This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2021 at 06:08:37 (UTC).

Matrix Trust Company v. Midlands Management Corp., et al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 Matrix Trust Company filed an Other lawsuit against Midlands Management Corp . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1034

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellant

MATRIX TRUST COMPANY, LLC

Counter Claimants

DENNIS J. OTTIS

RICHARD BIRD

SHERYL CASE

COLIN CALDWELL

CALDWELL AND PARTNERS, INC.

MIDLANDS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Sarah L. Hartley

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 4100

Denver, CO 80203

Robert A. Lewis

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1596

Michael Peter Carey

Attorney at Bryan Cave

1201 West Peachtree Street, N.W., One Atlantic Center, Fourteenth Floor

Atlanta, GA 30309

Danny Scot Ashby

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius

1717 Main Street, Suite 3200

Dallas, TX 75201-7347

Justin Roel Chapa

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius

1717 Main Street, Suite 3200

Dallas, TX 75201-7347

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Paul Leo Vorndran

Attorney at Pendleton Wilson Hennessey & Crow

1875 Lawrence Street, 10Th Floor

Denver, CO 80202

Justin Neal Bryan

Attorney at McCathern, Shokouhi, Evans, Grinke

3710 Rawlins Street, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75219

Clayton J. Kaiser

Attorney at Foulston Siefkin

1551 North Waterfront Parkway, Suite 100

Wichita, KS 67206

Hossain Arnold Shokouhi

Attorney at McCathern, Shokouhi, Evans, Grinke

3710 Rawlins Street, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75219

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10817771] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) Appellant's brief and appendix due on 05/14/2021 for Matrix Trust Company, LLC. [21-1034] [Entered: 03/25/2021 11:02 AM]

Open Document

[10808641] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 03/22/2021 for Arnold Shokouhi. [21-1034] [Entered: 02/18/2021 09:11 AM]

Open Document

[10808632] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 03/22/2021 for Justin Bryan. [21-1034] [Entered: 02/18/2021 08:54 AM]

Open Document

[10808446] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Justin Bryan for Dennis J. Ottis, Sheryl Case, Caldwell and Partners, Inc., Colin Caldwell, Richard Bird and Midlands Management Corp. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Interested party is already in the appeal. Served on 02/17/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1034] [Entered: 02/17/2021 02:13 PM]

Open Document

[10808440] Entry of appearance filed by Arnold Shokouhi for Dennis J. Ottis, Midlands Management Corporation, Sheryl Case, Caldwell and Partners, Inc., Colin Caldwell and Richard Bird. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (party listed previously disclosed). Served on 02/17/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1034] [Entered: 02/17/2021 02:00 PM]

Open Document

[10808433] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Clayton J. Kaiser for Dennis J. Ottis, Midlands Management Corporation, Sheryl Case, Caldwell and Partners, Inc., Colin Caldwell and Richard Bird. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/17/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1034] [Entered: 02/17/2021 01:41 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document

[10808227] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Justin Roel Chapa and Mr. Danny Scot Ashby for Matrix Trust Company, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Interested party is already in the appeal. Served on 02/17/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1034] [Entered: 02/17/2021 08:57 AM]

Open Document

[10808125] Docketing statement filed by Matrix Trust Company, LLC. Served on 02/16/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1034] SLH [Entered: 02/16/2021 05:26 PM]

Open Document

[10808098] Entry of appearance filed by Sarah L. Hartley for Matrix Trust Company, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Interested party is already in the appeal. Served on 02/16/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1034] [Entered: 02/16/2021 04:24 PM]

Open Document

[10808093] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Michael Peter Carey for Matrix Trust Company, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 02/16/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1034] [Entered: 02/16/2021 04:11 PM]

