This case was last updated from PACER on 10/01/2021 at 05:19:53 (UTC).

Medtronic, Inc. v. Teleflex Innovations S.A.R.L.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 Medtronic, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Teleflex Innovations S A R L. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2359

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellants

MEDTRONIC, INC.

MEDTRONIC VASCULAR, INC.

Appellee

TELEFLEX INNOVATIONS S.A.R.L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Cyrus Alcorn Morton

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

800 Lasalle Avenue, Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Appellee Attorney

J. Derek Vandenburgh

Attorney at Carlson, Caspers, Vandenburgh & Lindquist PA

225 South 6Th Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 09/27/2021. [802428] Entry of Appearance is due on 10/13/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 10/13/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 10/13/2021. Certified List is due on 11/08/2021. [JCW] [Entered: 09/29/2021 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Medtronic Vascular, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J Derek Vandenburgh