This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2019 at 07:14:26 (UTC).

Mass Engineered Design, Inc. v. Planar Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 Mass Engineered Design, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Planar Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1365

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

PLANAR SYSTEMS, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellee

MASS ENGINEERED DESIGN, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Andrew Timothy Oliver

Attorney at Amin Turocy & Watson LLP

160 West Santa Clara Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

John J. Edmonds

Attorney at Collins Edmonds & Schlather, PLLC

355 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER filed. The appeal is deactivated. Within 14 days of the district court's ruling on the Planar Systems' motion, the parties are directed to inform this court how they believe this appeal should proceed. Service: 01/11/2019 by clerk. [577513] [LS] [Entered: 01/11/2019 08:52 AM]

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER filed. The appeal is deactivated. Within 14 days of the district court's ruling on the Planar Systems' motion, the parties are directed to inform this court how they believe this appeal should proceed. Service: 01/11/2019 by clerk. [577513] [LS] [Entered: 01/11/2019 08:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 01/02/2019. [575899] Entry of Appearance due 01/18/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 01/18/2019. Docketing Statement due 01/18/2019. Appellant's brief is due 03/05/2019. [MMA] [Entered: 01/04/2019 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less