This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/24/2022 at 06:10:16 (UTC).

Maso Capital Investments v. E-House (China) Holdings

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 Maso Capital Investments filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against E-House China Holdings. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-355

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Maso Capital Investments Limited

Altimeo Asset Management

Blackwell Partners LLC Series A

Crown Managed Accounts SPC for and on behalf of Crown/Maso Segregated Portfolio, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated

Defendant / Appellees

E-House (China) Holdings Limited

Xin Zhou

Neil Nanpeng Shen

E-House Holdings Ltd.

Bing Xiang

Hongchao Zhu

Jeffrey Zeng

Winston Li

David Jian Sun

Canhao Huang

SINA Corporation represented by

Kanrich Holdings Limited

On Chance, Inc.

Smart Create Group Limited

Smart Master International Limited

Jun Heng Investment Limited

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jake Bissell-Linsk Esq.

Attorney at Labaton Sucharow LLP

140 Broadway

New York, NY 10005

Carol C. Villegas Esq.

Attorney at Labaton Sucharow LLP

140 Broadway

New York, NY 10005

Michael Grunfeld Esq.

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

600 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Jeremy Alan Lieberman Esq.

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

600 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Scott Musoff

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001

Robert Alexander Fumerton Esq.

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001

Bradley Alan Klein Esq.

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

1440 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#40

(#40) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to remove this case from the Expedited Appeals Calendar and for the Court to set Appellants opening brief due date as 06/07/2022 [ # 34 ], [ # 34 ], filed by Appellants Altimeo Asset Management, Maso Capital Investments Limited, Blackwell Partners LLC Series A and Crown Managed Accounts SPC for and on behalf of Crown/Maso Segregated Portfolio, by JON, FILED. [3286315][40] [22-355] [Entered: 03/28/2022 03:28 PM]

#36

(#36) LETTER, on behalf of Appellees Charles Chao, E-House (China) Holdings Limited, E-House Holdings Ltd., Canhao Huang, Jun Heng Investment Limited, Kanrich Holdings Limited, Winston Li, On Chance, Inc., Neil Nanpeng Shen, SINA Corporation, Smart Create Group Limited, Smart Master International Limited, David Jian Sun, Bing Xiang, Jeffrey Zeng, Xin Zhou and Hongchao Zhu, informing Court that they do not oppose Appellants' motion for removal from the expedited appeals calendar and to extend time, RECEIVED. Service date 03/25/2022 by CM/ECF.[3285412] [22-355] [Entered: 03/25/2022 04:29 PM]

#34

(#34) MOTION, for removal from the expedited appeals calendar, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Altimeo Asset Management, Blackwell Partners LLC Series A, Crown Managed Accounts SPC for and on behalf of Crown/Maso Segregated Portfolio and Maso Capital Investments Limited, FILED. Service date 03/23/2022 by CM/ECF. [3283706] [22-355] [Entered: 03/23/2022 06:52 PM]

#32

(#32) LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 04/15/2022, appellee's brief due date as 05/20/2022,TRANSMITTED.[3276629] [22-355] [Entered: 03/11/2022 02:31 PM]

#27

(#27) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Altimeo Asset Management, FILED. Service date 03/10/2022 by CM/ECF. [3276026] [22-355] [Entered: 03/10/2022 06:32 PM]

#26

(#26) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Altimeo Asset Management, FILED. Service date 03/10/2022 by CM/ECF. [3276023] [22-355] [Entered: 03/10/2022 06:10 PM]

#25

(#25) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Altimeo Asset Management, Blackwell Partners LLC Series A, Crown Managed Accounts SPC for and on behalf of Crown/Maso Segregated Portfolio and Maso Capital Investments Limited, FILED. Service date 03/10/2022 by CM/ECF. [3275977] [22-355] [Entered: 03/10/2022 04:43 PM]

#21

No Description Available

#20

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

#17

(#17) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee E-House (China) Holdings Limited, E-House Holdings Ltd., Xin Zhou, Neil Nanpeng Shen, Bing Xiang, Hongchao Zhu, Canhao Huang, SINA Corporation, Kanrich Holdings Limited, On Chance, Inc., Jun Heng Investment Limited, Smart Create Group Limited and Smart Master International Limited, FILED. Service date 03/10/2022 by CM/ECF.[3275786] [22-355] [Entered: 03/10/2022 03:07 PM]

#16

(#16) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[3275686] [22-355] [Entered: 03/10/2022 01:42 PM]

#8

(#8) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Altimeo Asset Management, Blackwell Partners LLC Series A, Crown Managed Accounts SPC for and on behalf of Crown/Maso Segregated Portfolio and Maso Capital Investments Limited, FILED. Service date 03/09/2022 by CM/ECF.[3275094] [22-355] [Entered: 03/09/2022 07:58 PM]

#7

(#7) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Altimeo Asset Management, Blackwell Partners LLC Series A, Crown Managed Accounts SPC for and on behalf of Crown/Maso Segregated Portfolio and Maso Capital Investments Limited, FILED. Service date 03/09/2022 by CM/ECF.[3275093] [22-355] [Entered: 03/09/2022 07:57 PM]

#6

(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Altimeo Asset Management, Blackwell Partners LLC Series A, Crown Managed Accounts SPC for and on behalf of Crown/Maso Segregated Portfolio and Maso Capital Investments Limited, FILED. Service date 03/09/2022 by CM/ECF.[3275092] [22-355] [Entered: 03/09/2022 07:54 PM]

