This case was last updated from PACER on 05/24/2019 at 06:07:04 (UTC).

Mattatall v. Wall

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 Mattatall filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Wall. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1295

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Petitioner / Appellant

STEPHEN R. MATTATALL

Cranston, RI 02920-0000

Respondent and Respondent / Appellee

ASHBEL T. WALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Stephen R. Mattatall

Po Box 8274

Cranston, RI 02920-0000

Respondent and Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Lauren S. Zurier

Attorney at RI Attorney General's Office

150 S Main St

Providence, RI 02903-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #3

Case Opening Notice

Open Document

SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 30 (Order entered on May 9, 2019 by Chief Judge re: USCA Order directing the district court to issue or deny a certificate of appealability denying a certificate of appealability).. [19-1295] (GK) [Entered: 05/13/2019 09:08 AM]

Open Document

ORDER directing district court to issue or deny a certificate of appealability. [19-1295] (KC) [Entered: 05/03/2019 11:58 AM]

Open Document

ORDER directing petitioner to file a request for a certificate of appealabilty in this court by 06/12/2019. Date of denial by district court: May 9, 2019. [19-1295] (GK) [Entered: 05/13/2019 09:12 AM]

Open Restricted Document #4

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Restricted Document #1

Abbreviated Record

Open Restricted Document #2

Abbreviated Record - Motion for IFP

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER directing petitioner to file a request for a certificate of appealabilty in this court by 06/12/2019. Date of denial by district court: May 9, 2019. [19-1295] (GK) [Entered: 05/13/2019 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 30 (Order entered on May 9, 2019 by Chief Judge re: USCA Order directing the district court to issue or deny a certificate of appealability denying a certificate of appealability).. [19-1295] (GK) [Entered: 05/13/2019 09:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER directing district court to issue or deny a certificate of appealability. [19-1295] (KC) [Entered: 05/03/2019 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #23) filed by Petitioner Stephen R. Mattatall. [19-1295] (KC) [Entered: 03/25/2019 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.