This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/26/2022 at 05:18:01 (UTC).

Maya Hampton v. John Hamm, et al

Case Summary

On 02/16/2022 Maya Hampton filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against John Hamm. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-10506

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

MAYA HAMPTON

Defendant / Appellees

JOHN Q. HAMM

DEBORAH CROOK

ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Stephen Dana Morrison Jr.

Attorney at The Morrison Law Firm, LLC

3033 Coach Ln

Marietta, GA 30062

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Bart Gregory Harmon

Attorney at Alabama Department of Corrections

301 S Ripley St, Po Box 301501

Montgomery, AL 36130-1501

Carrie Ellis McCollum

600 Dexter Ave

Montgomery, AL 36130-3008

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

DC Memo Opinion and Order Appealed DE# 30

Open Document #4

DC Final Judgment Appealed DE #31

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Maya Hampton on 02/07/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 03/28/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/08/2022 as to Appellant Maya Hampton. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/22/2022 as to Appellee Alabama Department of Corrections, et al. [Entered: 02/22/2022 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alabama Department of Corrections is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bart Gregory Harmon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carrie Ellis McCollum