This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2020 at 06:36:52 (UTC).

McGowan v. Huddleston, et al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 McGowan filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Huddleston. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1457

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

D. BEHLE, Lieutenant

M. PALIDER, Lieutenant

D. MURTON, Lieutenant

JONES, ADX Nurse

WILLIAMS, ADX Nurse

N. RUDD, Lieutenant

J. ARMIJO, Lieutenant

S. SCARBROUGH, Lieutenant

C. HUDDLESTON, ADX Nurse

Plaintiff / Appellant

MICHAEL MCGOWAN

Los Angeles, CA 90053

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Susan Begesse Prose

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

1801 California Street, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80202

Paul Farley

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

1801 California Street, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80202

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michael McGowan

Attorney at USP - Florence ADMAX

P.O. Box 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90053

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Envelope

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

[10707777] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Volume 1-pleadings. [19-1457] [Entered: 01/07/2020 10:14 AM]

Open Document

[10707314] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief and fee or 1915 forms due 02/18/2020 for Michael McGowan. Record on appeal 10th Circuit due 01/27/2020 [19-1457] [Entered: 01/06/2020 09:35 AM]

Open Document

[10707313] District court order denying 1915(b) motion.. [19-1457] [Entered: 01/06/2020 09:33 AM]

Open Document #2

Envelope

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

[10703140] Entry of appearance filed by Michael McGowan. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/12/2019. Manner of Service: US mail [19-1457] [Entered: 12/17/2019 09:11 AM]

Open Document

[10702761] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Paul Farley for Williams, S. Scarbrough, N. Rudd, M. Palider, D. Murton, Jones, C. Huddleston, D. Behle, and J. Armijo. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1457] [Entered: 12/16/2019 11:47 AM]

Open Document #2

New General Dkt Letter - Pro Se

Open Document #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10708930] Notice of change of address filed by Michael McGowan. The court's 01/06/2020 correspondence re-mailed to new address. [19-1457] [Entered: 01/10/2020 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10707777] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Volume 1-pleadings. [19-1457] [Entered: 01/07/2020 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10707314] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief and fee or 1915 forms due 02/18/2020 for Michael McGowan. Record on appeal 10th Circuit due 01/27/2020 [19-1457] [Entered: 01/06/2020 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10707313] District court order denying 1915(b) motion.. [19-1457] [Entered: 01/06/2020 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10703188] Memorandum of Law received from Michael McGowan but not filed. Original. Served on 12/12/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1457] [Entered: 12/17/2019 10:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10703140] Entry of appearance filed by Michael McGowan. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/12/2019. Manner of Service: US mail [19-1457] [Entered: 12/17/2019 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702761] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Paul Farley for Williams, S. Scarbrough, N. Rudd, M. Palider, D. Murton, Jones, C. Huddleston, D. Behle, and J. Armijo. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1457] [Entered: 12/16/2019 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docket[10702749] Entry of appearance submitted by Paul Farley for Appellees J. Armijo, D. Behle, C. Huddleston, Jones, D. Murton, M. Palider, N. Rudd, S. Scarbrough and Williams for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1457] --[Edited 12/16/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 12/16/2019.] PF [Entered: 12/16/2019 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10699476] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 12/03/2019. Notice of appearance due on 12/17/2019 for J. Armijo, D. Behle, C. Huddleston, Jones, D. Murton, M. Palider, N. Rudd, S. Scarbrough and Williams, and Notice of appearance due on 01/02/2020 for Michael McGowan. Fee or 1915 forms due 01/02/2020 for Michael McGowan. [19-1457] [Entered: 12/03/2019 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.