Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/06/2020 at 06:16:20 (UTC).

Mashpee Wampanoag Tribe v. David Bernhardt, et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 Mashpee Wampanoag Tribe filed an Other lawsuit against David Bernhardt. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-5237

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Intervenor Defendant / Appellees

Antonio Defaria

Francis Canary, Jr.

Dorothy Peirce

Veronica Casey

Robert Lincoln

Carol Murphy

Kim Dorsey

Louise Silvia

David Lewry

Michelle Littlefield

Donna Defaria

David Littlefield

Jill Lagace

Richard Lewry

Tracy Acord

David Purdy

Francis Lagace

Kathleen Lewry

Michelle Lewry

Defendant / Appellant

United States Department of the Interior

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Andrew Kim

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

1900 N Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Rachel Heron

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 7415, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-7415

Other Attorneys

Samuel Franklin Daughety

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

1900 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1108

Suzanne Rebecca Schaeffer

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

1900 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1108

Tami Lyn Azorsky

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

1900 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1108

Virginia Heather Sibbison

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

1900 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1108

Kenneth Pfaehler

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

1900 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1108

 

Court Documents

Open Document

STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1860367] filed by Tracy Acord, Deborah Canary, Francis Canary, Jr., Veronica Casey, Patricia Colbert, Vivian Courcy, Will Courcy, Antonio Defaria, Donna Defaria, Kelly Dorsey, Kim Dorsey, Francis Lagace, Jill Lagace, David Lewry, Kathleen Lewry, Michelle Lewry, Richard Lewry, Robert Lincoln, David Littlefield, Michelle Littlefield, Christina McMahon, Carol Murphy, Dorothy Peirce, David Purdy and Louise Silvia [Service Date: 09/08/2020 ] [20-5238] (Kim, Andrew) [Entered: 09/08/2020 05:27 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1860364] filed by Tracy Acord, Deborah Canary, Francis Canary, Jr., Veronica Casey, Patricia Colbert, Vivian Courcy, Will Courcy, Antonio Defaria, Donna Defaria, Kelly Dorsey, Kim Dorsey, Francis Lagace, Jill Lagace, David Lewry, Kathleen Lewry, Michelle Lewry, Richard Lewry, Robert Lincoln, David Littlefield, Michelle Littlefield, Christina McMahon, Carol Murphy, Dorothy Peirce, David Purdy and Louise Silvia [Service Date: 09/08/2020 ] [20-5238] (Kim, Andrew) [Entered: 09/08/2020 05:19 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1860362] filed by Tracy Acord, Deborah Canary, Francis Canary, Jr., Veronica Casey, Patricia Colbert, Vivian Courcy, Will Courcy, Antonio Defaria, Donna Defaria, Kelly Dorsey, Kim Dorsey, Francis Lagace, Jill Lagace, David Lewry, Kathleen Lewry, Michelle Lewry, Richard Lewry, Robert Lincoln, David Littlefield, Michelle Littlefield, Christina McMahon, Carol Murphy, Dorothy Peirce, David Purdy and Louise Silvia [Service Date: 09/08/2020 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [20-5238] (Kim, Andrew) [Entered: 09/08/2020 05:13 PM]

Open Document #4

Mashpee - Underlying Decision - Exhibit C

Open Document #3

Mashpee - Underlying Decision - Exhibit B

Open Document #2

Mashpee - Underlying Decision - Exhibit A

Open Document #1

Underlying Decision in Case Filed

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1860344] filed by Tracy Acord, Deborah Canary, Francis Canary, Jr., Veronica Casey, Patricia Colbert, Vivian Courcy, Will Courcy, Antonio Defaria, Donna Defaria, Kelly Dorsey, Kim Dorsey, Francis Lagace, Jill Lagace, David Lewry, Kathleen Lewry, Michelle Lewry, Richard Lewry, Robert Lincoln, David Littlefield, Michelle Littlefield, Christina McMahon, Carol Murphy, Dorothy Peirce, David Purdy and Louise Silvia [Service Date: 09/08/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [20-5238] (Kim, Andrew) [Entered: 09/08/2020 04:51 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING STATEMENT [1860331] filed by Tracy Acord, Deborah Canary, Francis Canary, Jr., Veronica Casey, Patricia Colbert, Vivian Courcy, Will Courcy, Antonio Defaria, Donna Defaria, Kelly Dorsey, Kim Dorsey, Francis Lagace, Jill Lagace, David Lewry, Kathleen Lewry, Michelle Lewry, Richard Lewry, Robert Lincoln, David Littlefield, Michelle Littlefield, Christina McMahon, Carol Murphy, Dorothy Peirce, David Purdy and Louise Silvia [Service Date: 09/08/2020 ] [20-5238] (Kim, Andrew) [Entered: 09/08/2020 04:37 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1860323] filed by Andrew Kim on behalf of Appellees Tracy Acord, Deborah Canary, Francis Canary, Jr., Veronica Casey, Patricia Colbert, Vivian Courcy, Will Courcy, Antonio Defaria, Donna Defaria, Kelly Dorsey, Kim Dorsey, Francis Lagace, Jill Lagace, David Lewry, Kathleen Lewry, Michelle Lewry, Richard Lewry, Robert Lincoln, David Littlefield, Michelle Littlefield, Christina McMahon, Carol Murphy, Dorothy Peirce, David Purdy and Louise Silvia in 20-5237, Appellants Tracy Acord, Deborah Canary, Francis Canary, Jr., Veronica Casey, Patricia Colbert, Vivian Courcy, Will Courcy, Antonio Defaria, Donna Defaria, Kelly Dorsey, Kim Dorsey, Francis Lagace, Jill Lagace, David Lewry, Kathleen Lewry, Michelle Lewry, Richard Lewry, Robert Lincoln, David Littlefield, Michelle Littlefield, Christina McMahon, Carol Murphy, Dorothy Peirce, David Purdy and Louise Silvia in 20-5238. [20-5237, 20-5238] (Kim, Andrew) [Entered: 09/08/2020 04:22 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1860319] filed by Mashpee Wampanoag Tribe in 20-5237, 20-5238 [Service Date: 09/08/2020 ] [20-5237, 20-5238] (Azorsky, Tami) [Entered: 09/08/2020 04:09 PM]

