This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/25/2023 at 06:02:46 (UTC).

Matthew Denholm v. ADT, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 Matthew Denholm filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ADT, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-6116

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

MATTHEW T. DENHOLM, Regional Director of the Ninth Region of the National Labor Relations Board, for and on behalf of the National Labor Relations Board

ADT, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Richard J. Lussier

Kyle Andrew Mohr

Rachel Elise Ehlermann

Henry Bryce Farrington

Scott R. McLaughlin

Jeremy Moritz

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: first brief due 03/06/2023. second brief due 04/05/2023. third brief due 05/05/2023. [22-6115, 22-6116] (RLB) [Entered: 01/23/2023 09:24 AM]

#20

(#20) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee ADT, LLC in 22-6115, 22-6116 by Scott R. McLaughlin. Certificate of Service: 01/13/2023. [22-6115, 22-6116] (SRM) [Entered: 01/13/2023 03:22 PM]

#19

(#19) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee ADT, LLC in 22-6115, 22-6116 by Jeremy C. Moritz. Certificate of Service: 01/13/2023. [22-6115, 22-6116] (JM) [Entered: 01/13/2023 01:51 PM]

#18

(#18) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee ADT, LLC in 22-6115, 22-6116 by Henry Bryce Farrington. Certificate of Service: 01/12/2023. [22-6115, 22-6116] (HBF) [Entered: 01/12/2023 06:39 PM]

#17

RESTRICTED

#16

(#16) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee ADT, LLC in 22-6115, 22-6116 by Rachel Roney. Certificate of Service: 01/10/2023. [22-6115, 22-6116] (REE) [Entered: 01/11/2023 10:22 AM]

#14

(#14) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 10 ], filed by Ms. Rachel Elise Ehlermann for ADT, LLC in 22-6115, 22-6116 is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. [22-6115, 22-6116] (RLB) [Entered: 01/11/2023 09:22 AM]

#13

(#13) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 9 ], filed by Ms. Rachel Elise Ehlermann for ADT, LLC in 22-6115, 22-6116 is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. [22-6115, 22-6116] (RLB) [Entered: 01/11/2023 09:17 AM]

#12

(#12) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 8 ], filed by Ms. Rachel Elise Ehlermann for ADT, LLC in 22-6115, 22-6116 is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. [22-6115, 22-6116] (RLB) [Entered: 01/11/2023 09:13 AM]

9 #1

appearance form

8 #2

Additional Document

8 #1

appearance form

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Kyle Andrew Mohr for Appellee Cross-Appellant Matthew T. Denholm.. Certificate of Service: 01/05/2023. [22-6116] (KAM) [Entered: 01/05/2023 04:14 PM]

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Cross-Appellant Matthew T. Denholm in 22-6115, 22-6116 by Kyle A. Mohr. Certificate of Service: 12/30/2022. [22-6115, 22-6116] (KAM) [Entered: 12/30/2022 11:09 AM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant Matthew T. Denholm. Transcript needed: n. (RLB) [Entered: 12/27/2022 10:55 AM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Cross-Appellant Matthew T. Denholm in 22-6115, 22-6116 by Richard J. Lussier. Certificate of Service: 12/27/2022. [22-6115, 22-6116] (RJL) [Entered: 12/27/2022 04:30 PM]

