This case was last updated from PACER on 05/27/2019 at 06:10:04 (UTC).

MCR Oil Tools, L.L.C. v. Spex Offshore, Limited, et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 MCR Oil Tools, L L C filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Spex Offshore, Limited. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-10346

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

SPEX GROUP US, L.L.C.

SPEX ENGINEERING (UK), LIMITED

Plaintiff / Appellee

MCR OIL TOOLS, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Craig Douglas Dillard

Attorney at Foley Gardere

1000 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002-2099

Stacy R. Obenhaus

Attorney at Foley Gardere, Foley & Lardner, L.L.P.

2021 Mckinney Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Rachel Kingrey O'Neil

Attorney at Foley Gardere, Foley & Lardner, L.L.P.

2021 Mckinney Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Blake L. Beckham

Attorney at Beckham Group

3400 Carlisle

Dallas, TX 75204

Jose M. Portela

Attorney at Beckham Group

3400 Carlisle

Dallas, TX 75204

 

Court Documents

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Spex Engineering (UK), Limited and Spex Group US, L.L.C. [19-10346] (WMJ) [Entered: 03/28/2019 03:46 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9020945-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 04/18/2019 for Appellants Spex Engineering (UK), Limited and Spex Group US, L.L.C. [19-10346] (WMJ) [Entered: 04/03/2019 01:17 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10346] (Stacy R. Obenhaus ) [Entered: 04/04/2019 03:09 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Craig Douglas Dillard for Spex Engineering (UK), Limited and Spex Group US, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10346] (Craig Douglas Dillard ) [Entered: 04/04/2019 03:13 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10346] (Rachel Kingrey O'Neil ) [Entered: 04/04/2019 05:18 PM]

Open Document

ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Spex Engineering (UK), Limited and Spex Group US, L.L.C.for the Court to process. Date of service: 04/08/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Beckham; Attorney for Appellant: Dillard. [19-10346] (Craig Douglas Dillard ) [Entered: 04/08/2019 10:38 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document #1

Record Excerpts Filed

Open Document #3

Paper Copies Form

Open Document #2

RE-5 Electronic Filers Letter

Open Document #1

Appellant/Petitioner Brief Filed

Open Document #2

Brief Paper Copies Form

Open Document #1

Motion to Supplement Record

Open Document #2

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee MCR Oil Tools, L.L.C. to supplement the record on appeal with (1) Status Conference Transcript and (2) Two Post-Hearing Briefs [9058442-2]. Date of service: 05/22/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Beckham, Portela; Attorney for Appellants: Dillard, O'Neil, Obenhaus [19-10346] (Blake L. Beckham ) [Entered: 05/22/2019 09:32 AM]

Open Document #2

Court Order

Open Document #1

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document

APPENDIX FILED by Appellee MCR Oil Tools, L.L.C. Date of Service: 04/16/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Beckham, Portela; Attorney for Appellants: Dillard, O'Neil, Obenhaus [19-10346] (Blake L. Beckham ) [Entered: 04/16/2019 04:27 PM]

