Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/10/2020 at 06:17:53 (UTC).

May v. Palladino

Case Summary

On 06/11/2020 May filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Palladino. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1807

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

Richard Palladino, in his capacity as Union Trustee of the Laborers' Local 91 Pension Fund and Welfare Fund

Mario Neri, in his capacity as Union Trustee of the Laborers' Local 91 Pension Fund and Welfare Fund

Randy Palladino, in his capacity as Union Trustee of the Laborers' Local 91 Pension Fund and Welfare Fund

Plaintiff / Appellees

James Panepinto, in his capacity as putative Employer Trustee of the Laborers Local 91 Pension Fund and Welfare Fund

Douglas May, in his capacity as Employer Trustee of the Laborers Local 91 Pension Fund and Welfare Fund

Angelo Massaro, in his capacity as Employer Trustee of the Laborers Local 91 Pension Fund and Welfare Fund

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Robert Louis Boreanaz Esq.

Attorney at Lipsitz Green Scime Cambria LLP

42 Delaware Avenue

Buffalo, NY 14202

Joseph L. Guza Esq.

Attorney at Lipsitz Green Scime Cambria LLP

42 Delaware Avenue

Buffalo, NY 14202

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

James D. Donathen Esq.

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

1 Canalside, 125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203

Kyle Tanzer Esq.

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

1 Canalside, 125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203

 

Court Documents

#42

(#42) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Angelo Massaro, Douglas May and James Panepinto in 20-1807, Appellant Angelo Massaro, Douglas May and James Panepinto in 20-2005, informing Court of proposed due date 09/25/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 07/31/2020 by CM/ECF.[2897385] [20-1807, 20-2005] [Entered: 07/31/2020 01:20 PM]

#41

(#41) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Follow-up Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 08/05/2020, Start Time: 2:00 PM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[2895391] [20-1807, 20-2005] [Entered: 07/29/2020 01:44 PM]

#37

(#37) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Douglas May, Angelo Massaro and James Panepinto in 20-1807, Appellant Douglas May, Angelo Massaro and James Panepinto in 20-2005, FILED. Service date 07/16/2020 by CM/ECF. [2886204] [20-1807, 20-2005] [Entered: 07/16/2020 12:49 PM]

#32

(#32) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Mario Neri, Randy Palladino and Richard Palladino in 20-1807, Appellee Mario Neri, Randy Palladino and Richard Palladino in 20-2005, FILED. Service date 07/15/2020 by CM/ECF. [2885023] [20-1807, 20-2005] [Entered: 07/15/2020 01:06 PM]

#31

(#31) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Mario Neri, Randy Palladino and Richard Palladino in 20-1807, Appellee Mario Neri, Randy Palladino and Richard Palladino in 20-2005, informing Court of proposed due date 09/25/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 07/15/2020 by CM/ECF.[2885008] [20-1807, 20-2005] [Entered: 07/15/2020 12:56 PM]

#26

No Description Available

#25

No Description Available

21 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#18

No Description Available

#10

(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Mario Neri, Randy Palladino and Richard Palladino, FILED. Service date 06/26/2020 by CM/ECF.[2871759] [20-1807] [Entered: 06/26/2020 10:58 AM]

#8

(#13) CURED DEFECTIVE, Form C, [ # 8 ], on behalf of Appellant Mario Neri, Randy Palladino and Richard Palladino, FILED.[2871841] [20-1807] [Entered: 06/26/2020 11:40 AM]

