This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/28/2020 at 06:27:45 (UTC).

Maxill Inc. v. Loops, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 Maxill Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Loops, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1519

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

LOOPS FLEXBRUSH, LLC

LOOPS, LLC

Plaintiff / Appellees

MAXILL INC., a Canadian corporation

MAXILL INC., an Ohio corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Kent M. Walker

Attorney at Lewis Kohn Walker LLP

15030 Avenue Of Science

San Diego, CA 92128

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Mudit Kakar Ph.D.

Attorney at Choi Capital Law PLLC

2101 Fourth Avenue

Seattle, WA 98121

 

Court Documents

#18

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2020
  • Docket(#19) Note to file: The following cases are associated:20-1519 Lead with 20-1618 Consolidated member case. FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [688320] [20-1519, 20-1618] [CAB] [Entered: 04/20/2020 01:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting motion [ # 16 ] to the extent that the defendants-appellants' opening brief is due no later than May 26, 2020. The plaintiffs-appellees should calculate the response brief due date from the date of filing of defendants-appellants' opening brief. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [688301] [LMS] [Entered: 04/20/2020 12:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • Docket(#17) REMINDER : All counsel of record are reminded of their responsibility per Fed. Cir. R. 47.4(a) and Fed. Cir. R. 47.3 to promptly submit an amended Certificate of Interest (COI) and/or Entry of Appearance (EOA) as information changes during the pendency of the appeal. Failure to comply with these Rules may delay the timely processing of your case or result in adverse action. [687741] [JAL] [Entered: 04/17/2020 09:10 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION of Appellants Loops Flexbrush, LLC and Loops, LLC to correct or supplement [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 04/16/2020 by email. [687593] [20-1519] [Kent Walker] [Entered: 04/16/2020 02:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting motion [ # 12 ]. The appeals are consolidated. Maxills opening brief is due no later than May 26, 2020. The revised official caption is reflected in this order. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [686850] [20-1519, 20-1618] [NL] [Entered: 04/14/2020 02:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corrected Entry of appearance for Mudit Kakar as principal counsel for Appellee Maxill Inc.. Service: 04/08/2020 by email. [685343] [20-1519] [Mudit Kakar] [Entered: 04/08/2020 03:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellee Maxill Inc.. Service: 04/08/2020 by email. [685339] [20-1519] [Mudit Kakar] [Entered: 04/08/2020 03:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION of Appellants Loops Flexbrush, LLC and Loops, LLC to consolidate appeals (20-1618), to extend the time to 05/26/2020 to file the Appellant's opening brief., to modify the official caption [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 04/06/2020 by email. [684434] [20-1519] [Kent Walker] [Entered: 04/06/2020 02:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellants Loops Flexbrush, LLC and Loops, LLC, Motion to consolidate appeals, extend the time to file opening brief, and correct the caption, [ # 10 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 04/13/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [684248] --[Edited 04/06/2020 by LMN] [LMN] [Entered: 04/06/2020 09:47 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION of Appellants Loops Flexbrush, LLC and Loops, LLC to consolidate appeals (20-1618), to extend the time to 05/26/2020 to file the Appellants' opening brief., to modify the official caption [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 04/03/2020 by email. [684152] [20-1519] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 11 ] [Kent Walker] [Entered: 04/03/2020 05:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellants Loops Flexbrush, LLC and Loops, LLC, Motion to consolidate, to extend time, and to correct caption [ # 8 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 04/10/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [684056] [CAB] [Entered: 04/03/2020 02:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION of Appellants Loops Flexbrush, LLC and Loops, LLC to consolidate appeals (20-1618), to extend the time to 05/26/2020 to file the TIME TO FILE APPELLANTS' OPENING BRIEF., to correct or supplement [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 04/02/2020 by email. [683793] [20-1519] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 9 ] [Kent Walker] [Entered: 04/02/2020 02:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Maxill Inc.. Service: 03/13/2020 by email. [678575] [20-1519] [Mudit Kakar] [Entered: 03/13/2020 11:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Maxill Inc.. Service: 03/13/2020 by email. [678574] [20-1519] [Mudit Kakar] [Entered: 03/13/2020 11:41 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Mudit Kakar as principal counsel for Appellee Maxill Inc.. Service: 03/13/2020 by email. [678570] [20-1519] [Mudit Kakar] [Entered: 03/13/2020 11:40 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellants Loops Flexbrush, LLC and Loops, LLC. Service: 03/11/2020 by email. [677958] [20-1519] [Kent Walker] [Entered: 03/11/2020 03:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellants Loops Flexbrush, LLC and Loops, LLC. Service: 03/11/2020 by email. [677957] [20-1519] [Kent Walker] [Entered: 03/11/2020 03:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Kent M. Walker as principal counsel for Appellants Loops Flexbrush, LLC and Loops, LLC. Service: 03/11/2020 by email. [677956] [20-1519] [Kent Walker] [Entered: 03/11/2020 03:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 02/19/2020. [675099] Entry of Appearance is due 03/13/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 03/13/2020. Docketing Statement is due 03/13/2020. Appellant's brief is due 04/28/2020. [LMN] [Entered: 02/28/2020 10:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAXILL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Loop LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mudit Kakar Ph.D.