This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/08/2020 at 06:06:24 (UTC).

McCoy v. Houston, et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 McCoy filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Houston. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2002

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DAN HOUSTON, in his individual capacity

PETE GOLDEN, in his individual capacity

RUDY MORA, in his individual capacity

MANUEL GONZALES, III, in his individual capacity

THE BOARD OF BERNALILLO COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

BERNALILLO COUNTY EX REL. BERNALILLO COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

Plaintiff / Appellant

MATTHEW MCCOY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Deborah Wells

Attorney at Kennedy, Moulton & Wells, P.C.

2201 San Pedro Drive Ne, Building 2, Suite 105

Albuquerque, NM 87110-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Kari T. Morrissey

Attorney at Kari Morrissey Law Offices

201 12Th Street Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Marshall Ray

Attorney at Marshall J. Ray Law Offices

201 Twelfth Street Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10722097] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 03/09/2020 for Matthew McCoy. [20-2002] [Entered: 03/03/2020 10:49 AM]

Open Document

[10712585] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Deborah Wells for Captain Dan Houston, Mr. Pete Golden, Bernalillo County Sheriff's Office, Mr. Manuel Gonzales, III, Rudy Mora and The Board of Bernalillo County Commissioners. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2002] [Entered: 01/24/2020 09:38 AM]

Open Document

[10712510] Notice issued. Appellees notice of appearance due and not filed with the court. Notice of appearance due on 01/27/2020 for Bernalillo County Sheriff's Office, Pete Golden, Manuel Gonzales III, Dan Houston, Rudy Mora, and The Board of Bernalillo County Commissioners. [20-2002] [Entered: 01/24/2020 07:35 AM]

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document

[10712095] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 01/22/2020. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 03/02/2020 for Matthew McCoy. [20-2002] [Entered: 01/22/2020 03:55 PM]

Open Document

[10711896] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Marshall Ray for Matthew McCoy. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/22/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-2002] [Entered: 01/22/2020 12:01 PM]

Open Document

[10711873] Notice received from Matthew McCoy that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 01/22/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-2002] MR [Entered: 01/22/2020 11:29 AM]

Open Document

[10711871] Docketing statement filed by Matthew McCoy. Served on 01/22/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2002] MR [Entered: 01/22/2020 11:25 AM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Preliminary ROA

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10722097] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 03/09/2020 for Matthew McCoy. [20-2002] [Entered: 03/03/2020 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10712585] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Deborah Wells for Captain Dan Houston, Mr. Pete Golden, Bernalillo County Sheriff's Office, Mr. Manuel Gonzales, III, Rudy Mora and The Board of Bernalillo County Commissioners. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2002] [Entered: 01/24/2020 09:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket[10712546] Entry of appearance submitted by Deborah D. Wells for Appellees Bernalillo County Sheriff's Office, Mr. Pete Golden, Mr. Manuel Gonzales, III, Captain Dan Houston, Rudy Mora and The Board of Bernalillo County Commissioners for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/24/2020. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 01/24/2020 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 1/24/2020.] [20-2002] DW [Entered: 01/24/2020 09:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10712510] Notice issued. Appellees notice of appearance due and not filed with the court. Notice of appearance due on 01/27/2020 for Bernalillo County Sheriff's Office, Pete Golden, Manuel Gonzales III, Dan Houston, Rudy Mora, and The Board of Bernalillo County Commissioners. [20-2002] [Entered: 01/24/2020 07:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10712391] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 01/31/2020 at 2:00 pm (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [20-2002] [Entered: 01/23/2020 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10712095] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 01/22/2020. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 03/02/2020 for Matthew McCoy. [20-2002] [Entered: 01/22/2020 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10711896] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Marshall Ray for Matthew McCoy. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/22/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-2002] [Entered: 01/22/2020 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket[10711878] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 01/29/2020 for Mitchell R. Elfers, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-2002] [Entered: 01/22/2020 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10711873] Notice received from Matthew McCoy that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 01/22/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-2002] MR [Entered: 01/22/2020 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket[10711872] Entry of appearance submitted by Marshall Jason Ray for Appellant Matthew McCoy for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/22/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2002] --[Edited 01/22/2020 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 1/22/2020.] MR [Entered: 01/22/2020 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10711871] Docketing statement filed by Matthew McCoy. Served on 01/22/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2002] MR [Entered: 01/22/2020 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10708178] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/08/2020 Docketing statement, transcript order form and entry of appearance due 01/22/2020 for Matthew McCoy. Notice of appearance due on 01/22/2020 for Bernalillo County Sheriff's Office, Pete Golden, Manuel Gonzales III, Dan Houston, Rudy Mora and The Board of Bernalillo County Commissioners [20-2002] [Entered: 01/08/2020 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marshall Ray