#7

(#7) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [6], on behalf of Appellant Mario Neri and Randy Palladino, FILED.[2871654] [20-1807] [Entered: 06/26/2020 10:14 AM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/14/2020, RECEIVED.[2861188] [20-1807] [Entered: 06/12/2020 04:57 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Angelo Massaro, Douglas May and James Panepinto in 20-1807, Appellant Angelo Massaro, Douglas May and James Panepinto in 20-2005, informing Court of proposed due date 09/25/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 07/31/2020 by CM/ECF.[2897385] [20-1807, 20-2005] [Entered: 07/31/2020 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Follow-up Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 08/05/2020, Start Time: 2:00 PM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[2895391] [20-1807, 20-2005] [Entered: 07/29/2020 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Mario Neri, Randy Palladino and Richard Palladino in 20-1807 Brief due date as 09/25/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 09/25/2020, FILED.[2886228] [20-1807, 20-2005] [Entered: 07/16/2020 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ATTORNEY, Kyle Tanzer for Angelo Massaro James Panepinto, in case 20-2005 Kyle Tanzer for Angelo Massaro James Panepinto, in case 20-1807, [ # 37 ], ADDED.[2886225] [20-1807, 20-2005] [Entered: 07/16/2020 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Douglas May, Angelo Massaro and James Panepinto in 20-1807, Appellant Douglas May, Angelo Massaro and James Panepinto in 20-2005, FILED. Service date 07/16/2020 by CM/ECF. [2886204] [20-1807, 20-2005] [Entered: 07/16/2020 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ATTORNEY, Joseph L. Guza for Richard Palladino Mario Neri Randy Palladino, in case 20-2005 Joseph L. Guza for Richard Palladino Mario Neri Randy Palladino, in case 20-1807 , [ # 32 ], ADDED.[2885179] [20-1807, 20-2005] [Entered: 07/15/2020 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Mario Neri, Randy Palladino and Richard Palladino in 20-1807, Appellee Mario Neri, Randy Palladino and Richard Palladino in 20-2005, FILED. Service date 07/15/2020 by CM/ECF. [2885023] [20-1807, 20-2005] [Entered: 07/15/2020 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Mario Neri, Randy Palladino and Richard Palladino in 20-1807, Appellee Mario Neri, Randy Palladino and Richard Palladino in 20-2005, informing Court of proposed due date 09/25/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 07/15/2020 by CM/ECF.[2885008] [20-1807, 20-2005] [Entered: 07/15/2020 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Angelo Massaro, Douglas May and James Panepinto, FILED. Service date 07/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2883063] [20-1807] [Entered: 07/13/2020 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE, to Appellee Angelo Massaro, Douglas May and James Panepinto in 20-1807 , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2882624] [20-1807, 20-2005] [Entered: 07/13/2020 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CURED DEFECTIVE, Form C, [ # 8 ], on behalf of Appellant Mario Neri, Randy Palladino and Richard Palladino, FILED.[2871841] [20-1807] [Entered: 06/26/2020 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Mario Neri, Randy Palladino and Richard Palladino, FILED. Service date 06/26/2020 by CM/ECF.[2871759] [20-1807] [Entered: 06/26/2020 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Mario Neri, Randy Palladino and Richard Palladino, FILED. Service date 06/26/2020 by CM/ECF.[2871755] [20-1807] [Entered: 06/26/2020 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Mario Neri, Randy Palladino and Richard Palladino, FILED. Service date 06/26/2020 by CM/ECF.[2871752] [20-1807] [Entered: 06/26/2020 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [6], on behalf of Appellant Mario Neri and Randy Palladino, FILED.[2871654] [20-1807] [Entered: 06/26/2020 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF CIVIL CROSS APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Angelo Massaro, Douglas May and James Panepinto, FILED. [2871781] [20-2005] [Entered: 06/26/2020 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docket(#6) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Mario Neri, Randy Palladino and Richard Palladino, FILED. Service date 06/25/2020 by CM/ECF.[2871321] [20-1807] [Entered: 06/25/2020 05:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • Docket(#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Mario Neri, Randy Palladino and Richard Palladino, district court receipt # 0209-3863832, FILED.[2861193] [20-1807] [Entered: 06/12/2020 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/14/2020, RECEIVED.[2861188] [20-1807] [Entered: 06/12/2020 04:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Mario Neri, Randy Palladino and Richard Palladino, FILED. [2861178] [20-1807] [Entered: 06/12/2020 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James D. Donathen