This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/11/2021 at 06:00:38 (UTC).

Medicaid & Medicare Advantage Products Ass'n of PR, et al v. Asociacion de Hospitales de Puerto Rico, et al

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 Medicaid Medicare Advantage Products Ass'n of PR filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Asociacion de Hospitales de Puerto Rico. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1379

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendants

DOMINGO EMANUELLI HERNANDEZ, Secretary of the Department of Justice

MARIANO A. MIER-ROMEU, Puerto Rico Insurance Commissioner

DOMINGO EMANUELLI HERNANDEZ, in his official capacity as Attorney General for the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico

MARIANO A. MIER-ROMEU, in his official capacity as Puerto Rico Insurance Commissioner

Defendant / Appellants

PUERTO RICO ASSOCIATION OF RADIOLOGY IMAGING CENTERS INC.

ASOCIACION DE HOSPITALES DE PUERTO RICO

SAN JORGE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL INC.

PUERTO RICO COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS-SURGEONS

HOSPITAL MENONITA GUAYAMA, INC.

HOSPITAL MENONITA CAGUAS, INC.

CLINICAL LABORATORIES ASSOCIATION INC.

MENNONITE GENERAL HOSPITAL, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellees

MCS ADVANTAGE, INC.

HUMANA HEALTH PLANS OF PUERTO RICO, INC.

MMM HEALTHCARE, INC.

MEDICARE AND MEDICAID ADVANTAGE PRODUCTS ASSOCIATION OF PUERTO RICO, INC.

TRIPLE S ADVANTAGE, INC.

MEDICAID AND MEDICARE ADVANTAGE PRODUCTS ASSOCIATION OF PUERTO RICO, INC.

Interested Party

SPECIALIST COOPERATIVES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Raul Castellanos-Malave

Attorney at Development & Construction Law Group LLC

Pmb 443, Ste 112, 100 Grand Paseos Blvd

San Juan, PR 00926-5902

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Luis Enrique Romero-Nieves

268 Ponce De Leon Ave

San Juan, PR 00918-2007

Luis Miguel Pellot Julia Jr.

Attorney at Pellot-Gonzalez PSC

268 Ponce De Leon Ave, Hato Rey Center, Ste 903

San Juan, PR 00918

Carla S. Loubriel

Attorney at Casellas Alcover & Burgos PSC

Po Box 364924

San Juan, PR 00936-4924

Diana Perez-Seda

Attorney at Casellas Alcover & Burgos PSC

Po Box 364924

San Juan, PR 00936-4924

Cesar T. Alcover-Acosta

Attorney at Casellas Alcover & Burgos PSC

Po Box 364924

San Juan, PR 00936-4924

Francisco J. Domenech-Fernandez

Attorney at Estudio Legal Ferraiuoli, PSC

Po Box 195384

San Juan, PR 00919-5384

Jaime Jose Sifre Rodriguez

Attorney at Sanchez-Betances Sifre & Munoz-Noya PSC

Po Box 364428

San Juan, PR 00936-4428

Luis Sanchez-Betances

Attorney at Sanchez-Betances Sifre & Munoz-Noya PSC

Po Box 364428

San Juan, PR 00936-4428

Jorge Luis Flores-De Jesus

Attorney at Sanchez-Betances Sifre & Munoz-Noya PSC

Po Box 364428

San Juan, PR 00936-4428

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Ricardo Jose Casellas-Santana

