This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/14/2022 at 06:00:36 (UTC).

Guaetta & Benson, LLC, et al v. McArdle

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 Guaetta Benson, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against McArdle. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1034

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee and Plaintiff

NICHOLAS L. TRIANTOS

Lynnfield, MA 01940-0000

Defendants

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Inc. Trust 2004-HE4, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-HE4

SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.

COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., as Successor-in-Interest to Countrywide Home Loans, Inc

NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Defendant / Appellees

GUAETTA & BENSON, LLC

AUDREY BENSON

PETER V. GUAETTA

SARAH T. FITZPATRICK

Interested Party

MICHAEL M. MCARDLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee and Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas L. Triantos

200 Broadway

Lynnfield, MA 01940-0000

Defendant Attorneys

Peter Francis Carr II

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott LLC

2 International Pl, 16Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110-2602

Cody Joseph Cocanig

Attorney at Globant, LLC

875 Howard St, Ste 320

San Francisco, CA 94103-3027

Jonathan S. Rankin

Attorney at Orlans PC

465 Waverley Oaks Rd, Ste 401

Waltham, MA 02452

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Timothy Joseph Ervin

Attorney at Gallant & Ervin LLC

1 Olde North Rd, Ste 103

Chelmsford, MA 01824-0000

Nancy A. Morency

Attorney at Gallant & Ervin LLC

1 Olde North Rd, Ste 103

Chelmsford, MA 01824-0000

Sean B. Cullen

Attorney at Guaetta & Benson LLC

Po Box 519

Chelmsford, MA 01824-0000

Interested Party Attorney

Lucas B. McArdle

Attorney at McArdle Law & Assoc PLLC

280 Merrimack St, Ste 311

Lawrence, MA 01843

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Michael M. McArdle indicating transcripts are being ordered. Served on 01/27/2022. [22-1034] (LBM) [Entered: 01/27/2022 02:53 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Michael M. McArdle. Served on 01/27/2022. [22-1034] (LBM) [Entered: 01/27/2022 02:54 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Michael M. McArdle filed by Attorney Lucas McArdle. Served on 01/27/2022. [22-1034] (LBM) [Entered: 01/27/2022 02:55 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 02/11/2022, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Sean B. Cullen for Audrey Benson, Guaetta & Benson, LLC, Peter V. Guaetta and Sarah T. Fitzpatrick and Jonathan S. Rankin for Countrywide Home Loans and Bank of America, N.A.. [22-1034] (GB) [Entered: 01/28/2022 05:46 AM]

Open Document #1

Transcript Order Form

Open Document #2

Transcript Acknowledgment

Open Document

NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Jonathan S. Rankin for Countrywide Home Loans and Bank of America, N.A.. [22-1034] (GB) [Entered: 02/14/2022 09:49 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Jonathan S. Rankin for Countrywide Home Loans and Bank of America, N.A.. [22-1034] (GB) [Entered: 02/14/2022 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Michael M. McArdle indicating the following transcripts are being ordered: 09/15/2021, Motion Hrg. Transcript(s) due 04/01/2022 from Court Reporter Richard Henry Romanow. [22-1034] (ATC) [Entered: 01/31/2022 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 02/11/2022, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Sean B. Cullen for Audrey Benson, Guaetta & Benson, LLC, Peter V. Guaetta and Sarah T. Fitzpatrick and Jonathan S. Rankin for Countrywide Home Loans and Bank of America, N.A.. [22-1034] (GB) [Entered: 01/28/2022 05:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Michael M. McArdle filed by Attorney Lucas McArdle. Served on 01/27/2022. [22-1034] (LBM) [Entered: 01/27/2022 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Michael M. McArdle. Served on 01/27/2022. [22-1034] (LBM) [Entered: 01/27/2022 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Michael M. McArdle indicating transcripts are being ordered. Served on 01/27/2022. [22-1034] (LBM) [Entered: 01/27/2022 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #129) filed by Appellant Michael M. McArdle. Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript Report/Order form due 01/27/2022 . [22-1034] (GB) [Entered: 01/13/2022 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Countrywide Home Lons, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant