This case was last updated from PACER on 04/30/2021 at 06:03:59 (UTC).

McKnight v. Helix Energy

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 McKnight filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Helix Energy. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-20109

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Clayton Fruge

Derek Belhumeur

Vantrerius McKnight

Defendant / Appellee

Helix Energy Solutions Group, Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Melissa Ann Moore Esq.

Attorney at Moore & Associates

440 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002-1646

Curt Christopher Hesse

Attorney at Moore & Associates

440 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002-1646

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Michael Carter Crow

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US, L.L.P.

1301 Mckinney Street, Fulbright Tower

Houston, TX 77010-3095

 

Court Documents

Open Document

UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellants Mr. Clayton Fruge and Mr. Vantrerius McKnight for filing Appellants' Brief until 05/20/2021 [21-20109] (Curt Christopher Hesse ) [Entered: 04/26/2021 05:33 PM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Mr. Vantrerius McKnight for filing Appellant's Brief until 05/20/2021 [21-20109] (Melissa Ann Moore ) [Entered: 04/15/2021 04:44 PM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Mr. Vantrerius McKnight for filing Appellant's Brief until 05/20/2021 [21-20109] (Melissa Ann Moore ) [Entered: 04/15/2021 01:54 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 04/20/2021 for Appellants Derek Belhumeur, Clayton Fruge and Vantrerius McKnight. [21-20109] (MRW) [Entered: 03/11/2021 04:29 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [21-20109] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Vantrerius McKnight, Mr. Clayton Fruge and Mr. Derek Belhumeur advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Date of Service: 03/08/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Crow; Attorney for Appellant: Moore [21-20109] (Melissa Ann Moore ) [Entered: 03/08/2021 05:13 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-20109] (Melissa Ann Moore ) [Entered: 03/08/2021 05:11 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20109] (Curt Christopher Hesse ) [Entered: 03/08/2021 05:10 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9519970-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 03/23/2021 for Appellants Derek Belhumeur, Clayton Fruge and Vantrerius McKnight [21-20109] (CAG) [Entered: 03/08/2021 04:24 PM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Derek Belhumeur, Mr. Clayton Fruge and Mr. Vantrerius McKnight [21-20109] (CCR) [Entered: 03/01/2021 02:16 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Mr. Derek Belhumeur and Mr. Clayton Fruge. Extension Granted to and including 05/20/2021. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 05/20/2021 for Appellants Derek Belhumeur and Clayton Fruge [21-20109] Counsel is advised that all future filings should list the name of each appellant specifically or collectively refer to them as "appellants" (ABT) [Entered: 04/27/2021 07:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellants Mr. Clayton Fruge and Mr. Vantrerius McKnight for filing Appellants' Brief until 05/20/2021 [21-20109] (Curt Christopher Hesse ) [Entered: 04/26/2021 05:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant Mr. Vantrerius McKnight. Extension Granted to and including 05/20/2021. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 05/20/2021 for Appellant Vantrerius McKnight [21-20109] (CAG) [Entered: 04/16/2021 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Mr. Vantrerius McKnight for filing Appellant's Brief until 05/20/2021 [21-20109] (Melissa Ann Moore ) [Entered: 04/15/2021 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant Mr. Vantrerius McKnight. Extension Denied Reason: Lacking Substantial Reason(s). See 5th Cir. R. 31.4.2. [21-20109] (CAG) [Entered: 04/15/2021 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Mr. Vantrerius McKnight for filing Appellant's Brief until 05/20/2021 [21-20109] (Melissa Ann Moore ) [Entered: 04/15/2021 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 04/20/2021 for Appellants Derek Belhumeur, Clayton Fruge and Vantrerius McKnight. [21-20109] (MRW) [Entered: 03/11/2021 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-20109] (MRW) [Entered: 03/11/2021 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Curt Christopher Hesse for party(s) Appellant Vantrerius McKnight Appellant Derek Belhumeur Appellant Clayton Fruge, in case 21-20109 [21-20109] (CAG) [Entered: 03/09/2021 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Melissa Ann Moore for Appellant Derek Belhumeur in 21-20109, Attorney Melissa Ann Moore for Appellant Clayton Fruge in 21-20109, Attorney Melissa Ann Moore for Appellant Vantrerius McKnight in 21-20109 [21-20109] (CAG) [Entered: 03/09/2021 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:19-CV-2852 and 4:19-CV-4705. Electronic ROA due on 03/24/2021. [21-20109] (CAG) [Entered: 03/09/2021 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [21-20109] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Vantrerius McKnight, Mr. Clayton Fruge and Mr. Derek Belhumeur advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Date of Service: 03/08/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Crow; Attorney for Appellant: Moore [21-20109] (Melissa Ann Moore ) [Entered: 03/08/2021 05:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-20109] (Melissa Ann Moore ) [Entered: 03/08/2021 05:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20109] (Curt Christopher Hesse ) [Entered: 03/08/2021 05:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9519970-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 03/23/2021 for Appellants Derek Belhumeur, Clayton Fruge and Vantrerius McKnight [21-20109] (CAG) [Entered: 03/08/2021 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Derek Belhumeur, Mr. Clayton Fruge and Mr. Vantrerius McKnight [21-20109] (CCR) [Entered: 03/01/2021 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Helix Energy Solutions Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Carter Crow