This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2021 at 05:07:51 (UTC).

Matt Martorello v. Lula Williams

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 Matt Martorello filed an Other lawsuit against Lula Williams. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-211

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MATT MARTORELLO

Respondents

LULA WILLIAMS, on behalf of themselves and all individuals similarly situated

GLORIA TURNAGE

GEORGE HENGLE

DOWIN COFFY

MARCELLA P. SINGH, Administrator of the Estate of Felix M. Gillison, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Bernard R. Given II

Attorney at LOEB & LOEB LLP

1010 Santa Monica Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90067

William Nathaniel Grosswendt

Attorney at LOEB & LOEB LLP

1010 Santa Monica Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90067

John David Taliaferro

Attorney at LOEB & LOEB LLP

901 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Respondent Attorneys

ElIzabeth Anne Adams

Attorney at TERRELL MARSHALL LAW GROUP PLLC

936 North 34Th Street

Seattle, WA 98103

John G. Albanese

Attorney at BERGER & MONTAGUE PC

1229 Tyler Street, Ne

Minneapolis, MN 55413

Amy Leigh Austin

Attorney at CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES

626 East Broad Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Leonard Anthony Bennett

Attorney at CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.

763 J. Clyde Morris Boulevard

Newport News, VA 23601

Michael Allen Caddell

Attorney at CADDELL & CHAPMAN

628 East 9Th Street

Houston, TX 77007

Eleanor Michelle Drake

Attorney at BERGER & MONTAGUE PC

1229 Tyler Street, Ne

Minneapolis, MN 55413

Andrew Joseph Guzzo

Attorney at KELLY GUZZO PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road

Fairfax, VA 22030

Kristi Cahoon Kelly

Attorney at KELLY GUZZO PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road

Fairfax, VA 22030

Craig Carley Marchiando

Attorney at CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.

763 J. Clyde Morris Boulevard

Newport News, VA 23601

Casey Shannon Nash

Attorney at KELLY GUZZO PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road

Fairfax, VA 22030

Jennifer Rust Murray

Attorney at TERRELL MARSHALL LAW GROUP PLLC

936 North 34Th Street

Seattle, WA 98103

James Wilson Speer

Attorney at VIRGINIA POVERTY LAW CENTER

919 East Main Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Beth Ellen Terrell

Attorney at TERRELL MARSHALL LAW GROUP PLLC

936 North 34Th Street

Seattle, WA 98103

Matthew W. H. Wessler

Attorney at GUPTA WESSLER PLLC

2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Other Attorneys

David Neal Anthony

Attorney at TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP

P. O. Box 1122

Richmond, VA 23218-1122

Justin Alexander Gray

Attorney at ROSETTE, LLP

44 Grandville Avenue, Sw

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

Timothy James St. George

Attorney at TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP

P. O. Box 1122

Richmond, VA 23218-1122

 

Court Documents

#2

#1

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 5 ]. Number of days granted: 10. Response due: 08/26/2021. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: see attorney preference service report. [1000998956] [21-211] CH [Entered: 08/05/2021 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION by Dowin Coffy, George Hengle, Marcella P. Singh, Gloria Turnage and Lula Williams to extend filing time for response brief until August 26, 2021.. Date and method of service: 08/05/2021 ecf, US mail. [1000998861] [21-211] Matthew Wessler [Entered: 08/05/2021 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Matthew W.H. Wessler for Dowin Coffy, George Hengle, Marcella P. Singh, Gloria Turnage and Lula Williams. [1000998849] [21-211] Matthew Wessler [Entered: 08/05/2021 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 5 NOTICE issued to Dowin Coffy, George Hengle, Marcella P. Singh, Gloria Turnage and Lula Williams requesting response to petition. Mailed to: See attorney preference service report. [21-211] CH [Entered: 08/04/2021 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Permission to appeal case docketed. Originating case number: 3:17-cv-00461-REP. Case manager: CHalupa. [21-211] CH [Entered: 08/04/2021 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Petition for permission to appeal filed by Matt Martorello. [21-211] CH [Entered: 08/04/2021 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David N. Anthony