Open Document #3

Dist Ct ECF 77

Open Document #2

Dist Ct ECF 76

Open Document #1

Dist Ct ECF 75

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1860147] filed by Mr. David Longly Bernhardt and DOI [Service Date: 09/08/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [20-5237] (Heron, Rachel) [Entered: 09/08/2020 09:16 AM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1860145] filed by Mr. David Longly Bernhardt and DOI [Service Date: 09/08/2020 ] [20-5237] (Heron, Rachel) [Entered: 09/08/2020 09:15 AM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1860144] filed by Mr. David Longly Bernhardt and DOI [Service Date: 09/08/2020 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [20-5237] (Heron, Rachel) [Entered: 09/08/2020 09:12 AM]

Open Document

DOCKETING STATEMENT [1860143] filed by Mr. David Longly Bernhardt and DOI [Service Date: 09/08/2020 ] [20-5237] (Heron, Rachel) [Entered: 09/08/2020 09:10 AM]

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF ISSUES [1860367] filed by Tracy Acord, Deborah Canary, Francis Canary, Jr., Veronica Casey, Patricia Colbert, Vivian Courcy, Will Courcy, Antonio Defaria, Donna Defaria, Kelly Dorsey, Kim Dorsey, Francis Lagace, Jill Lagace, David Lewry, Kathleen Lewry, Michelle Lewry, Richard Lewry, Robert Lincoln, David Littlefield, Michelle Littlefield, Christina McMahon, Carol Murphy, Dorothy Peirce, David Purdy and Louise Silvia [Service Date: 09/08/2020 ] [20-5238] (Kim, Andrew) [Entered: 09/08/2020 05:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1860364] filed by Tracy Acord, Deborah Canary, Francis Canary, Jr., Veronica Casey, Patricia Colbert, Vivian Courcy, Will Courcy, Antonio Defaria, Donna Defaria, Kelly Dorsey, Kim Dorsey, Francis Lagace, Jill Lagace, David Lewry, Kathleen Lewry, Michelle Lewry, Richard Lewry, Robert Lincoln, David Littlefield, Michelle Littlefield, Christina McMahon, Carol Murphy, Dorothy Peirce, David Purdy and Louise Silvia [Service Date: 09/08/2020 ] [20-5238] (Kim, Andrew) [Entered: 09/08/2020 05:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1860362] filed by Tracy Acord, Deborah Canary, Francis Canary, Jr., Veronica Casey, Patricia Colbert, Vivian Courcy, Will Courcy, Antonio Defaria, Donna Defaria, Kelly Dorsey, Kim Dorsey, Francis Lagace, Jill Lagace, David Lewry, Kathleen Lewry, Michelle Lewry, Richard Lewry, Robert Lincoln, David Littlefield, Michelle Littlefield, Christina McMahon, Carol Murphy, Dorothy Peirce, David Purdy and Louise Silvia [Service Date: 09/08/2020 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [20-5238] (Kim, Andrew) [Entered: 09/08/2020 05:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1860357] submitted by Tracy Acord, Deborah Canary, Francis Canary, Jr., Veronica Casey, Patricia Colbert, Vivian Courcy, Will Courcy, Antonio Defaria, Donna Defaria, Kelly Dorsey, Kim Dorsey, Francis Lagace, Jill Lagace, David Lewry, Kathleen Lewry, Michelle Lewry, Richard Lewry, Robert Lincoln, David Littlefield, Michelle Littlefield, Christina McMahon, Carol Murphy, Dorothy Peirce, David Purdy and Louise Silvia [Service Date: 09/08/2020 ] [20-5238] (Kim, Andrew) [Entered: 09/08/2020 05:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1860344] filed by Tracy Acord, Deborah Canary, Francis Canary, Jr., Veronica Casey, Patricia Colbert, Vivian Courcy, Will Courcy, Antonio Defaria, Donna Defaria, Kelly Dorsey, Kim Dorsey, Francis Lagace, Jill Lagace, David Lewry, Kathleen Lewry, Michelle Lewry, Richard Lewry, Robert Lincoln, David Littlefield, Michelle Littlefield, Christina McMahon, Carol Murphy, Dorothy Peirce, David Purdy and Louise Silvia [Service Date: 09/08/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [20-5238] (Kim, Andrew) [Entered: 09/08/2020 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING STATEMENT [1860331] filed by Tracy Acord, Deborah Canary, Francis Canary, Jr., Veronica Casey, Patricia Colbert, Vivian Courcy, Will Courcy, Antonio Defaria, Donna Defaria, Kelly Dorsey, Kim Dorsey, Francis Lagace, Jill Lagace, David Lewry, Kathleen Lewry, Michelle Lewry, Richard Lewry, Robert Lincoln, David Littlefield, Michelle Littlefield, Christina McMahon, Carol Murphy, Dorothy Peirce, David Purdy and Louise Silvia [Service Date: 09/08/2020 ] [20-5238] (Kim, Andrew) [Entered: 09/08/2020 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1860323] filed