Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/25/2021 at 06:10:43 (UTC).

Matthew MacDowell v. Synnex Corporation

Case Summary

On 04/26/2021 Matthew MacDowell filed an Other lawsuit against Synnex Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15744

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendant / Appellee

SYNNEX CORPORATION

Plaintiff / Appellant

MATTHEW MACDOWELL, United States ex rel.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Rene P. Tatro

Attorney at TATRO TEKOSKY SADWICK LLP

333 S. Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Kevin Reza Massoudi

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

725 South Figueroa Street, Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5406

Ryan Gainor

Attorney at Hinckley Allen

100 Westminster St., Suite 1500

Providence, RI 02903

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Eric James Buescher

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

840 Malcolm Road

Burlingame, CA 94010

Justin Berger

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

840 Malcolm Road

Burlingame, CA 94010

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12125979] (CL) [Entered: 05/26/2021 04:40 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 05/26/2021, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12110460] (CL) [Entered: 05/12/2021 11:17 AM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Matthew MacDowell Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/03/2021. [12099574] [21-15744] (Berger, Justin) [Entered: 05/03/2021 10:51 AM]

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12125979] (CL) [Entered: 05/26/2021 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docket(#6) Added Attorney(s) Ryan Gainor for party(s) Appellee Synnex Corporation, in case 21-15744. [12118287] (JFF) [Entered: 05/19/2021 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Ryan M. Gainor (Hinckley, Allen & Snyder LLP, 100 Westminster Street, Suite 1500, Providence, Rhode Island 02903) for Appellee Synnex Corporation. Date of service: 05/19/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12117835] [21-15744] (Gainor, Ryan) [Entered: 05/19/2021 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 05/26/2021, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12110460] (CL) [Entered: 05/12/2021 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/03/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12099873]. [21-15744] (AD) [Entered: 05/03/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Matthew MacDowell Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/03/2021. [12099574] [21-15744] (Berger, Justin) [Entered: 05/03/2021 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Matthew MacDowell Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/03/2021. Transcript ordered by 05/24/2021. Transcript due 06/22/2021. Appellant Matthew MacDowell opening brief due 08/02/2021. Appellee Synnex Corporation answering brief due 09/02/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12086902] (RT) [Entered: 04/26/2021 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synnex Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric James Buescher