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED SUFFICIENT RECORD EXCERPTS filed by Appellants Spex Engineering (UK), Limited and Spex Group US, L.L.C. [ # 9059214-2 ] Date of service: 05/24/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Beckham, Portela; Attorney for Appellants: Dillard, O'Neil, Obenhaus [19-10346] (Stacy R. Obenhaus ) [Entered: 05/24/2019 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUFFICIENT RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Record Excerpts deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 05/29/2019 for Appellants Spex Engineering (UK), Limited and Spex Group US, L.L.C.. [19-10346] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. Record Excerpts NOT Sufficient as they require: TAB 3 is included twice, one to be removed. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Record Excerpts due on 06/05/2019 for Appellants Spex Engineering (UK), Limited and Spex Group US, L.L.C. [19-10346] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellants Spex Engineering (UK), Limited and Spex Group US, L.L.C.. Date of service: 05/22/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Beckham, Portela; Attorney for Appellants: Dillard, O'Neil, Obenhaus [19-10346] (Rachel Kingrey O'Neil ) [Entered: 05/22/2019 05:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 06/21/2019 for Appellee MCR Oil Tools, L.L.C.. Paper Copies of Brief due on 05/28/2019 for Appellants Spex Engineering (UK), Limited and Spex Group US, L.L.C.. [19-10346] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Spex Engineering (UK), Limited and Spex Group US, L.L.C.. Date of service: 05/22/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Beckham, Portela; Attorney for Appellants: Dillard, O'Neil, Obenhaus [19-10346] (Rachel Kingrey O'Neil ) [Entered: 05/22/2019 05:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:18-CV-731. Supplemental Electronic ROA due on 06/06/2019. [19-10346] (MFY) [Entered: 05/22/2019 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER granting Motion to supplement the record on appeal filed by Appellee MCR Oil Tools, L.L.C. [ # 9058442-2 ] [19-10346] (MFY) [Entered: 05/22/2019 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee MCR Oil Tools, L.L.C. to supplement the record on appeal with (1) Status Conference Transcript and (2) Two Post-Hearing Briefs [9058442-2]. Date of service: 05/22/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Beckham, Portela; Attorney for Appellants: Dillard, O'Neil, Obenhaus [19-10346] (Blake L. Beckham ) [Entered: 05/22/2019 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that appellants' opposed motion for stay of discovery pending appeal is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that appellants' alternative request to extend the current discovery deadline is DENIED. [ # 9028284-2 ]; [ # 9028284-3 ] [19-10346] (MFY) [Entered: 04/17/2019 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPENDIX FILED by Appellee MCR Oil Tools, L.L.C. Date of Service: 04/16/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Beckham, Portela; Attorney for Appellants: Dillard, O'Neil, Obenhaus [19-10346] (Blake L. Beckham ) [Entered: 04/16/2019 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by MCR Oil Tools, L.L.C. [9031035-1] to the Motion filed by Appellants Spex Engineering (UK), Limited and Spex Group US, L.L.C. [ # 9028284-2 ], Motion filed by Appellants Spex Engineering (UK), Limited and Spex Group US, L.L.C. [ # 9028284-3 ] Date of Service: 04/16/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Beckham, Portela; Attorney for Appellants: Dillard, O'Neil, Obenhaus. [19-10346] (Blake L. Beckham ) [Entered: 04/16/2019 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jose M. Portela for party(s) Appellee MCR Oil Tools, L.L.C., in case 19-10346 [19-10346] (RLL) [Entered: 04/16/2019 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Craig Douglas Dillard for Appellant Spex Engineering (UK), Limited in 19-10346, Attorney Craig Douglas Dillard for Appellant Spex Group US, L.L.C. in 19-10346 [19-10346] (RSM) [Entered: 04/08/2019 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Stacy R. Obenhaus for party(s) Appellant Spex Engineering (UK), Limited Appellant Spex Group US, L.L.C., in case 19-10346 [19-10346] (RSM) [Entered: 04/08/2019 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:18-CV-731. Electronic ROA due on 04/23/2019. [19-10346] (MFY) [Entered: 04/08/2019 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Spex Engineering (UK), Limited and Spex Group US, L.L.C. advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [19-10346] (MFY) [Entered: 04/08/2019 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Spex Engineering (UK), Limited and Spex Group US, L.L.C.for the Court to process. Date of service: 04/08/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Beckham; Attorney for Appellant: Dillard. [19-10346] (Craig Douglas Dillard ) [Entered: 04/08/2019 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10346] (Rachel Kingrey O'Neil ) [Entered: 04/04/2019 05:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Craig Douglas Dillard for Spex Engineering (UK), Limited and Spex Group US, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10346] (Craig Douglas Dillard ) [Entered: 04/04/2019 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10346] (Stacy R. Obenhaus ) [Entered: 04/04/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9020945-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 04/18/2019 for Appellants Spex Engineering (UK), Limited and Spex Group US, L.L.C. [19-10346] (WMJ) [Entered: 04/03/2019 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Spex Engineering (UK), Limited and Spex Group US, L.L.C. [19-10346] (WMJ) [Entered: 03/28/2019 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.