This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/09/2022 at 06:14:22 (UTC).

Matson Navigation Company, Inc. v. DOT, et al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2022 Matson Navigation Company, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against DOT,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-5212

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Matson Navigation Company, Inc.

Defendant / Appellees

United States Department of Transportation

Maritime Administration

Intervenor Defendant / Appellee

APL Maritime, Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Lucas Cody Townsend

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Joshua M. Wesneski

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Rachel Susan Brass

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Casen Ross

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Charles Wylie Scarborough

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Intervenor Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Brian Timothy Burgess Esquire

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

1900 N Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Gerard Justin Cedrone Esquire

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

100 Northern Avenue

Boston, MA 02210

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CERTIFIED INDEX TO RECORD [1966416] filed by DOT and MARA [Service Date: 09/28/2022 ] [21-1137] (Ross, Casen) [Entered: 09/28/2022 08:47 AM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1966114] filed by DOT and MARA [Service Date: 09/26/2022 ] [22-5224] (Ross, Casen) [Entered: 09/26/2022 02:50 PM]

Open Document

JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1965730] to consolidate cases, to govern future proceedings filed by Matson Navigation Company, Inc. in 21-1137, 22-5212 Length Certification: 804 Words. [21-1137, 22-5212] (Townsend, Lucas) [Entered: 09/23/2022 10:57 AM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1962087] filed by Brian T. Burgess and co-counsel Gerard J. Cedrone on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent APL Maritime, Ltd.. [21-1137] (Burgess, Brian) [Entered: 09/02/2022 04:48 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1961982] filed granting motion for leave to intervene [ # 1904012-2 ]. [21-1137, 22-5212] [Entered: 09/02/2022 11:02 AM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1961925] filed considering motion to lift abeyance and consolidate proceedings, removing case No. 21-1137 from abeyance, consolidating cases 22-5212 (Consolidation started 09/02/2022) with 21-1137. An order as to briefing will be issued after the filing of motions to govern in No. 22-1150. [21-1137, 22-5212] [Entered: 09/02/2022 08:38 AM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1961689] filed by APL Maritime, Ltd. [Service Date: 08/31/2022 ] [22-5212] (Burgess, Brian) [Entered: 08/31/2022 07:08 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1961688] filed by Brian T. Burgess and co-counsel Gerard J. Cedrone on behalf of Appellee APL Maritime, Ltd.. [22-5212] (Burgess, Brian) [Entered: 08/31/2022 07:06 PM]

Open Document

MOTION [1960153] to remove case from abeyance, to consolidate cases filed by Matson Navigation Company, Inc. (Service Date: 08/19/2022 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 1,329 words. [22-5212] (Townsend, Lucas) [Entered: 08/19/2022 05:17 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1960124] filed by Matson Navigation Company, Inc. [Service Date: 08/19/2022 ] [22-5212] (Townsend, Lucas) [Entered: 08/19/2022 03:38 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1960123] filed by Matson Navigation Company, Inc. [Service Date: 08/19/2022 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [22-5212] (Townsend, Lucas) [Entered: 08/19/2022 03:38 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT [1960121] with Disclosure Listing filed by Matson Navigation Company, Inc. [Service Date: 08/19/2022 ] [22-5212] (Townsend, Lucas) [Entered: 08/19/2022 03:37 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING STATEMENT [1960119] filed by Matson Navigation Company, Inc. [Service Date: 08/19/2022 ] [22-5212] (Townsend, Lucas) [Entered: 08/19/2022 03:36 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1960113] filed by Matson Navigation Company, Inc. [Service Date: 08/19/2022 ] [22-5212] (Townsend, Lucas) [Entered: 08/19/2022 03:33 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1958998] filed by Lucas C. Townsend and co-counsel Rachel S. Brass on behalf of Appellant Matson Navigation Company, Inc.. [22-5212] (Townsend, Lucas) [Entered: 08/11/2022 04:19 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1958988] filed by Casen B. Ross and co-counsel Charles W. Scarborough on behalf of Appellees DOT and MARA. [22-5212] (Ross, Casen) [Entered: 08/11/2022 03:45 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1958741] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 09/09/2022. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 09/09/2022. APPELLANT statement of issues due 09/09/2022. APPELLANT underlying decision due 09/09/2022. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 09/09/2022. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 09/09/2022. APPELLANT transcript status report due 09/09/2022. APPELLANT procedural motions due 09/09/2022. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 09/26/2022; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 09/09/2022. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 09/09/2022. APPELLEE procedural motions due 09/09/2022. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 09/26/2022 [22-5212] [Entered: 08/10/2022 03:04 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1958736] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:21-cv-01606-RDM filed by Matson Navigation Company, Inc.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-5212. [22-5212] [Entered: 08/10/2022 03:01 PM]