by Andrew Kim on behalf of Appellees Tracy Acord, Deborah Canary, Francis Canary, Jr., Veronica Casey, Patricia Colbert, Vivian Courcy, Will Courcy, Antonio Defaria, Donna Defaria, Kelly Dorsey, Kim Dorsey, Francis Lagace, Jill Lagace, David Lewry, Kathleen Lewry, Michelle Lewry, Richard Lewry, Robert Lincoln, David Littlefield, Michelle Littlefield, Christina McMahon, Carol Murphy, Dorothy Peirce, David Purdy and Louise Silvia in 20-5237, Appellants Tracy Acord, Deborah Canary, Francis Canary, Jr., Veronica Casey, Patricia Colbert, Vivian Courcy, Will Courcy, Antonio Defaria, Donna Defaria, Kelly Dorsey, Kim Dorsey, Francis Lagace, Jill Lagace, David Lewry, Kathleen Lewry, Michelle Lewry, Richard Lewry, Robert Lincoln, David Littlefield, Michelle Littlefield, Christina McMahon, Carol Murphy, Dorothy Peirce, David Purdy and Louise Silvia in 20-5238. [20-5237, 20-5238] (Kim, Andrew) [Entered: 09/08/2020 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1860319] filed by Mashpee Wampanoag Tribe in 20-5237, 20-5238 [Service Date: 09/08/2020 ] [20-5237, 20-5238] (Azorsky, Tami) [Entered: 09/08/2020 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1860150] submitted by Mr. David Longly Bernhardt and DOI [Service Date: 09/08/2020 ] [20-5237] (Heron, Rachel) [Entered: 09/08/2020 09:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1860147] filed by Mr. David Longly Bernhardt and DOI [Service Date: 09/08/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [20-5237] (Heron, Rachel) [Entered: 09/08/2020 09:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF ISSUES [1860145] filed by Mr. David Longly Bernhardt and DOI [Service Date: 09/08/2020 ] [20-5237] (Heron, Rachel) [Entered: 09/08/2020 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1860144] filed by Mr. David Longly Bernhardt and DOI [Service Date: 09/08/2020 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [20-5237] (Heron, Rachel) [Entered: 09/08/2020 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING STATEMENT [1860143] filed by Mr. David Longly Bernhardt and DOI [Service Date: 09/08/2020 ] [20-5237] (Heron, Rachel) [Entered: 09/08/2020 09:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1860141] filed by Mr. David Longly Bernhardt and DOI [Service Date: 09/08/2020 ] [20-5237] (Heron, Rachel) [Entered: 09/08/2020 09:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1856564] filed by Tami Lyn Azorsky and co-counsel V. Heather Sibbison, Suzanne R. Schaeffer, Samuel F. Daughety on behalf of Appellee Mashpee Wampanoag Tribe in 20-5237, 20-5238. [20-5237, 20-5238] (Azorsky, Tami) [Entered: 08/14/2020 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1856464] filed by Rachel Heron on behalf of Appellants Mr. David Longly Bernhardt and DOI in 20-5237, Appellees Mr. David Longly Bernhardt and DOI in 20-5238. [20-5237, 20-5238] (Heron, Rachel) [Entered: 08/13/2020 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1855641] filed consolidating cases 20-5238 (Consolidation started 08/07/2020) with 20-5237; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 09/08/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 09/08/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 09/08/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 09/08/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 09/08/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 09/08/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 09/08/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 09/08/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 09/21/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 09/08/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 09/08/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 09/08/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 09/21/2020 [20-5237, 20-5238] [Entered: 08/07/2020 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1855626] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-02242-PLF filed by Mr. David Longly Bernhardt and DOI. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5237. [20-5237] [Entered: 08/07/2020 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5237] [Entered: 08/07/2020 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth Pfaehler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tami Lyn Azorsky