Open Document

[10808052] Transcript is not necessary form filed by Matrix Trust Company, LLC. Transcript ordered: none. Served on: 02/16/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1034] --[Edited 02/16/2021 by AT to use correct event code.] SLH [Entered: 02/16/2021 03:37 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10817771] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) Appellant's brief and appendix due on 05/14/2021 for Matrix Trust Company, LLC. [21-1034] [Entered: 03/25/2021 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • Docket[10812805] Attorney Mr. Justin Neal Bryan for Midlands Management Corporation, Caldwell and Partners, Inc., Dennis J. Ottis, Colin Caldwell, Richard Bird and Sheryl Case admitted to the bar of this court. [21-1034] [Entered: 03/05/2021 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • Docket[10811262] Attorney Hossain Arnold Shokouhi for Midlands Management Corporation, Caldwell and Partners, Inc., Dennis J. Ottis, Colin Caldwell, Richard Bird and Sheryl Case admitted to the bar of this court. [21-1034] [Entered: 03/01/2021 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10808641] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 03/22/2021 for Arnold Shokouhi. [21-1034] [Entered: 02/18/2021 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10808632] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 03/22/2021 for Justin Bryan. [21-1034] [Entered: 02/18/2021 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10808446] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Justin Bryan for Dennis J. Ottis, Sheryl Case, Caldwell and Partners, Inc., Colin Caldwell, Richard Bird and Midlands Management Corp. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Interested party is already in the appeal. Served on 02/17/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1034] [Entered: 02/17/2021 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10808440] Entry of appearance filed by Arnold Shokouhi for Dennis J. Ottis, Midlands Management Corporation, Sheryl Case, Caldwell and Partners, Inc., Colin Caldwell and Richard Bird. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (party listed previously disclosed). Served on 02/17/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1034] [Entered: 02/17/2021 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10808433] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Clayton J. Kaiser for Dennis J. Ottis, Midlands Management Corporation, Sheryl Case, Caldwell and Partners, Inc., Colin Caldwell and Richard Bird. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/17/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1034] [Entered: 02/17/2021 01:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • Docket[10808431] Entry of appearance submitted by Arnold Shokouhi for Appellees Richard Bird, Caldwell and Partners, Inc., Colin Caldwell, Sheryl Case, Midlands Management Corporation and Dennis J. OttisCharlie Caldwell for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/17/2021. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 02/17/2021 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [21-1034] CJK [Entered: 02/17/2021 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • Docket[10808430] Entry of appearance submitted by Justin Bryan for Appellees Richard Bird, Caldwell and Partners, Inc., Colin Caldwell, Sheryl Case, Midlands Management Corporation and Dennis J. OttisCharlie Caldwell for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/17/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1034]--[Edited 02/17/2021 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 2/17/2021] CJK [Entered: 02/17/2021 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10808227] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Justin Roel Chapa and Mr. Danny Scot Ashby for Matrix Trust Company, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Interested party is already in the appeal. Served on 02/17/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1034] [Entered: 02/17/2021 08:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10808125] Docketing statement filed by Matrix Trust Company, LLC. Served on 02/16/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1034] SLH [Entered: 02/16/2021 05:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10808098] Entry of appearance filed by Sarah L. Hartley for Matrix Trust Company, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Interested party is already in the appeal. Served on 02/16/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1034] [Entered: 02/16/2021 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10808093] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Michael Peter Carey for Matrix Trust Company, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 02/16/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1034] [Entered: 02/16/2021 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • Docket[10808081] Entry of appearance submitted by Justin R. Chapa, Danny S. Ashby for Appellant Matrix Trust Company, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/16/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1034]--[Edited 02/17/2021 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 2/17/2021] JRC [Entered: 02/16/2021 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • Docket[10808075] Entry of appearance submitted by Michael Peter Carey for Appellant Matrix Trust Company, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/16/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1034] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 02/16/2021 by NA] MPC [Entered: 02/16/2021 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • Docket[10808059] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 02/23/2021 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-1034] [Entered: 02/16/2021 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10808052] Transcript is not necessary form filed by Matrix Trust Company, LLC. Transcript ordered: none. Served on: 02/16/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1034] --[Edited 02/16/2021 by AT to use correct event code.] SLH [Entered: 02/16/2021 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • Docket[10808048] Entry of appearance submitted by Sarah L. Hartley for Appellant Matrix Trust Company, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/16/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1034]--[Edited 02/16/2021 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 2/16/2021] SLH [Entered: 02/16/2021 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10805075] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 02/03/2021. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 02/17/2021 for Matrix Trust Company. Notice of appearance due on 02/17/2021 for Richard Bird, Colin Caldwell, Caldwell and Partners, Inc., Sheryl Case, Midlands Management Corporation and Dennis J. Ottis. [21-1034] [Entered: 02/03/2021 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Matrix Trust Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Midland Management Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert A Lewis