This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/24/2020 at 06:00:15 (UTC).

McLaughlin, et al v. Tiverton Town Council, et al

Case Summary

On 04/25/2020 McLaughlin, filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Tiverton Town Council,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1473

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant

RELIABLE PEST CONTROL, INC.

Defendant / Appellees

JOAN B. CHABOT, both in her individual capacity and her official capacity as either current or former agent and/or employee of the Town of Tiverton

MATTHEW WOJCIK, both in his individual capacity and his official capacity as either current or former agent and/or employee of the Town of Tiverton

JOSEPH SOUSA, both in his individual capacity and his official capacity as either current or former agent and/or employee of the Town of Tiverton

MANCINI DEMOLITION, INC.

NEIL HALL, both in his individual capacity and his official capacity as either current or former agent and/or employee of the Town of Tiverton

PETER MELLO, both in his individual capacity and his official capacity as either current or former agent and/or employee of the Town of Tiverton

DAVID PERRY, both in his individual capacity and his official capacity as either current or former agent and/or employee of the Town of Tiverton

ANDREW M. TEITZ, both in his individual capacity and his official capacity as either current or former agent and/or employee of the Town of Tiverton

JAY LAMBERT, both in his individual capacity and his official capacity as either current or former agent and/or employee of the Town of Tiverton

TIVERTON TOWN COUNCIL

GARETH EAMES, both in his individual capacity and his official capacity as either current or former agent and/or employee of the Town of Tiverton

GINA A. DICENSO, both in her individual capacity and her official capacity as either current or former agent and/or employee of the Town of Tiverton

BRETT N. PELLETIER, both in his individual capacity and his official capacity as either current or former agent and/or employee of the Town of Tiverton

TIVERTON, RI

DENISE DEMEDEIROS, both in her individual capacity and her official capacity as either current or former agent and/or employee of the Town of Tiverton

Plaintiff / Appellants

DEBORAH MCLAUGHLIN

WILLIAM C. MCLAUGHLIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Benedict Messore

Rajaram Suryanarayan

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Marc DeSisto

Kathleen A. Hilton

Patrick Kevin Burns

David A. Tammelleo

John P. Larochelle

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Sean R. Doherty

Daniel Calabro Jr.

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Transcript Acknowledgment

Open Document #1

Transript Order Form

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: David A. Tammelleo for Mancini Demolition, Inc.. [20-1473] (GB) [Entered: 06/10/2020 07:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Mancini Demolition, Inc. filed by Attorney John P. Larochelle. Certificate of service dated 06/10/2020. [20-1473] (JPL) [Entered: 06/10/2020 04:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief and appendix due 07/20/2020 for appellants Deborah McLaughlin and William C. McLaughlin. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellants' brief, and appellants' reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-1473] (MNH) [Entered: 06/08/2020 11:13 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE of filing the following transcript in district court by Court Reporter Karen Wischnowsky: 10/15/2019, Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [20-1473] (MNH) [Entered: 06/08/2020 11:03 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Sean R. Doherty for William C. McLaughlin and Deborah McLaughlin. [20-1473] (GB) [Entered: 05/27/2020 08:56 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 05/26/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Sean R. Doherty for William C. McLaughlin and Deborah McLaughlin and David A. Tammelleo for Mancini Demolition, Inc.. [20-1473] (GB) [Entered: 05/12/2020 09:46 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Deborah McLaughlin and William C. McLaughlin. Certificate of service dated 05/11/2020. [20-1473] (DC) [Entered: 05/11/2020 10:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ordered: 10/15/2019, Motion for Summary Judgment. Transcript(s) due 07/06/2020 from Court Reporter Karen Wischnowsky [20-1473] (RMK) [Entered: 05/07/2020 05:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Deborah McLaughlin and William C. McLaughlin indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 05/07/2020. [20-1473] (DC) [Entered: 05/07/2020 09:56 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Deborah McLaughlin and William C. McLaughlin filed by Attorney Daniel Calabro, Jr.. Certificate of service dated 04/29/2020. [20-1473] (DC) [Entered: 04/29/2020 10:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Joan B. Chabot, Denise deMedeiros, Gina A. DiCenso, Gareth Eames, Neil Hall, Jay Lambert, Peter Mello, Brett N. Pelletier, David Perry, Joseph Sousa, Andrew M. Teitz, Tiverton Town Council, Tiverton, RI and Matthew Wojcik filed by Attorney Patrick K. Burns. Certificate of service dated 04/27/2020. [20-1473] (PKB) [Entered: 04/27/2020 11:15 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Joan B. Chabot, Denise deMedeiros, Gina A. DiCenso, Gareth Eames, Neil Hall, Jay Lambert, Peter Mello, Brett N. Pelletier, David Perry, Joseph Sousa, Andrew M. Teitz, Tiverton Town Council, Tiverton, RI and Matthew Wojcik filed by Attorney Kathleen A. Hilton. Certificate of service dated 04/27/2020. [20-1473] (KAH) [Entered: 04/27/2020 11:13 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Joan B. Chabot, Denise deMedeiros, Gina A. DiCenso, Gareth Eames, Neil Hall, Jay Lambert, Peter Mello, Brett N. Pelletier, David Perry, Joseph Sousa, Andrew M. Teitz, Tiverton Town Council, Tiverton, RI and Matthew Wojcik filed by Attorney Marc DeSisto. Certificate of service dated 04/27/2020. [20-1473] (MD) [Entered: 04/27/2020 11:10 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #51) filed by Appellants Deborah McLaughlin and William C. McLaughlin. Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript Report/Order form due 05/11/2020 . [20-1473] (GB) [Entered: 04/25/2020 11:03 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less