This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/04/2023 at 06:10:23 (UTC).

Maucha v. The Bank of New York Mellon

Case Summary

On 02/03/2023 Maucha filed an Other lawsuit against The Bank of New York Mellon. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-173

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Defendants

Countrywide Home Loane

M&T Bank

One M&T Plaza

Wilmington Trust

Specialized Loan Servicing LLC

Giovanni A. Amaya

Blankrome Law Firm

Attorney Andrew M. Williamson

McNamee Hosea Law Firm

Aaron D. Neal

Bank of America

Plaintiff / Appellant

Paul Maucha

Defendant / Appellees

The Bank of New York Mellon, FKA The Bank of New York, as Indenture Trustee for CWHEQ

Loan Asset-Backed Notes, Series 2007-E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Paul Maucha

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kathleen McClure Massimo Esq.

David Seth Yohay Esq.

 

Court Documents

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

1 #2

Case FILED

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/20/2023, RECEIVED.[3466839] [23-173] [Entered: 02/09/2023 04:20 PM]

3 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

3 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#4

(#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3466855] [23-173] [Entered: 02/09/2023 04:29 PM]

#8

(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Loan Asset-Backed Notes, Series 2007-E and The Bank of New York Mellon, FILED. Service date 02/23/2023 by US mail.[3473449] [23-173] [Entered: 02/23/2023 02:19 PM]

#9

(#9) ORDER, dated 02/27/2023, dismissing appeal by 03/20/2023, unless Appellant Paul Maucha, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3475043] [23-173] [Entered: 02/27/2023 03:24 PM]

#10

(#10) ORDER, dated 02/27/2023, dismissing appeal by 03/20/2023, unless Appellant Paul Maucha, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3475049] [23-173] [Entered: 02/27/2023 03:32 PM]

#11

(#11) ORDER, dated 02/27/2023, dismissing appeal by 03/20/2023, unless Appellant Paul Maucha, submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3475056] [23-173] [Entered: 02/27/2023 03:36 PM]

#12

(#12) MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Paul Maucha, FILED. Service date 03/20/2023 by US mail.[3489424] [23-173] [Entered: 03/24/2023 05:42 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Paul Maucha, FILED. Service date 03/20/2023 by US mail.[3489424] [23-173] [Entered: 03/24/2023 05:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER, dated 02/27/2023, dismissing appeal by 03/20/2023, unless Appellant Paul Maucha, submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3475056] [23-173] [Entered: 02/27/2023 03:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER, dated 02/27/2023, dismissing appeal by 03/20/2023, unless Appellant Paul Maucha, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3475049] [23-173] [Entered: 02/27/2023 03:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER, dated 02/27/2023, dismissing appeal by 03/20/2023, unless Appellant Paul Maucha, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3475043] [23-173] [Entered: 02/27/2023 03:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Loan Asset-Backed Notes, Series 2007-E and The Bank of New York Mellon, FILED. Service date 02/23/2023 by US mail.[3473449] [23-173] [Entered: 02/23/2023 02:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3466855] [23-173] [Entered: 02/09/2023 04:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3466848] [23-173] [Entered: 02/09/2023 04:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/20/2023, RECEIVED.[3466839] [23-173] [Entered: 02/09/2023 04:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Paul Maucha, FILED. [3466831] [23-173] [Entered: 02/09/2023 04:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less