betsy Daniels, Chris Daniels and Megan Daniels. JNS [7250638] [22-2210] (HTP) [Entered: 07/26/2022 02:24 PM]

#9

(#9) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Michelle Grant for Appellees United Behavioral Health and United Healthcare Services, Inc.. [9] [7251338] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2210] [Edited 07/29/2022 by CG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Grant, Michelle) [Entered: 07/29/2022 10:54 AM]

#10

(#10) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Nicholas J. Bullard for Appellees United Behavioral Health and United Healthcare Services, Inc.. [10] [7251584] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2210]--[Edited 08/01/2022 by PS - to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Bullard, Nick) [Entered: 08/01/2022 11:13 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Nicholas J. Bullard for Appellees United Behavioral Health and United Healthcare Services, Inc.. [10] [7251584] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2210]--[Edited 08/01/2022 by PS - to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Bullard, Nick) [Entered: 08/01/2022 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Michelle Grant for Appellees United Behavioral Health and United Healthcare Services, Inc.. [9] [7251338] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2210] [Edited 07/29/2022 by CG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Grant, Michelle) [Entered: 07/29/2022 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 10/07/2022 for Betsy Daniels, Chris Daniels and Megan Daniels. Appellees' brief due on or before 11/07/2022 for United Behavioral Health and United Healthcare Services, Inc.. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/28/2022 for Appellants Betsy Daniels, Chris Daniels and Megan Daniels. JNS [7250638] [22-2210] (HTP) [Entered: 07/26/2022 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 09/26/2022 for Betsy Daniels, Chris Daniels and Megan Daniels. Appellees' brief due on or before 10/26/2022 for United Behavioral Health and United Healthcare Services, Inc. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/16/2022 for Appellants Betsy Daniels, Chris Daniels and Megan Daniels. JNS [7250410] [22-2210] (PS) [Entered: 07/25/2022 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellants Betsy Daniels, Chris Daniels and Megan Daniels. [6] [7250020] [22-2210] (Gingras, Robert) [Entered: 07/22/2022 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Robert J. Gingras for Appellants Betsy Daniels, Chris Daniels and Megan Daniels. [5] [7249770] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2210] (Gingras, Robert) [Entered: 07/21/2022 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Appellants shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before July 26, 2022. (See order for details) DW [4] [7249260] [22-2210] (AP) [Entered: 07/19/2022 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 09/02/2022 for Betsy Daniels, Chris Daniels and Megan Daniels. Appellees' brief due on or before 10/03/2022 for United Behavioral Health and United Healthcare Services, Inc.. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 10/24/2022 for Appellants Betsy Daniels, Chris Daniels and Megan Daniels. JNS [7248693] [22-2210] (FP) [Entered: 07/18/2022 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Tuesday, August 2, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS. [2] [7248689] [22-2210] (FP) [Entered: 07/18/2022 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet filed. Appellant's brief due on or before 08/22/2022 for Betsy Daniels, Chris Daniels and Megan Daniels. [1] [7247804] [22-2210] (PS) [Entered: 07/12/2022 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Behavioral Health, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where United Healthcare Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bryan C. Keane

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michelle S Grant