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges LLC

250 Munoz Rivera Ave, Ste 800

San Juan, PR 00918-1813

Mariacte Correa-Cestero

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges LLC

250 Munoz Rivera Ave, Ste 800

San Juan, PR 00918-1813

Roberto Luis Prats Palerm

Attorney at RPP Law PSC

1509 Lopez Landron, 10Th Flr

San Juan, PR 00911

Ankur J. Goel

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

500 N Capitol St Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Michael Branch Kimberly

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

500 N Capitol St Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Sarah Hogarth

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

500 N Capitol St Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Jose A. Hernandez-Mayoral

Attorney at Hernandez Mayoral Law Office

206 Tetuan, Suite 702

San Juan, PR 00901

Luis R. Roman-Negron

Attorney at SBGB LLC

Miramar Plaza Center, Ste 201, 954 Ponce De Leon Ave

San Juan, PR 00907

Interested Party Attorneys

Angel Sosa-Baez

Attorney at Toro Colon Mullet PSC

Po Box 195383

San Juan, PR 00919-5383

Jaime E. Toro-Monserrate

Attorney at Toro Colon Mullet PSC

Po Box 195383

San Juan, PR 00919-5383

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbrevaited Record

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Asociacion de Hospitales de Puerto Rico, Mennonite General Hospital, Inc., San Jorge Children's Hospital Inc., Hospital Menonita Caguas, Inc., Hospital Menonita Guayama, Inc., Puerto Rico College of Physicians-Surgeons, Clinical Laboratories Association Inc. and Puerto Rico Association of Radiology Imaging Centers Inc. in 21-1379. Certificate of service dated 06/10/2021. [21-1379, 21-1297] (CSL) [Entered: 06/10/2021 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 07/20/2021 for appellant Domingo Emanuelli Hernandez, Mariano A. Mier-Romeu, Asociacion de Hospitales de Puerto Rico, Clinical Laboratories Association Inc., Hospital Menonita Caguas, Inc., Hospital Menonita Guayama, Inc., Mennonite General Hospital, Inc., Puerto Rico Association of Radiology Imaging Centers Inc., Puerto Rico College of Physicians-Surgeons and San Jorge Children's Hospital Inc.. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [21-1297, 21-1379] (AL) [Entered: 06/10/2021 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Francisco J. Domenech-Fernandez for Puerto Rico College of Physicians-Surgeons and Luis Enrique Romero-Nieves for Clinical Laboratories Association Inc. and Puerto Rico Association of Radiology Imaging Centers Inc.. [21-1379] (AL) [Entered: 06/10/2021 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Puerto Rico College of Physicians-Surgeons in 21-1379, Not Party Puerto Rico College of Physicians-Surgeons in 21-1297 filed by Attorney Omar E. Martinez-Vazquez. Certificate of service dated 06/09/2021. [21-1379, 21-1297] (OEM) [Entered: 06/09/2021 06:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Clinical Laboratories Association Inc. and Puerto Rico Association of Radiology Imaging Centers Inc. in 21-1379 filed by Attorney Luis M. Pellot-Julia. Certificate of service dated 06/08/2021. [21-1379, 21-1297] (LMP) [Entered: 06/08/2021 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Hospital Menonita Guayama, Inc. and Hospital Menonita Caguas, Inc. in 21-1379 filed by Attorney Luis Sanchez-Betances. Certificate of service dated 06/07/2021. [21-1297, 21-1379] (LS) [Entered: 06/07/2021 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. Appellants Clinical Laboratories Association Inc., Hospital Menonita Caguas, Inc., Hospital Menonita Guayama, Inc., Puerto Rico Association of Radiology Imaging Centers Inc. and Puerto Rico College of Physicians-Surgeons. are directed to file an appearance form and docketing statement or their appeal will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form and Docketing Statement due June 10, 2021 . [21-1379] (AL) [Entered: 05/27/2021 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 06/10/2021, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Francisco J. Domenech-Fernandez for Puerto Rico College of Physicians-Surgeons and Luis Enrique Romero-Nieves for Clinical Laboratories Association Inc. and Puerto Rico Association of Radiology Imaging Centers Inc.. [21-1379] (AL) [Entered: 05/27/2021 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Proposed Corrections to Docketing Statements and Case Caption filed by Appellee MMM Healthcare, Inc. in 21-1297, 21-1379. Certificate of service dated 05/24/2021. [21-1297, 21-1379] (MBK) [Entered: 05/24/2021 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER entered: Appeal Nos. 21-1297 and 21-1379 are consolidated for purposes of briefing and oral argument. See Fed. R. App. P. 3(b)(2). The parties are directed to use the above caption on all future filings related to these cases. [21-1297, 21-1379] (AL) [Entered: 05/21/2021 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Asociacion de Hospitales de Puerto Rico, Mennonite General Hospital, Inc. and San Jorge Children's Hospital Inc. in 21-1379. Certificate of service dated 05/21/2021. [21-1379] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional case 21-1297. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (CSL) [Entered: 05/21/2021 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Mennonite General Hospital, Inc., San Jorge Children's Hospital Inc. and Asociacion de Hospitales de Puerto Rico in 21-1379 filed by Attorney Carla S. Loubriel-Carrion. Certificate of service dated 05/20/2021. [21-1379] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional case 21-1297. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (CSL) [Entered: 05/20/2021 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Mennonite General Hospital, Inc., San Jorge Children's Hospital Inc. and Asociacion de Hospitales de Puerto Rico in 21-1379 filed by Attorney Cesar T. Alcover. Certificate of service dated 05/20/2021. [21-1379] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional case 21-1297. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (CTA) [Entered: 05/20/2021 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #143) filed by Appellants Asociacion de Hospitales de Puerto Rico, Clinical Laboratories Association Inc., Hospital Menonita Caguas, Inc., Hospital Menonita Guayama, Inc., Mennonite General Hospital, Inc., Puerto Rico Association of Radiology Imaging Centers Inc., Puerto Rico College of Physicians-Surgeons and San Jorge Children's Hospital Inc. Docketing Statement due 05/26/2021. Appearance form due 05/26/2021. [21-1379] (AL) [Entered: 05/12/2021 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MENNONITE GENERAL HOSPITAL, INC., d/b/a Hospital Menontia CIMA, d/b/a Sistema de Salud Menonita, d/b/a Hospital Menonita Aibonito is a litigant

Latest cases where Triple-S Advantage, Inc. is a litigant