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED INDEX TO RECORD [1966416] filed by DOT and MARA [Service Date: 09/28/2022 ] [21-1137] (Ross, Casen) [Entered: 09/28/2022 08:47 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1966114] filed by DOT and MARA [Service Date: 09/26/2022 ] [22-5224] (Ross, Casen) [Entered: 09/26/2022 02:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1965730] to consolidate cases, to govern future proceedings filed by Matson Navigation Company, Inc. in 21-1137, 22-5212 Length Certification: 804 Words. [21-1137, 22-5212] (Townsend, Lucas) [Entered: 09/23/2022 10:57 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1962087] filed by Brian T. Burgess and co-counsel Gerard J. Cedrone on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent APL Maritime, Ltd.. [21-1137] (Burgess, Brian) [Entered: 09/02/2022 04:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1961982] filed granting motion for leave to intervene [ # 1904012-2 ]. [21-1137, 22-5212] [Entered: 09/02/2022 11:02 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1961925] filed considering motion to lift abeyance and consolidate proceedings, removing case No. 21-1137 from abeyance, consolidating cases 22-5212 (Consolidation started 09/02/2022) with 21-1137. An order as to briefing will be issued after the filing of motions to govern in No. 22-1150. [21-1137, 22-5212] [Entered: 09/02/2022 08:38 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1961689] filed by APL Maritime, Ltd. [Service Date: 08/31/2022 ] [22-5212] (Burgess, Brian) [Entered: 08/31/2022 07:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1961688] filed by Brian T. Burgess and co-counsel Gerard J. Cedrone on behalf of Appellee APL Maritime, Ltd.. [22-5212] (Burgess, Brian) [Entered: 08/31/2022 07:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1960153] to remove case from abeyance, to consolidate cases filed by Matson Navigation Company, Inc. (Service Date: 08/19/2022 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 1,329 words. [22-5212] (Townsend, Lucas) [Entered: 08/19/2022 05:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1960128] submitted by Matson Navigation Company, Inc. [Service Date: 08/19/2022 ] [22-5212] (Townsend, Lucas) [Entered: 08/19/2022 03:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF ISSUES [1960124] filed by Matson Navigation Company, Inc. [Service Date: 08/19/2022 ] [22-5212] (Townsend, Lucas) [Entered: 08/19/2022 03:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1960123] filed by Matson Navigation Company, Inc. [Service Date: 08/19/2022 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [22-5212] (Townsend, Lucas) [Entered: 08/19/2022 03:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT [1960121] with Disclosure Listing filed by Matson Navigation Company, Inc. [Service Date: 08/19/2022 ] [22-5212] (Townsend, Lucas) [Entered: 08/19/2022 03:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING STATEMENT [1960119] filed by Matson Navigation Company, Inc. [Service Date: 08/19/2022 ] [22-5212] (Townsend, Lucas) [Entered: 08/19/2022 03:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1960113] filed by Matson Navigation Company, Inc. [Service Date: 08/19/2022 ] [22-5212] (Townsend, Lucas) [Entered: 08/19/2022 03:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1958998] filed by Lucas C. Townsend and co-counsel Rachel S. Brass on behalf of Appellant Matson Navigation Company, Inc.. [22-5212] (Townsend, Lucas) [Entered: 08/11/2022 04:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1958988] filed by Casen B. Ross and co-counsel Charles W. Scarborough on behalf of Appellees DOT and MARA. [22-5212] (Ross, Casen) [Entered: 08/11/2022 03:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1958741] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 09/09/2022. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 09/09/2022. APPELLANT statement of issues due 09/09/2022. APPELLANT underlying decision due 09/09/2022. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 09/09/2022. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 09/09/2022. APPELLANT transcript status report due 09/09/2022. APPELLANT procedural motions due 09/09/2022. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 09/26/2022; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 09/09/2022. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 09/09/2022. APPELLEE procedural motions due 09/09/2022. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 09/26/2022 [22-5212] [Entered: 08/10/2022 03:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1958736] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:21-cv-01606-RDM filed by Matson Navigation Company, Inc.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-5212. [22-5212] [Entered: 08/10/2022 03:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. [22-5212] [Entered: 08/10/2022 03:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less