This case was last updated from PACER on 01/11/2020 at 06:03:55 (UTC).

Matthew Allison, et al v. Smoot Enterprises, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 Matthew Allison filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Smoot Enterprises, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-35941

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

PETER BARNES

JAMES DECOU

SMOOT ENTERPRISES, INC., DBA Smoot Brothers Transportation

Defendant / Appellants

HORIZON TRANSPORT, INC.

JONATHAN HOGABOOM

Plaintiff / Appellees

ESTATE OF SARA E. ALLISON, Tim Nay as the Personal Representative

MATTHEW ALLISON, individually

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

R. Daniel Lindahl

Attorney at Bullivant Houser Bailey, PC

888 S.W. Fifth Avenue, Suite 300

Portland, OR 97204-2089

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Steven Jay Brady

Attorney at Brady Law Group

1015 Irwin Street

San Rafael, CA 94901

Kathryn H. Clarke Esquire

P.O. Box 11960

Portland, OR 97211

Jeffrey Isaac Ehrlich Esquire

Attorney at The Ehrlich Law Firm

237 West Fourth Street

Claremont, CA 91711

Steven J. Brady Esquire

Attorney at Brady Law Group

1015 Irwin Street

San Rafael, CA 94901

Amy Bruning

Attorney at D'Amore Law Group

4230 Galewood Street, Suite 200

Lake Oswego, OR 97035

Thomas D'Amore

Attorney at D'Amore Law Group

4230 Galewood Street, Suite 200

Lake Oswego, OR 97035

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 12/19/2019, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11519433] (CL) [Entered: 12/03/2019 01:41 PM]

#3

(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellants Jonathan Hogaboom and Horizon Transport, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/19/2019. [11504363] [19-35941] (Lindahl, R. Daniel) [Entered: 11/19/2019 02:57 PM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • (#13) Added Attorney(s) Thomas D'Amore for party(s) Appellee Matthew Allison, in case 19-35941. [11532325] (JFF) [Entered: 12/13/2019 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • (#12) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Thomas Duane D'Amore (D'Amore Law Group, P.C., 4230 Galewood Street, Suite 200, Lake Oswego, OR 97035) for Appellee Matthew Allison. Date of service: 12/13/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11532314] [19-35941] (D'Amore, Thomas) [Entered: 12/13/2019 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • (#11) Added Attorney(s) Steven J. Brady for party(s) Appellee Matthew Allison, in case 19-35941. [11522637] (JFF) [Entered: 12/05/2019 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • (#10) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Steven Jay Brady (Brady Law Group, 1015 Irwin Street, San Rafael, CA 94901) for Appellee Matthew Allison. Date of service: 12/05/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11522418] [19-35941] (Brady, Steven) [Entered: 12/05/2019 12:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • (#9) Added Attorney(s) Amy Bruning for party(s) Appellee Matthew Allison, in case 19-35941. [11521443] (JFF) [Entered: 12/04/2019 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • (#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Amy Lynn Bruning (D'Amore Law Group, P.C., 4230 Galewood Street, Lake Oswego, OR 97035) for Appellee Matthew Allison. Date of service: 12/04/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11521264] [19-35941] (Bruning, Amy) [Entered: 12/04/2019 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 12/19/2019, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11519433] (CL) [Entered: 12/03/2019 01:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • (#6) Added Attorney(s) Jeffrey Isaac Ehrlich for party(s) Appellee Estate of Sara E. Allison Appellee Matthew Allison, in case 19-35941. [11511623] (JFF) [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • (#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jeffrey I. Ehrlich (The Ehrlich Law Firm, 237 West Fourth Street, Second Floor, Claremont, CA 91711) for Appellees Matthew Allison and Estate of Sara E. Allison. Date of service: 11/25/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11511603] [19-35941] (Ehrlich, Jeffrey) [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • (#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/19/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11504698]. [19-35941] (AD) [Entered: 11/19/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed (ECF) Appellants Jonathan Hogaboom and Horizon Transport, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/19/2019. [11504363] [19-35941] (Lindahl, R. Daniel) [Entered: 11/19/2019 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • (#2) Terminated Steven Jay Brady for Estate of Sara E. Allison and Matthew Allison in 19-35941 (Due to incorrect ECF account information). [11502140] (SLM) [Entered: 11/18/2019 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Jonathan Hogaboom and Horizon Transport, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/19/2019. Transcript ordered by 12/09/2019. Transcript due 01/07/2020. Appellants Jonathan Hogaboom and Horizon Transport, Inc. opening brief due 02/18/2020. Appellees Matthew Allison and Estate of Sara E. Allison answering brief due 03/17/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11495444] (JBS) [Entered: 11/12/2019 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.