22-15609
04/26/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Civil Right - Employment Discrimination
MARYJANE DORSEY
NP SANTA FE, LLC, DBA Santa Fe Station Hotel & Casino
Kristina S. Holman
Attorney at Holman Law Office
8275 S Eastern Avenue, Suite 215
Las Vegas, NV 89123
Scott M. Mahoney Esquire
Attorney at Fisher & Phillips, LLP
300 S 4Th Street, Suite 1500
Las Vegas, NV 89101
Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Mediation Letter
Case Opening Packet
(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Maryjane Dorsey Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/03/2022. [12437492] [22-15609] (Holman, Kristina) [Entered: 05/03/2022 06:39 PM]
(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 06/08/2022, 10:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12440956] (BLS) [Entered: 05/06/2022 09:32 PM]
(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 06/08/2022, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (Time change only). [12444670] (CL) [Entered: 05/11/2022 04:58 PM]
(#6) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 06/29/2022. See order for details. [12466642] (CL) [Entered: 06/08/2022 02:26 PM]
Docket(#6) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 06/29/2022. See order for details. [12466642] (CL) [Entered: 06/08/2022 02:26 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 06/08/2022, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (Time change only). [12444670] (CL) [Entered: 05/11/2022 04:58 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 06/08/2022, 10:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12440956] (BLS) [Entered: 05/06/2022 09:32 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/03/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12437496]. [22-15609] (AD) [Entered: 05/03/2022 06:44 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Maryjane Dorsey Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/03/2022. [12437492] [22-15609] (Holman, Kristina) [Entered: 05/03/2022 06:39 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Maryjane Dorsey Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/03/2022. Transcript ordered by 05/25/2022. Transcript due 06/24/2022. Appellant Maryjane Dorsey opening brief due 08/03/2022. Appellee NP Santa Fe, LLC answering brief due 09/02/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12431476] (JBS) [Entered: 04/26/2022 01:59 PM]
[-] Read Less