This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/18/2020 at 05:20:17 (UTC).

MedScript Pharmacy, LLC v. D&D Pharma LTC, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/10/2020 MedScript Pharmacy, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against D D Pharma LTC, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1593

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

D&D PHARMA LTC, LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

MEDSCRIPT PHARMACY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Kevin Tottis

One E. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Mark D. Roth

Attorney at ROTH FIORETTI, LLC

311 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 05/27/2020 for MedScript Pharmacy, LLC. Appellee's brief due on or before 06/29/2020 for D&D Pharma LTC, LLC. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 07/20/2020 for Appellant MedScript Pharmacy, LLC RJS [7074663] [20-1593] (AP) [Entered: 04/14/2020 09:21 AM]

#2

(#2) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Monday, April 27, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS. [2] [7074660] [20-1593] (AP) [Entered: 04/14/2020 09:14 AM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 05/27/2020 for MedScript Pharmacy, LLC. Appellee's brief due on or before 06/29/2020 for D&D Pharma LTC, LLC. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 07/20/2020 for Appellant MedScript Pharmacy, LLC RJS [7074663] [20-1593] (AP) [Entered: 04/14/2020 09:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Monday, April 27, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS. [2] [7074660] [20-1593] (AP) [Entered: 04/14/2020 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 04/24/2020. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/20/2020 for MedScript Pharmacy, LLC. [1] [7074089] [20-1593] (MM) [Entered: 04/10/2020 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Medscript Pharmacy, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Daniel Roth