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: first brief due 03/06/2023. second brief due 04/05/2023. third brief due 05/05/2023. [22-6115, 22-6116] (RLB) [Entered: 01/23/2023 09:24 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee ADT, LLC in 22-6115, 22-6116 by Scott R. McLaughlin. Certificate of Service: 01/13/2023. [22-6115, 22-6116] (SRM) [Entered: 01/13/2023 03:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee ADT, LLC in 22-6115, 22-6116 by Jeremy C. Moritz. Certificate of Service: 01/13/2023. [22-6115, 22-6116] (JM) [Entered: 01/13/2023 01:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee ADT, LLC in 22-6115, 22-6116 by Henry Bryce Farrington. Certificate of Service: 01/12/2023. [22-6115, 22-6116] (HBF) [Entered: 01/12/2023 06:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ***DOCUMENT LOCKED - APPLIED TO INCORRECT CASE - COUNSEL INSTRUCTE4D TO REFILE IN ONLY THE CASE WHICH THEY ARE APPELLANT AND UNCHECK OTHER CASE WHICH DOES NOT APPLY*** CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Rachel Elise Ehlermann for Appellant Cross-Appellee ADT, LLC in 22-6115, 22-6116.. Certificate of Service: 01/10/2023. [22-6115, 22-6116]--[Edited 01/11/2023 by RLB] (REE) [Entered: 01/11/2023 10:24 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee ADT, LLC in 22-6115, 22-6116 by Rachel Roney. Certificate of Service: 01/10/2023. [22-6115, 22-6116] (REE) [Entered: 01/11/2023 10:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • Docket(#15) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The corporate disclosure , [ # 6927923-2 ], filed by Ms. Rachel Elise Ehlermann for ADT, LLC in 22-6115, 22-6116 is deficient for the reason noted: incorrect format and does not list all case numbers which apply. You may correct the deficiency and refile within 7 days. [22-6115, 22-6116] (RLB) [Entered: 01/11/2023 09:28 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 10 ], filed by Ms. Rachel Elise Ehlermann for ADT, LLC in 22-6115, 22-6116 is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. [22-6115, 22-6116] (RLB) [Entered: 01/11/2023 09:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 9 ], filed by Ms. Rachel Elise Ehlermann for ADT, LLC in 22-6115, 22-6116 is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. [22-6115, 22-6116] (RLB) [Entered: 01/11/2023 09:17 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 8 ], filed by Ms. Rachel Elise Ehlermann for ADT, LLC in 22-6115, 22-6116 is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. [22-6115, 22-6116] (RLB) [Entered: 01/11/2023 09:13 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ***DOCUMENT LOCKED - INCORRECT .pdf FORMAT; APPLIED TO CASE NOT LISTED ON FORM; INCORRECT ATTACHMENT (ADMISSION IS NOT TO BE FILED WITH APPEARANCE FORM); AND COUNSEL TO FILE FORM USING THEIR OWN PACER ACCOUNT - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS A NON-MODIFIABLE .pdf DOCUMENT; LIST ALL CASE NUMBERS WHICH APPLY; FILE ADMISSION FORM PROPERLY; AND REFILE USING THEIR PACER ACCOUNT *** APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee ADT, LLC in 22-6115, 22-6116 by Scott R. McLaughlin. Certificate of Service: 01/10/2023. [22-6115, 22-6116]--[Edited 01/11/2023 by RLB] (REE) [Entered: 01/10/2023 06:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ***DOCUMENT LOCKED - INCORRECT .pdf FORMAT; APPLIED TO CASE NOT LISTED ON FORM; INCORRECT ATTACHMENT (ADMISSION IS NOT TO BE FILED WITH APPEARANCE FORM); AND COUNSEL TO FILE FORM USING THEIR OWN PACER ACCOUNT - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS A NON-MODIFIABLE .pdf DOCUMENT; LIST ALL CASE NUMBERS WHICH APPLY; FILE ADMISSION FORM PROPERLY; AND REFILE USING THEIR PACER ACCOUNT ***APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee ADT, LLC in 22-6115, 22-6116 by Jeremy C. Moritz. Certificate of Service: 01/10/2023. [22-6115, 22-6116]--[Edited 01/11/2023 by RLB] (REE) [Entered: 01/10/2023 06:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ***DOCUMENT LOCKED - INCORRECT .pdf FORMAT; APPLIED TO CASE NOT LISTED ON FORM; INCORRECT ATTACHMENT (ADMISSION IS NOT TO BE FILED WITH APPEARANCE FORM); AND COUNSEL TO FILE FORM USING THEIR OWN PACER ACCOUNT - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS A NON-MODIFIABLE .pdf DOCUMENT; LIST ALL CASE NUMBERS WHICH APPLY; FILE ADMISSION FORM PROPERLY; AND REFILE USING THEIR PACER ACCOUNT ***APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee ADT, LLC in 22-6115, 22-6116 by Henry Bryce Farrington. Certificate of Service: 01/10/2023. [22-6115, 22-6116]--[Edited 01/11/2023 by RLB] (REE) [Entered: 01/10/2023 06:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ***DOCUMENT LOCKED - INCORRECT .pdf FORMAT AND APPLIED TO CASE NOT LITED ON FORM - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS A NON-MODIFIABLE .pdf DOCUMENT AND LIST ALL CASE NUMBERS WHICH APPLY FOR HER APPEARANCE*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee ADT, LLC in 22-6115 by Rachel Roney. Certificate of Service: 01/10/2023. [22-6115, 22-6116]--[Edited 01/11/2023 by RLB] (REE) [Entered: 01/10/2023 05:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Kyle Andrew Mohr for Appellee Cross-Appellant Matthew T. Denholm.. Certificate of Service: 01/05/2023. [22-6116] (KAM) [Entered: 01/05/2023 04:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ***DOCUMENT LOCKED - APPLIED TO INCORRECT CASE - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE ONLY IN CASE WHICH THEY ARE APPELLANT AND UNCHECK OTHER CASE NUMBER(S) WHICH DO NOT APPLY*** CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Kyle Andrew Mohr for Appellee Cross-Appellant Matthew T. Denholm in 22-6116, 22-6115.. Certificate of Service: 01/05/2023. [22-6116, 22-6115] (KAM) [Entered: 01/05/2023 03:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Cross-Appellant Matthew T. Denholm in 22-6115, 22-6116 by Kyle A. Mohr. Certificate of Service: 12/30/2022. [22-6115, 22-6116] (KAM) [Entered: 12/30/2022 11:09 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Cross-Appellant Matthew T. Denholm in 22-6115, 22-6116 by Richard J. Lussier. Certificate of Service: 12/27/2022. [22-6115, 22-6116] (RJL) [Entered: 12/27/2022 04:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Robin L. Baker (RLB) [Entered: 12/27/2022 10:58 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant Matthew T. Denholm. Transcript needed: n. (RLB) [Entered: 12/27/2022 10:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less