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to remove this case from the Expedited Appeals Calendar and for the Court to set Appellants opening brief due date as 06/07/2022 [ # 34 ], [ # 34 ], filed by Appellants Altimeo Asset Management, Maso Capital Investments Limited, Blackwell Partners LLC Series A and Crown Managed Accounts SPC for and on behalf of Crown/Maso Segregated Portfolio, by JON, FILED. [3286315][40] [22-355] [Entered: 03/28/2022 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) LETTER, on behalf of Appellees Charles Chao, E-House (China) Holdings Limited, E-House Holdings Ltd., Canhao Huang, Jun Heng Investment Limited, Kanrich Holdings Limited, Winston Li, On Chance, Inc., Neil Nanpeng Shen, SINA Corporation, Smart Create Group Limited, Smart Master International Limited, David Jian Sun, Bing Xiang, Jeffrey Zeng, Xin Zhou and Hongchao Zhu, informing Court that they do not oppose Appellants' motion for removal from the expedited appeals calendar and to extend time, RECEIVED. Service date 03/25/2022 by CM/ECF.[3285412] [22-355] [Entered: 03/25/2022 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MOTION, for removal from the expedited appeals calendar, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Altimeo Asset Management, Blackwell Partners LLC Series A, Crown Managed Accounts SPC for and on behalf of Crown/Maso Segregated Portfolio and Maso Capital Investments Limited, FILED. Service date 03/23/2022 by CM/ECF. [3283706] [22-355] [Entered: 03/23/2022 06:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 04/15/2022, appellee's brief due date as 05/20/2022,TRANSMITTED.[3276629] [22-355] [Entered: 03/11/2022 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ATTORNEY, Jeremy Alan Lieberman for Altimeo Asset Management, in case 22-355 , [ # 27 ], ADDED.[3276116] [22-355] [Entered: 03/11/2022 08:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ATTORNEY, Michael Grunfeld for Altimeo Asset Management, in case 22-355 , [ # 26 ], ADDED.[3276114] [22-355] [Entered: 03/11/2022 08:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ATTORNEY, Jake Bissell-Linsk for Maso Capital Investments Limited Altimeo Asset Management Blackwell Partners LLC Series A Crown Managed Accounts SPC for and on behalf of Crown/Maso Segregated Portfolio, in case 22-355 , [ # 25 ], ADDED.[3276112] [22-355] [Entered: 03/11/2022 08:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Altimeo Asset Management, FILED. Service date 03/10/2022 by CM/ECF. [3276026] [22-355] [Entered: 03/10/2022 06:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Altimeo Asset Management, FILED. Service date 03/10/2022 by CM/ECF. [3276023] [22-355] [Entered: 03/10/2022 06:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Altimeo Asset Management, Blackwell Partners LLC Series A, Crown Managed Accounts SPC for and on behalf of Crown/Maso Segregated Portfolio and Maso Capital Investments Limited, FILED. Service date 03/10/2022 by CM/ECF. [3275977] [22-355] [Entered: 03/10/2022 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee E-House (China) Holdings Limited, E-House Holdings Ltd., Xin Zhou, Neil Nanpeng Shen, Bing Xiang, Hongchao Zhu, Canhao Huang, SINA Corporation, Kanrich Holdings Limited, On Chance, Inc., Jun Heng Investment Limited, Smart Create Group Limited and Smart Master International Limited, FILED. Service date 03/10/2022 by CM/ECF.[3275786] [22-355] [Entered: 03/10/2022 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[3275686] [22-355] [Entered: 03/10/2022 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Altimeo Asset Management, Blackwell Partners LLC Series A, Crown Managed Accounts SPC for and on behalf of Crown/Maso Segregated Portfolio and Maso Capital Investments Limited, FILED. Service date 03/09/2022 by CM/ECF.[3275094] [22-355] [Entered: 03/09/2022 07:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Altimeo Asset Management, Blackwell Partners LLC Series A, Crown Managed Accounts SPC for and on behalf of Crown/Maso Segregated Portfolio and Maso Capital Investments Limited, FILED. Service date 03/09/2022 by CM/ECF.[3275093] [22-355] [Entered: 03/09/2022 07:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Altimeo Asset Management, Blackwell Partners LLC Series A, Crown Managed Accounts SPC for and on behalf of Crown/Maso Segregated Portfolio and Maso Capital Investments Limited, FILED. Service date 03/09/2022 by CM/ECF.[3275092] [22-355] [Entered: 03/09/2022 07:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3266799] [22-355] [Entered: 02/24/2022 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Altimeo Asset Management, Blackwell Partners LLC Series A, Crown Managed Accounts SPC for and on behalf of Crown/Maso Segregated Portfolio and Maso Capital Investments Limited, district court receipt # ANYSDC-25769544, FILED.[3266547] [22-355] [Entered: 02/24/2022 08:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/08/2022, RECEIVED.[3266544] [22-355] [Entered: 02/24/2022 08:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION & ORDER, dated 09/29/2021, RECEIVED.[3266542] [22-355] [Entered: 02/24/2022 08:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Altimeo Asset Management, Blackwell Partners LLC Series A, Crown Managed Accounts SPC for and on behalf of Crown/Maso Segregated Portfolio and Maso Capital Investments Limited, FILED. [3266537] [22-355] [Entered: 02/24/2022 08:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SINA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CROWN MANAGED ACCOUNTS, for and on behalf of Crown/PW SP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Alexander Fumerton Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott Musoff