This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/12/2021 at 06:14:15 (UTC).

Mayra Loaiza v. California State Police, et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 Mayra Loaiza filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against California State Police. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-56195

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CALIFORNIA STATE POLICE

GLENDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT

Plaintiff / Appellant

MAYRA DOLORES LOAIZA

Burbank, CA 91502

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Mayra Dolores Loaiza

150 S Glenoaks Blvd.

Burbank, CA 91502

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Filed Appellant Mayra Dolores Loaiza motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [11908265] (NAC) [Entered: 11/27/2020 09:47 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed Appellant Mayra Dolores Loaiza statement that appeal should go forward [11908264] (NAC) [Entered: 11/27/2020 09:45 PM]

#3

(#3) Filed Appellant Mayra Dolores Loaiza motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [11904075] (NAC) [Entered: 11/23/2020 04:03 PM]

2 #4

Additional Document

2 #3

Additional Document

#2

Additional Document

2 #1

Main Document

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed Appellant Mayra Dolores Loaiza motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [11908265] (NAC) [Entered: 11/27/2020 09:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed Appellant Mayra Dolores Loaiza statement that appeal should go forward [11908264] (NAC) [Entered: 11/27/2020 09:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed Appellant Mayra Dolores Loaiza motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [11904075] (NAC) [Entered: 11/23/2020 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JW): A review of the district courts docket reflects that the district court denied appellant leave to proceed in forma pauperis because it found that the action was frivolous. This court may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Within 35 days after the date of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellant also must: (1) file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, OR (2) pay to the district court $505.00 for the filing and docketing fees for this appeal AND file in this court proof that the $505.00 was paid. If appellant does not respond to this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellant files a motion to dismiss the appeal, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). If appellant submits any response to this order other than a motion to dismiss the appeal, the court may dismiss this appeal as frivolous, without further notice. The briefing schedule for this appeal is stayed. The Clerk shall serve on appellant: (1) a form motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, (2) a form statement that the appeal should go forward, and (3) a Form 4 financial affidavit. Appellant may use the enclosed forms for any motion to dismiss the appeal, statement that the appeal should go forward, and/or motion to proceed in forma pauperis. [11896498] (CKP) [Entered: 11/17/2020 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Mayra Dolores Loaiza opening brief due 01/05/2021. [11891949] (JMR) [Entered: 11/13/2020 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Glendale Police Department is a litigant